Rizzo v. Kohl's, Inc et al
Plaintiff: David Rizzo
Defendant: Kohl's Department Stores, Inc., Jeffrey Lentsch, Kohl's, Inc and Matthew Lashway
Case Number: 1:2021cv00178
Filed: January 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: William M Skretny
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Jacob Wyatt on behalf of David Rizzo (Wyatt, Benjamin)
March 10, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Trevor Brice on behalf of David Rizzo (Brice, Trevor)
March 10, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by David Rizzo. Kohl's Department Stores, Inc. waiver sent on 2/9/2021, answer due 4/12/2021. (Brock, Timothy)
March 10, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by David Rizzo. Kohl's, Inc waiver sent on 2/9/2021, answer due 4/12/2021. (Brock, Timothy)
March 10, 2021 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by David Rizzo. Matthew Lashway waiver sent on 2/9/2021, answer due 4/12/2021. (Brock, Timothy)
March 10, 2021 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by David Rizzo. Jeffrey Lentsch waiver sent on 2/9/2021, answer due 4/12/2021. (Brock, Timothy)
January 29, 2021 Remark: Case originally assigned to incorrect divisional office and has been transferred to the Buffalo Office. Case is assigned to Judge Hon. William M. Skretny. (JD)
January 26, 2021 Original summons not submitted. (JD)
January 26, 2021 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (JD)
January 26, 2021 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(JD)
January 26, 2021 Case Assigned to Hon. Charles J. Siragusa. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (JD) Modified on 1/26/2021 to correct docket text (JD).
January 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT David Rizzo against Kohl's Department Stores, Inc., Kohl's, Inc, Matthew Lashway, Jeffrey Lentsch $ 402 receipt number 0209-4123620, filed by David Rizzo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Brock, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rizzo v. Kohl's, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kohl's Department Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Lentsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kohl's, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Lashway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Rizzo
Represented By: Timothy John Brock
Represented By: Benjamin Jacob Wyatt
Represented By: Trevor Brice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?