Jerry Gradl Motors, Inc. et al v. ACV Auctions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jerry Gradl Motors, Inc. and Lifetime Motor Cars, Inc.
Defendant: Sun Auto Group, Inc., ACV Auctions, Inc., Brian M. Malchak, Sun Chevrolet, Inc., Wholesale Cars Online.com, L.L.C. doing business as Sun Auto Warehouse of Cortland and Wholesale Cars Online.com, L.L.C. doing business as Sun Auto Warehouse
Case Number: 1:2021cv00409
Filed: March 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christina Reiss
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2021 Filing 24 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Wholesale Cars Online.com, L.L.C., ACV Auctions, Inc., Brian M. Malchak, Sun Auto Group, Inc., Sun Chevrolet, Inc., Wholesale Cars Online.com, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint)(Jaworski, Myriah)
May 17, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION to appear pro hac vice of Jonathan Direnfeld ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0209-4249695.) by ACV Auctions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Petition for Admission, #2 Supplement Civility Principles Oath, #3 Supplement Attorney Oath, #4 Supplement Registration Form, #5 Supplement Sponsoring Affidavit)(Jaworski, Myriah)
May 17, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION to appear pro hac vice of John A. Jurata, Jr. ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0209-4249691.) by ACV Auctions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Petition for Admission, #2 Supplement Civility Principles Oath, #3 Supplement Attorney Oath, #4 Supplement Registration Form, #5 Supplement Sponsoring Affidavit)(Jaworski, Myriah)
May 17, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION to appear pro hac vice of John A. Jurata, Jr. ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0209-4249640.) by ACV Auctions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Civility Principles Oath, #2 Supplement Attorney Admission Oath, #3 Supplement Sponsoring Affidavit, #4 Supplement Registration Form)(Jaworski, Myriah)
May 17, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon P. Devendorf on behalf of Brian M. Malchak (Devendorf, Jon)
May 14, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy W. Hoover on behalf of Sun Chevrolet, Inc., Wholesale Cars Online.com, L.L.C. (Hoover, Timothy)
May 10, 2021 Filing 18 TEXT ORDER granting #17 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Hon. Christina Reiss on 5/10/2021. (JLV)
May 10, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by ACV Auctions, Inc..(Jaworski, Myriah)
May 10, 2021 E-Filing Notification: #16 Letter; this document contains a request for relief and should be filed as a motion. ACTION REQUIRED: Re-file document using the motion event. (JLV)
May 7, 2021 Filing 16 Letter filed by ACV Auctions, Inc. as to Sun Auto Group, Inc., Sun Chevrolet, Inc., Wholesale Cars Online.com, L.L.C., ACV Auctions, Inc., Wholesale Cars Online.com, L.L.C., Brian M. Malchak . (Jaworski, Myriah)
May 7, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael L. McCabe on behalf of ACV Auctions, Inc. (McCabe, Michael)
May 7, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Myriah Valentina Jaworski on behalf of ACV Auctions, Inc. (Jaworski, Myriah)
May 3, 2021 Filing 13 STIPULATION by Jerry Gradl Motors, Inc., Lifetime Motor Cars, Inc.. (Yankelunas, Edward)
April 30, 2021 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jerry Gradl Motors, Inc., Lifetime Motor Cars, Inc.. Wholesale Cars Online.com, L.L.C. waiver sent on 4/27/2021, answer due 6/28/2021; Sun Chevrolet, Inc. waiver sent on 4/27/2021, answer due 6/28/2021; Wholesale Cars Online.com, L.L.C. waiver sent on 4/27/2021, answer due 6/28/2021. (Yankelunas, Edward)
April 27, 2021 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Wholesale Cars Online.com, L.L.C., Sun Chevrolet, Inc., Wholesale Cars Online.com, L.L.C. (JLV)
April 26, 2021 Filing 10 Original Summons Filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Yankelunas, Edward)
April 26, 2021 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jerry Gradl Motors, Inc., Lifetime Motor Cars, Inc..(Yankelunas, Edward)
April 19, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jerry Gradl Motors, Inc., Lifetime Motor Cars, Inc.. Brian M. Malchak served on 4/6/2021, answer due 4/27/2021. (Yankelunas, Edward)
April 16, 2021 Filing 7 STIPULATION Of Extension by Jerry Gradl Motors, Inc., Lifetime Motor Cars, Inc.. (Yankelunas, Edward)
April 5, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Jerry Gradl Motors, Inc., Lifetime Motor Cars, Inc. as to Sun Auto Group, Inc.. (Yankelunas, Edward)
April 5, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jerry Gradl Motors, Inc., Lifetime Motor Cars, Inc.. ACV Auctions, Inc. served on 3/26/2021, answer due 4/16/2021. (Yankelunas, Edward)
March 22, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to ACV Auctions, Inc., Brian M. Malchak, Sun Auto Group, Inc. (JLV)
March 22, 2021 Case Assigned to Hon. Christina Reiss. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (JLV)
March 22, 2021 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (JLV)
March 22, 2021 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution. (JLV)
March 19, 2021 Filing 3 Original Summons Filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Yankelunas, Edward)
March 19, 2021 Filing 2 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS Civil Cover Sheet. (Yankelunas, Edward)
March 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants $ 402 receipt number 0209-4192263, filed by Jerry Gradl Motors, Inc., Lifetime Motor Cars, Inc..(Yankelunas, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jerry Gradl Motors, Inc. et al v. ACV Auctions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Auto Group, Inc.
Represented By: Myriah Valentina Jaworski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACV Auctions, Inc.
Represented By: Michael L. McCabe
Represented By: Myriah Valentina Jaworski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian M. Malchak
Represented By: Jon P. Devendorf
Represented By: Myriah Valentina Jaworski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun Chevrolet, Inc.
Represented By: Myriah Valentina Jaworski
Represented By: Timothy W. Hoover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wholesale Cars Online.com, L.L.C. doing business as Sun Auto Warehouse of Cortland
Represented By: Myriah Valentina Jaworski
Represented By: Timothy W. Hoover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wholesale Cars Online.com, L.L.C. doing business as Sun Auto Warehouse
Represented By: Myriah Valentina Jaworski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Gradl Motors, Inc.
Represented By: Edward P. Yankelunas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lifetime Motor Cars, Inc.
Represented By: Edward P. Yankelunas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?