Bagley v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Angela Bagley
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration and Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2021cv00581
Filed: May 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2021 Filing 7 TEXT ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff is not employed and resides with her spouse, who is employed and responsible for the family's expenses. Plaintiff indicates that her monthly income is $4,700 and monthly expenses are $1,450. Based on the Court's review of plaintiff's monthly income and expenses, the Court finds that plaintiff has not put forth sufficient indications of indigency, and therefore, her motion is denied. Plaintiff has until July 9, 2021 to pay the $402.00 filing fee. If plaintiff does not pay the filing fee or otherwise seek relief from this Order by July 9, 2021, the Clerk of Court will dismiss this case without prejudice without further order. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 6/9/21. (NNR)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
May 6, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Graham Morrison on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Morrison, Graham)
May 5, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Attached issued summons and complaint served electronically on the defendant pursuant to Western District of New York's Local Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (TMK)
May 5, 2021 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TMK)
May 5, 2021 Case placed in Social Security Assignment Pool. (TMK)
May 4, 2021 Filing 4 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS summons. (Clary, Dennis)
May 4, 2021 Filing 3 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS civil cover sheet. (Clary, Dennis)
May 4, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Angela Bagley. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Clary, Dennis)
May 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration, filed by Angela Bagley.(Clary, Dennis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bagley v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Graham Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Bagley
Represented By: Dennis A. Clary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?