Prepared Food Photos, Inc. v. Getty Images et al
Plaintiff: Prepared Food Photos, Inc. f/k/a Adlife Marketing & Communications Co., Inc., Prepared Food Photos, Inc. and Adlife Marketing & Communications Co., Inc.
Defendant: iStock by Getty Images and Getty Images
Case Number: 1:2021cv00698
Filed: June 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J Vilardo
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2021 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: The notice of voluntary dismissal without prejudice, Docket Item #5 , is HEREBY SO ORDERED. The Clerk of the Court shall close this case. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 6/7/2021. (MLA)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
June 7, 2021 ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: All Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P.7.1(b) are to be filed within seven (7) days of this notice. (KM)
June 4, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Prepared Food Photos, Inc. (Johnsen, Ryan)
June 2, 2021 Filing 4 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright mailed to the Copyright Office. (Attachments: #1 complaint) (CGJ)
June 2, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Getty Images, iStock by Getty Images. (CGJ)
June 2, 2021 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (CGJ)
June 2, 2021 Case assigned to Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (CGJ)
June 2, 2021 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(CGJ)
June 1, 2021 Filing 2 Original Summons Filed. (Attachments: #1 Original Summons Filed)(Johnsen, Ryan)
June 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants $ 402 receipt number 0209-4262884, filed by Prepared Food Photos, Inc. f/k/a Adlife Marketing & Communications Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Johnsen, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prepared Food Photos, Inc. v. Getty Images et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: iStock by Getty Images
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Getty Images
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prepared Food Photos, Inc. f/k/a Adlife Marketing & Communications Co., Inc.
Represented By: Ryan Johnsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prepared Food Photos, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan Johnsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adlife Marketing & Communications Co., Inc.
Represented By: Ryan Johnsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?