Rath v. Jo-Ann Stores, LLC
Plaintiff: Wendy Rath
Defendant: Jo-Ann Stores, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00791
Filed: July 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: William M Skretny
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Yitzchak Kopel on behalf of Wendy Rath (Kopel, Yitzchak)
August 10, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Alec M. Leslie on behalf of Wendy Rath (Leslie, Alec)
August 9, 2021 Filing 10 TEXT ORDER -- Presently before this Court is the parties' consent motion to extend Defendant's time to answer or otherwise respond to the #1 complaint and to stay further proceedings based on the parties' [2-1] stipulation regarding mediation. Because the parties' [2-1] stipulation complies with 2.1 (C) of this districts ADR Plan, and because this Court finds that the interests of justice are served by early mediation intervention, this Court finds an extension of time to answer and a stay of proceedings warranted. The #9 consent motion is therefore GRANTED. Defendant's time to answer or otherwise respond to the #1 complaint is EXTENDED to November 12, 2021, and further proceedings are STAYED through October 29, 2021, as requested. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, United States District Judge on 8/9/2021. (JCM)
August 5, 2021 E-Filing Notification: Added additional relief requested in #9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint and MOTION to Stay. **Multiple reliefs must be selected when filing a multiple relief motion**. No action required. (TF)
August 4, 2021 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint and stay further proceedings by Jo-Ann Stores, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert Weissflach, #2 Exhibit A - Stipulation Regarding Mediation, #3 Certificate of Service)(Weissflach, Robert). Added MOTION to Stay on 8/5/2021 (TF).
August 4, 2021 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jo-Ann Stores, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Needle Holdings LLC, Corporate Parent JOANN Inc. for Jo-Ann Stores, LLC.. (Weissflach, Robert)
July 22, 2021 Filing 7 TEXT ORDER -- IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that Yitzchak Kopel's and Alec M Leslie's #5 #6 Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice are GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, United States District Judge on 7/22/2021. (JCM)
July 20, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to appear pro hac vice for Alec M. Leslie ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0209-4307778.) by Wendy Rath. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Sponsoring Attorney, #2 Attorney Oath, #3 Civility Oath, #4 Registration Form, #5 Petition)(Debbins, Andrew)
July 20, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to appear pro hac vice for Yitzchak Kopel ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0209-4307772.) by Wendy Rath. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Sponsoring Attorney, #2 Attorney Oath, #3 Civility Oath, #4 Registration Form, #5 Petition)(Debbins, Andrew)
July 20, 2021 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in a Civil Action, Class Action Complaint served on Jo-Ann Stores, LLC on 7/14/2021, filed by Wendy Rath. (Debbins, Andrew)
July 20, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Terrence M. Connors on behalf of Wendy Rath (Connors, Terrence)
July 13, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Jo-Ann Stores, LLC. (TMK)
July 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants $ 402 receipt number 0209-4300446, filed by Wendy Rath. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Debbins, Andrew)
July 13, 2021 Case Assigned to Hon. William M. Skretny. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (TMK)
July 13, 2021 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TMK)
July 13, 2021 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(TMK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rath v. Jo-Ann Stores, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jo-Ann Stores, LLC
Represented By: Robert C. Weissflach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Rath
Represented By: Andrew M. Debbins
Represented By: Terrence M. Connors
Represented By: Alec M. Leslie
Represented By: Yitzchak Kopel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?