United States of America v. $25,348 United States Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $25,348 United States Currency
Claimant: Adel Munassar
Case Number: 1:2021cv00949
Filed: August 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J Vilardo
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2021 Filing 7 CLAIM by $25,348 United States Currency. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(D'Amico, Michael)
October 2, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael L. D'Amico on behalf of $25,348 United States Currency (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(D'Amico, Michael)
September 20, 2021 Filing 5 SERVICE by Publication filed by United States of America. Last publication date September 19, 2021. (Parisi, Paul)
September 7, 2021 Filing 4 ARREST WARRANT IN REM WARRANT Returned Executed as to $25,348 United States Currency. (JLV)
August 27, 2021 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America (Parisi, Paul)
August 24, 2021 WARRANT of ARREST WARRANT IN REM issued by Mary C. Loewenguth, Clerk of Court. Warrant Hearing set for 11/8/2021 09:00 AM in US Courthouse, 2 Niagara Square, Buffalo, NY 14202-3350 before Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. (TMK)
August 23, 2021 Case Assigned to Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (TMK)
August 23, 2021 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TMK)
August 20, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul C. Parisi on behalf of United States of America (Parisi, Paul)
August 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified Complaint For Forfeiture against $25,348 United States Currency, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Arrest Warrant in Rem, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Request for Arrest Warrant in Rem Cover Sheet)(Parisi, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $25,348 United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Paul C. Parisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $25,348 United States Currency
Represented By: Michael L. D'Amico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Adel Munassar
Represented By: Michael L. D'Amico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?