Cichocki v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: JEROME CICHOCKI
Defendant: United States of America, Department of Veteran Affairs, DEPARTMENT OF VETERAN AFFAIRS MEDICAL CENTER, M.D. JOSEPH LING, M.D. CRISTY KU, M.D. MICHAEL L VILARDO, BEAVER-VISITEC INTERNATIONAL, INC., JOHN DOE, M.D. Michael L. Vilardo and John Does
Case Number: 1:2021cv01034
Filed: September 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: William M Skretny
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2671
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2021 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to United States of America. (JLV)
November 3, 2021 Filing 12 Original Summons Filed. (Stocker, Kevin)
October 27, 2021 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Beaver-Visitec International, Inc., Cristy Ku, Joseph Ling, Michael L. Vilardo. (JLV)
October 27, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Department of Veteran Affairs, Department of Veteran Affairs Medical Center, U.S. Attorney. (JLV)
October 26, 2021 Filing 9 Original Summons Filed. (Stocker, Kevin)
October 26, 2021 Filing 8 Original Summons Filed. (Stocker, Kevin)
October 26, 2021 Filing 7 Original Summons Filed. (Stocker, Kevin)
October 26, 2021 Filing 6 Original Summons Filed. (Stocker, Kevin)
October 26, 2021 Filing 5 Original Summons Filed. (Stocker, Kevin)
October 26, 2021 Filing 4 Original Summons Filed. (Stocker, Kevin)
October 26, 2021 Filing 3 Original Summons Filed. (Stocker, Kevin)
September 20, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to United States of America. (TMK)
September 20, 2021 Case Assigned to Hon. William M. Skretny. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (TMK)
September 20, 2021 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(TMK)
September 20, 2021 E-Filing Notification: re #1 COMPLAINT - Attorney is directed to submit summonses for the rest of defendants as they were not submitted, please use the Original Summons Filed event, found under Service of Process. (TMK)
September 20, 2021 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TMK)
September 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants $ 402 receipt number 0209-4363485, filed by JEROME CICHOCKI. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Claim, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons, #4 Affidavit Certificate of Merit)(Stocker, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cichocki v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEROME CICHOCKI
Represented By: Kevin T. Stocker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Veteran Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEPARTMENT OF VETERAN AFFAIRS MEDICAL CENTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. JOSEPH LING
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. CRISTY KU
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. MICHAEL L VILARDO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BEAVER-VISITEC INTERNATIONAL, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. Michael L. Vilardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?