Melber v. Thermo Fisher Scientific
Plaintiff: Edward Melber
Defendant: Thermo Fisher Scientific, Inc., and Thermo Fisher Scientific
Case Number: 1:2021cv01079
Filed: October 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: H Kenneth Schroeder
Referring Judge: John L Sinatra
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 623
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2021 Filing 11 TEXT ORDER re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Thermo Fisher Scientific: Responses due by 12/17/2021; Replies due by 1/7/2022. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder Jr. on 11/9/2021. (KER)
November 9, 2021 Filing 10 TEXT REFERRAL ORDER (DISPOSITIVE) - Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder Jr., United States Magistrate Judge, is hereby designated to act in this case as follows: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), all pre-trial matters in this case are referred to the above-named United States Magistrate Judge, including but not limited to: (1) conduct of a scheduling conference and entry of a scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, (2) hearing and disposition of all non-dispositive motions or applications, (3) supervision of discovery, and (4) supervision of all procedural matters involving the aforementioned or involving the preparation of the case or any matter therein for consideration by the District Judge. The Magistrate Judge shall also hear and report upon dispositive motions for the consideration of the District Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B) and (C). All motions or applications shall be filed with the Clerk and made returnable before the Magistrate Judge. The parties are encouraged to consider the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 636(c) governing consent to either partial or complete disposition of the case, including trial if necessary, by the Magistrate Judge. Consent forms are available from the office of the Magistrate Judge or the office of the Clerk of Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. on 11/9/2021. (KLH)
November 8, 2021 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Thermo Fisher Scientific. (Smith, Mary)
November 8, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIRMATION signed by Mary A. Smith re #7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Thermo Fisher Scientific filed by Thermo Fisher Scientific. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Right To Sue issued by the U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission, #3 Exhibit C - Unreported Cases)(Smith, Mary)
November 8, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Thermo Fisher Scientific.(Smith, Mary)
November 8, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Thermo Fisher Scientific. (Smith, Mary)
October 14, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Thermo Fisher Scientific. (JLV)
October 14, 2021 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution. (JLV)
October 14, 2021 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (JLV)
October 14, 2021 Case Assigned to Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (JLV)
October 13, 2021 Filing 4 Original Summons Filed. (Bogulski, Frank)
October 13, 2021 Filing 3 Original Summons Filed. (Bogulski, Frank)
October 13, 2021 Filing 2 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Edward Melber. to #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet filed by Edward Melber. (Bogulski, Frank)
October 4, 2021 E-Filing Notification: re #1 COMPLAINT - Attorney is directed to file a civil cover sheet, pursuant to Local Rule 3. No judge assignment will be made until filing is entered on the docket. Please utilize the Continuation of Exhibits event, located within the Responses and Replies category.(TMK)
October 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Thermo Fisher Scientific, Inc., $ 402 receipt number 0209-4377661, filed by Edward Melber.(Bogulski, Frank)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Melber v. Thermo Fisher Scientific
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Melber
Represented By: Frank M. Bogulski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thermo Fisher Scientific, Inc.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thermo Fisher Scientific
Represented By: Mary Augusta Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?