Chambers v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Robert Chambers
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2021cv01087
Filed: October 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J Vilardo
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by United States of America.(Roach, Mary)
December 3, 2021 ADR Plan electronically forwarded to attorneys. The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(CGJ)
October 19, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on U. S. Attorney General's Office on October 12, 2021, filed by Robert Chambers. (Hiller, Timothy)
October 12, 2021 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on U. S. Attorney's Office c/o Civil Process Clerk on October 6, 2021, filed by Robert Chambers. (Hiller, Timothy)
October 12, 2021 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on U. S. Attorney's Office on October 6, 2021, filed by Robert Chambers. (Hiller, Timothy)
October 6, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (TMK)
October 6, 2021 Case Assigned to Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (TMK)
October 6, 2021 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(TMK)
October 6, 2021 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TMK)
October 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America $ 402 receipt number 0209-4379225, filed by Robert Chambers. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hiller, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chambers v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Chambers
Represented By: Timothy Hiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Mary K. Roach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?