Crehan et al v. Richardson et al
Plaintiff: Vincent Crehan and Kathryn Ehrig
Defendant: Jeffrey B. Richardson, Ron Giza, Karen Novo, Patrick Dalton, Amalgamated Transit Union Local 1342 Niagara Frontier Transit Metro System Pension Fund, Amalgamated Transit Union Local 1342 Niagara Frontier Transit Metro System Pension Plan, Mark L. Stulmaker, Esq. Jules L. Smith and Jules L. Smith
Case Number: 1:2021cv01201
Filed: November 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J Vilardo
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Stipulation-Selection of Mediator by Vincent Crehan, Kathryn Ehrig (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Walsh, Gerald)
December 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ORDER granting the plaintiffs' #13 motion for an extension of time and denying the motion to stay as moot. The time for the defendants to respond to the motion to remand is extended until 1/17/2022. The time for the plaintiffs to reply in further support of the motion to remand is extended until 1/31/2022. The time for the defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended until 15 days after the motion to remand is resolved. The parties shall submit a status update on their mediation efforts by 2/14/2022. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 12/8/2021. (WMH)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Jenna W. Klucsik on behalf of Mark L. Stulmaker (Klucsik, Jenna)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION to Remand to State Court , Consent MOTION to Stay re #1 Notice of Removal,,, pending Determination of Remand Motion, Consent MOTION Set Scheduling Order on Motion to Remand by Vincent Crehan, Kathryn Ehrig. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Gerald T. Walsh, #3 Exhibit 1 Complaint, #4 Exhibit 2 January 2021 Plan Determinations, #5 Exhibit 3 Plan Appeal Decisions, #6 Exhibit 4 IRS FAQ, #7 Certificate of Service)(Walsh, Gerald)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Edwin P. Hunter on behalf of Jules L. Smith (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hunter, Edwin)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Brady on behalf of Jules L. Smith (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Brady, Michael)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time. The time for the defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended until 12/10/2021. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 11/22/2021. (WMH)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer for All Defendants by Mark L. Stulmaker.(Sutter, Brian)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer by Mark L. Stulmaker. (Sutter, Brian)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian F. Sutter on behalf of Mark L. Stulmaker (Sutter, Brian)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Vincent Crehan, Kathryn Ehrig. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Walsh, Gerald)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Gerald T. Walsh on behalf of Vincent Crehan, Kathryn Ehrig (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Walsh, Gerald)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (CGJ)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Case assigned to Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (CGJ)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(CGJ)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE by Amalgamated Transit Union Local 1342 Niagara Frontier Transit Metro System Pension Fund, Amalgamated Transit Union Local 1342 Niagara Frontier Transit Metro System Pension Plan, Patrick Dalton, Ron Giza, Karen Novo, Jeffrey B. Richardson re #3 Continuation of Exhibits,, #1 Notice of Removal,,, Certificate of Compliance with 28 U.S.C. 1446(d) and Local Rule 81(a) (LaClair, Brian)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Amalgamated Transit Union Local 1342 Niagara Frontier Transit Metro System Pension Fund, Amalgamated Transit Union Local 1342 Niagara Frontier Transit Metro System Pension Plan, Patrick Dalton, Ron Giza, Karen Novo, Jeffrey B. Richardson. Index of State Court Documents filed by Amalgamated Transit Union Local 1342 Niagara Frontier Transit Metro System Pension Fund, Amalgamated Transit Union Local 1342 Niagara Frontier Transit Metro System Pension Plan, Patrick Dalton, Ron Giza, Karen Novo, Jeffrey B. Richardson. (LaClair, Brian)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order E-Filing Notification: re #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL - Action Required: Attorney is directed to file an index identifying State Court documents pursuant to local rule 81(A). (TMK)
November 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE by Amalgamated Transit Union Local 1342 Niagara Frontier Transit Metro System Pension Fund, Amalgamated Transit Union Local 1342 Niagara Frontier Transit Metro System Pension Plan, Patrick Dalton, Ron Giza, Karen Novo, Jeffrey B. Richardson (LaClair, Brian)
November 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Amalgamated Transit Union Local 1342 Niagara Frontier Transit Metro System Pension Fund, Jeffrey B. Richardson, Karen Novo, Patrick Dalton, Amalgamated Transit Union Local 1342 Niagara Frontier Transit Metro System Pension Plan, Ron Giza from New York State Supreme Court, Erie County, case number 814046/2021. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0209-4415742), filed by Amalgamated Transit Union Local 1342 Niagara Frontier Transit Metro System Pension Fund, Jeffrey B. Richardson, Karen Novo, Patrick Dalton, Amalgamated Transit Union Local 1342 Niagara Frontier Transit Metro System Pension Plan, Ron Giza. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Consents to Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(LaClair, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crehan et al v. Richardson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Crehan
Represented By: Gerald T. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Ehrig
Represented By: Gerald T. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey B. Richardson
Represented By: Brian Joseph LaClair
Represented By: Daniel R. Brice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Giza
Represented By: Brian Joseph LaClair
Represented By: Daniel R. Brice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Novo
Represented By: Brian Joseph LaClair
Represented By: Daniel R. Brice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Dalton
Represented By: Brian Joseph LaClair
Represented By: Daniel R. Brice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amalgamated Transit Union Local 1342 Niagara Frontier Transit Metro System Pension Fund
Represented By: Brian Joseph LaClair
Represented By: Daniel R. Brice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amalgamated Transit Union Local 1342 Niagara Frontier Transit Metro System Pension Plan
Represented By: Brian Joseph LaClair
Represented By: Daniel R. Brice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark L. Stulmaker
Represented By: Brian F. Sutter
Represented By: Jenna W. Klucsik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esq. Jules L. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jules L. Smith
Represented By: Michael A. Brady
Represented By: Edwin P. Hunter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?