Green et al v. The Sheraton, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Doris Green, Christina Casero and Individually and on behalf of all other similarly situated
Defendant: The Sheraton LLC, NFNY Hotel Management LLC and The Sheraton, LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv00046
Filed: January 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jeremiah J McCarthy
Referring Judge: John L Sinatra
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Fair Labor Standards
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2022 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Sheraton, LLC. (Sharkey, Stephen)
March 8, 2022 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NFNY Hotel Management LLC. (Sharkey, Stephen)
March 7, 2022 Filing 13 TEXT ORDER: The motion of Kristabel Sandoval, Esq. for pro hac vice admission #9 is granted. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy on 3/7/22. (MDY)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
March 7, 2022 Filing 12 TEXT ORDER: A telephonic status conference is scheduled for April 4, 2022 at 11:00 a.m. To access the teleconference, the parties shall dial 888-808-6929 and enter access code 1533000#. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy on 3/7/22. (MDY)
March 7, 2022 Filing 11 TEXT REFERRAL ORDER (DISPOSITIVE) - Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy, United States Magistrate Judge, is hereby designated to act in this case as follows: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), all pre-trial matters in this case are referred to the above-named United States Magistrate Judge, including but not limited to: (1) conduct of a scheduling conference and entry of a scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, (2) hearing and disposition of all non-dispositive motions or applications, (3) supervision of discovery, and (4) supervision of all procedural matters involving the aforementioned or involving the preparation of the case or any matter therein for consideration by the District Judge. The Magistrate Judge shall also hear and report upon dispositive motions for the consideration of the District Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B) and (C). All motions or applications shall be filed with the Clerk and made returnable before the Magistrate Judge. The parties are encouraged to consider the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 636(c) governing consent to either partial or complete disposition of the case, including trial if necessary, by the Magistrate Judge. Consent forms are available from the office of the Magistrate Judge or the office of the Clerk of Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. on 3/7/2022. (KLH)
March 5, 2022 Filing 10 TEXT ORDER. Case reassigned to Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr.. Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo no longer assigned to the case. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 3/5/2022. (CMD)
March 4, 2022 Filing 9 MOTION to appear pro hac vice Admission of Kristabel Sandoval as counsel for Plaintiff ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-4518155.) by Christina Casero, Doris Green. (Attachments: #1 Applicant's Petition for Admission to Practice, #2 Affidavit Sponsoring Affidavit of Harvey P. Sanders, #3 Civility Principles and Guidelines Oath, #4 Attorney's Oath, #5 Attorney Case Filing Registration Form)(Sanders, Harvey)
March 1, 2022 ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: All Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P.7.1(b) are to be filed within seven (7) days of this notice. (KM)
February 23, 2022 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER re: Stipulation to extend the time to respond to the complaint filed by the defendants, Docket Item #6 , is ordered. The defendants shall answer or otherwise respond by March 21, 2022. The motion to extend the time to respond to the complaint filed by the defendants, Docket Item #5 , is denied as moot. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 2/23/2022. (EK)
February 23, 2022 Filing 7 Letter filed by The Sheraton, LLC, NFNY Hotel Management LLC as to The Sheraton, LLC, NFNY Hotel Management LLC withdrawing motion for extension. (Sharkey, Stephen)
February 22, 2022 Filing 6 STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Complaint by NFNY Hotel Management LLC, The Sheraton, LLC. (Sharkey, Stephen)
February 22, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by NFNY Hotel Management LLC, The Sheraton, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Sharkey Declaration, #2 Exhibit A - email to Sanders 021822, #3 Exhibit B - email to Sanders 022022, #4 Exhibit C - email to counsel 022122, #5 Exhibit D - Lecher Complaint)(Sharkey, Stephen)
February 11, 2022 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of service upon NFNY Hotel Management LLC by Christina Casero, Doris Green. (Sanders, Harvey)
February 11, 2022 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service upon The Sheraton. LLC by Doris Green. (Sanders, Harvey)
January 18, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to NFNY Hotel Management LLC, The Sheraton, LLC. (TMK)
January 18, 2022 Case Assigned to Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (TMK)
January 18, 2022 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(TMK)
January 18, 2022 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TMK)
January 14, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT class action against NFNY Hotel Management LLC, The Sheraton LLC $ 402 receipt number ANYWDC-4475676, filed by Doris Green, Individually and on behalf of all other similarly situated, Christina Casero. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sanders, Harvey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green et al v. The Sheraton, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doris Green
Represented By: Harvey P. Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Casero
Represented By: Harvey P. Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Individually and on behalf of all other similarly situated
Represented By: Harvey P. Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Sheraton LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NFNY Hotel Management LLC
Represented By: Stephen A. Sharkey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Sheraton, LLC
Represented By: Stephen A. Sharkey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?