Doyle et al v. UBS Financial Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Cynthia T Doyle, Molli T. Byrnes, James Weiss and David Welbourn
Defendant: UBS Financial Services, Inc., Jay S. Blair and John N. Blair
Case Number: 1:2022cv00276
Filed: April 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frank P Geraci
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Securities Violation
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jay S. Blair, UBS Financial Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent UBS Financial Services, Inc. for UBS Financial Services, Inc... (Flynn, Terrance)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ORDER adopting the parties' Joint Stipulation Extending Defendants' Time to Respond to Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and the Complaint, ECF No. #17 . Defendants' deadline to respond to the Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction, ECF No. #5 , is hereby extended sine die. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 5/24/2022. (MDS)
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: All Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P.7.1(b) are to be filed within seven (7) days of this notice. (KM)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Terrance P. Flynn on behalf of Jay S. Blair, UBS Financial Services, Inc. (Flynn, Terrance)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation Extending Defendants' Time to Respond to Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction and the Complaint by Molli T. Byrnes, Cynthia T Doyle, James Weiss, David Welbourn. (Milbrand, James)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Motion for TRO and Preliminary Injunction served on Counsel for Defendants UBS and Jay Blair on May 16, 2022, filed by Molli T. Byrnes, Cynthia T Doyle, James Weiss, David Welbourn. (Milbrand, James)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Motion for an Expedited Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for TRO and Preliminary Injunction served on Jay S. Blair on 5/13/2022 (Attempted Service), filed by Molli T. Byrnes, Cynthia T Doyle, James Weiss, David Welbourn. (Milbrand, James)
May 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Motion for an Expedited Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for TRO and Preliminary Injunction served on UBS Financial Services, Inc. on 5/13/2022, filed by Molli T. Byrnes, Cynthia T Doyle, James Weiss, David Welbourn. (Milbrand, James)
May 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiffs filed a motion for a temporary restraining order/preliminary injunction and a motion to expedite on 5/11/2022. ECF Nos. #5 , #6 . To the extent they have not already done so, by 5:00 p.m. on 5/13/2022, Plaintiffs shall personally serve their motions and a copy of this Text Order upon Defendants who have not yet appeared. Plaintiffs shall file an affidavit of service with respect to their motions on or before 5/17/2022. Defendants shall file a response on or before 5/23/2022, and Plaintiffs may file a reply on or before 5/26/2022. The Court will review the parties' submissions and determine if oral argument or a hearing is necessary and, if so, the Court will notify the parties of the date and time. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 5/12/2022. (MDS)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by William V Rossi on behalf of John N. Blair (Rossi, William)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER OF RECUSAL: I hereby recuse myself from further involvement in this matter and ask the Clerk of the Court to reassign this matter to another district judge. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. on 5/12/2022. (KLH)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint with Exhibits served on UBS Financial Services, Inc. on 04/27/2022, filed by Molli T. Byrnes, Cynthia T Doyle, James Weiss, David Welbourn. (Milbrand, James)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Personal Service served on Jay S. Blair on 05/03/2022, filed by Molli T. Byrnes, Cynthia T Doyle, James Weiss, David Welbourn. (Milbrand, James)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by David Welbourn, Cynthia T Doyle, James Weiss, Molli T. Byrnes. John N. Blair waiver sent on 5/2/2022, answer due 7/5/2022. (Milbrand, James)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CORRECTED EXHIBIT A DOYLE AFFIDAVIT re #5 Motion by Molli T. Byrnes, Cynthia T Doyle, James Weiss, David Welbourn.(Milbrand, James) Modified on 5/12/2022 to correct title and terminate as a motion (SG).
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order E-Filing Notification: Document filed improperly as a motion. Court terminated motion and modified docket text to correctly reflect filing event. No action required. #7 CORRECTED EXHIBIT A DOYLE AFFIDAVIT re #5 Motion. (SG)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Case reassigned to Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. (SG)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to Expedite Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction by Molli T. Byrnes, Cynthia T Doyle, James Weiss, David Welbourn. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Milbrand, James)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Molli T. Byrnes, Cynthia T Doyle, James Weiss, David Welbourn. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Affidavit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Memorandum in Support)(Milbrand, James)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Jay S. Blair, John N. Blair, UBS Financial Services, Inc. (TMK)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (TMK)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(TMK)
April 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TMK)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas John DiCesare on behalf of All Plaintiffs (DiCesare, Nicholas)
April 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Molli T. Byrnes, Cynthia T Doyle, James Weiss, David Welbourn. to #1 Complaint,, filed by Molli T. Byrnes, Cynthia T Doyle, James Weiss, David Welbourn. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Milbrand, James)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants $ 402 receipt number ANYWDC-4551565, filed by David Welbourn, Cynthia T Doyle, James Weiss, Molli T. Byrnes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B-1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B-2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Exhibit Q, #19 Civil Cover Sheet)(Milbrand, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doyle et al v. UBS Financial Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia T Doyle
Represented By: James P. Milbrand
Represented By: Nicholas John DiCesare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Molli T. Byrnes
Represented By: James P. Milbrand
Represented By: Nicholas John DiCesare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Weiss
Represented By: James P. Milbrand
Represented By: Nicholas John DiCesare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Welbourn
Represented By: James P. Milbrand
Represented By: Nicholas John DiCesare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UBS Financial Services, Inc.
Represented By: Terrance P. Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay S. Blair
Represented By: Terrance P. Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John N. Blair
Represented By: William V Rossi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?