K. Petroleum, Inc. et al v. Lenape Gathering Corp. et al
Plaintiff: K. Petroleum, Inc. and E-ZAD Energy Corporation
Defendant: Lenape Gathering Corp. and PPP Future Development, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv00334
Filed: May 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Michael J Roemer
Referring Judge: Lawrence J Vilardo
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by E-ZAD Energy Corporation, K. Petroleum, Inc.. (Haselhoff, Christopher)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of ORAL ARGUMENT re: MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION held on 6/7/22, before Judge Lawrence J. Vilardo. Court Reporter/Transcriber Ann M. Sawyer, Ann_Sawyer@nywd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/6/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/18/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/13/2022. (AS)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Lenape Gathering Corp., PPP Future Development, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Holko Supplemental Dec.)(Pullen, Seth)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander L. Holmquist on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Holmquist, Alexander)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo: Oral Argument re: #5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Following oral argument, Court directed defendants' supplemental submission, if any, to be filed by 6/13/2022. Plaintiffs' reply, if any, is due by 6/17/2022. Court will take matter under advisement. Appearances. For plaintiffs: Christopher J. Haselhoff. For defendants: Seth D. Pullen and Scott J. Bogucki. Also present, is John Holka, President of Lenape Gathering. (Court Reporter Ann M. Sawyer.) (CMD)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 RESPONSE in Support re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by E-ZAD Energy Corporation, K. Petroleum, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Haselhoff, Christopher)
May 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Memorandum of Law in Opposition filed by Lenape Gathering Corp., PPP Future Development, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of John Holko In Opposition, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of John Holko, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Declaration of John Holko, #4 Affidavit Attorney Affirmation of Seth D. Pullen in Opposition, #5 Exhibit Exhibit A to Pullen Affirmation, #6 Exhibit Exhibit B to Pullen Affirmation)(Pullen, Seth)
May 19, 2022 Opinion or Order E-Filing Notification: Incorrect events used to electronically file documents. For future reference, use (Corporate Disclosure Statement) event, found under Other Filings, Other Documents. No action required. #17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by PPP Future Development, Inc. and #16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Lenape Gathering Corp.. (Pullen, Seth) Modified titles on 5/19/2022 (SG). (SG)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott James Bogucki on behalf of Lenape Gathering Corp., PPP Future Development, Inc. (Bogucki, Scott)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by PPP Future Development, Inc.. (Pullen, Seth) Modified title on 5/19/2022 (SG).
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Lenape Gathering Corp.. (Pullen, Seth) Modified title on 5/19/2022 (SG).
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Seth D. Pullen on behalf of All Defendants (Pullen, Seth)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by E-ZAD Energy Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Haselhoff, Christopher)
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by K. Petroleum, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Haselhoff, Christopher)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by K. Petroleum, Inc., E-ZAD Energy Corporation. PPP Future Development, Inc. waiver sent on 5/6/2022, answer due 7/5/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Haselhoff, Christopher)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by K. Petroleum, Inc., E-ZAD Energy Corporation. Lenape Gathering Corp. waiver sent on 5/6/2022, answer due 7/5/2022. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Haselhoff, Christopher)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher J Haselhoff on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Haselhoff, Christopher)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT REFERRAL ORDER - Hon. Michael J. Roemer, United States Magistrate Judge, is hereby designated to act in this case as follows: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), all pre-trial matters in this case are referred to the above-named United States Magistrate Judge, including but not limited to: (1) conduct of a scheduling conference and entry of a scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, (2) hearing and disposition of all non-dispositive motions or applications, (3) supervision of discovery, and (4) supervision of all procedural matters involving the aforementioned or involving the preparation of the case or any matter therein for consideration by the District Judge. The Magistrate Judge shall not hear and report upon dispositive motions for the consideration of the District Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B) and (C), unless further ordered by this Court. All motions or applications shall be filed with the Clerk and made returnable before the Magistrate Judge. The parties are encouraged to consider the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 636(c) governing consent to either partial or complete disposition of the case, including trial if necessary, by the Magistrate Judge. Consent forms are available from the office of the Magistrate Judge or the office of the Clerk of Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 5/10/2022. (CMD)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo: Status Conference re: #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and #6 Motion for Expedited Hearing held on 5/9/2022. Court ordered that this proceeding is not to be recorded, or taped in any way. If someone does record it, they will be found in contempt of court. Court granted Attorney Haselhoff's petition for admission to the Western District of New York. Following discussions with parties, Court set following briefing schedule: Defendants' responses are due by 5/23/2022. Plaintiff's replies are due by 5/31/2022. Oral Argument (in person) set for 6/7/2022 at 11:00 AM in U.S. Courthouse, 2 Niagara Square, Buffalo, NY 14202-3350 before Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Court will assign a magistrate judge to assist with settlement discussions, or parties may select a mediator. Appearances. For plaintiffs: Christopher Haselhoff appearing with Principal Owner, Jam Khorrami. For defendants: Seth Pullen with John Holka, President of Lenape Gathering. (Court Reporter Ann M. Sawyer.) (CMD)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER. Status Conference set for 5/9/2022 at 10:30 AM in U.S. Courthouse, 2 Niagara Square, Buffalo, NY 14202-3350 before Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. PLEASE NOTE: The proceeding described herein will be held remotely. Dial-in instructions will be emailed directly to the parties. Public access to the proceeding can be obtained by viewing Judge Vilardo's calendar on the public website at www.nywd.uscourts.gov, or by contacting Judge Vilardo's chambers at (716) 551-1621. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 5/9/2022. (CMD)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: All Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P.7.1(b) are to be filed within seven (7) days of this notice. (KM)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to Expedite Hearing by E-ZAD Energy Corporation, K. Petroleum, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Christopher Haselhoff, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Tarney, Tyler)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by E-ZAD Energy Corporation, K. Petroleum, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit Witness/Exhibit List, #4 Declaration Christopher Haselhoff, #5 Declaration JamKhorrami, #6 Text of Proposed Order, #7 Certificate of Service)(Tarney, Tyler)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Lenape Gathering Corp., PPP Future Development, Inc. (TMK)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (TMK)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(TMK)
May 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TMK)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Original Summons Filed. (Tarney, Tyler)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Original Summons Filed. (Tarney, Tyler)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants $ 402 receipt number ANYWDC-4570604, filed by K. Petroleum, Inc., E-ZAD Energy Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I)(Tarney, Tyler)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: K. Petroleum, Inc. et al v. Lenape Gathering Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K. Petroleum, Inc.
Represented By: Alexander L. Holmquist
Represented By: Christopher J Haselhoff
Represented By: Tyler Tarney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E-ZAD Energy Corporation
Represented By: Alexander L. Holmquist
Represented By: Christopher J Haselhoff
Represented By: Tyler Tarney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lenape Gathering Corp.
Represented By: Seth D. Pullen
Represented By: Scott James Bogucki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PPP Future Development, Inc.
Represented By: Seth D. Pullen
Represented By: Scott James Bogucki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?