United States of America v. $12,669 United States Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $12,669 United States Currency
Claimant: James Quinn
Case Number: 1:2022cv00791
Filed: October 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J Vilardo
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21 U.S.C. ยง 881 Forfeiture Property-Drugs
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2022 Filing 8 SERVICE by Publication filed by United States of America. Last publication date 11/24/2022. (Kane, Mary)
October 27, 2022 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America Amended Certificate of Service (Kane, Mary)
October 26, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy D. Schwartz on behalf of James Quinn (Schwartz, Jeremy)
October 26, 2022 Filing 5 CLAIM by James Quinn (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Schwartz, Jeremy) Modified on 10/26/2022 (CGJ).
October 26, 2022 E-Filing Notification:re #5 Docket text modified to correct filer (CGJ)
October 26, 2022 ARREST WARRANT IN REM reissued by Mary C. Loewenguth, Clerk of Court. Warrant Hearing set for 1/9/2023 09:00 AM in US Courthouse, 2 Niagara Square, Buffalo, NY 14202-3350 before Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. (CGJ)
October 25, 2022 Filing 4 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by United States of America. to #1 Complaint, Amended Arrest Warrant In Rem filed by United States of America. (Kane, Mary)
October 25, 2022 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America (Kane, Mary)
October 24, 2022 Case Assigned to Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (TMK)
October 24, 2022 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TMK)
October 24, 2022 ARREST WARRANT IN REM issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Warrant Hearing set for 1/9/2023 09:00 AM in US Courthouse, 2 Niagara Square, Buffalo, NY 14202-3350 before Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. (TMK)
October 21, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary C. Kane on behalf of United States of America (Kane, Mary)
October 21, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Civil Forfeiture Complaint against $12,669 United States Currency, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Forfeiture In Rem Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Arrest Warrant In Rem)(Kane, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $12,669 United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Mary C. Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $12,669 United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: James Quinn
Represented By: Jeremy D. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?