Boone v. AllPro Parking, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Dwayne Boone
Defendant: AllPro Parking, LLC, AllPro Parking Holdings, LLC and Premium Partner Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv00862
Filed: November 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J Vilardo
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2023 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by AllPro Parking Holdings, LLC, AllPro Parking, LLC, Premium Partner Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Premium Parking for AllPro Parking Holdings, LLC.. (Ryan, Andrew)
January 6, 2023 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by AllPro Parking Holdings, LLC, AllPro Parking, LLC, Premium Partner Holdings, LLC.(Ryan, Andrew)
December 19, 2022 ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS OR INTERVENORS: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P.7.1 and/or General Order No. 157. In the Matter of Disclosure of Members, Shareholders, Partners, and Leaders of Business Organization Parties, all Corporate Disclosure Statements are to be filed within seven (7) days of this notice. (KM)
December 16, 2022 Filing 4 TEXT ORDER: The stipulation filed by the defendants extending the defendants' time to answer or otherwise response to the complaint until 1/6/2023, Docket Item #3 , is ordered. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 12/16/2022. (DJ)
December 15, 2022 Filing 3 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer or Otherwise Appear by AllPro Parking Holdings, LLC, AllPro Parking, LLC, Premium Partner Holdings, LLC. (Ryan, Andrew)
November 14, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to AllPro Parking Holdings, LLC, AllPro Parking, LLC, Premium Partner Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 summons, #2 summons)(SG)
November 14, 2022 Case assigned to Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (SG)
November 14, 2022 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(SG)
November 14, 2022 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (SG)
November 10, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AllPro Parking Holdings, LLC, AllPro Parking, LLC, Premium Partner Holdings, LLC $ 402 receipt number ANYWDC-4722018, filed by Dwayne Boone. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Opt-In Consent of Dwayne Boone, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Request for Summons Upon AllPro Parking, LLC, #4 Exhibit Request for Summons Upon AllPro Parking Holdings, LLC, #5 Exhibit Request for Summons Upon Premium Partner Holdings, LLC)(Gallaway, Brett)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boone v. AllPro Parking, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwayne Boone
Represented By: Brett Reed Gallaway
Represented By: Charles Kellett
Represented By: Jason Giaimo
Represented By: Lee Shalov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AllPro Parking, LLC
Represented By: Andrew J. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AllPro Parking Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Andrew J. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premium Partner Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Andrew J. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?