Lettieri v. Bonanno
Petitioner: David C. Lettieri
Respondent: Paul E. Bonanno
Case Number: 1:2022cv00926
Filed: November 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J Vilardo
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2023 Filing 5 Letter from David C. Lettieri. (JLV)
December 29, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by David C. Lettieri.(SG)
December 8, 2022 Filing 3 JUDGMENT in favor of Paul E. Bonanno against David C. Lettieri. Signed by Mary C. Loewenguth, Clerk of Court on 12/8/22. (SG)This was mailed to: Petitioner.
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER case shall be administratively terminated; plaintiff shall notify the Court in writing no later than than thirty days if he wishes to reopen the action and shall include either a motion to proceed in forma pauperis that includes a completed and signed Prison Certification or the $5.00 filing fee; upon receipt of the motion or the filing fee, the Clerk of Court shall re-open the case.. Signed by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 12/8/22. (SG)This was mailed to: Petitioner
December 2, 2022 Pro Se Packet Mailed to Plaintiff which included: Privacy Notice, Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge, Civil Case Timeline. (SG)
November 29, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by David C. Lettieri.(SG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lettieri v. Bonanno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: David C. Lettieri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Paul E. Bonanno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?