Chason Management, LLC et al v. Federal Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Chason Management, LLC, Ken-Vil Associates Limited Partnership Ken-Vil Associates Limited Partnership doing business as Kensington Village Apartments, CVMAR I LLC CVMAR I LLC doing business as Collegiate Village, CVMAR II LLC CVMAR II LLC doing business as Collegiate Village, Ken-Vil Associates Limited Partnership doing business as Kensington Village Apartments, CVMAR I LLC doing business as Collegiate Village and CVMAR II LLC doing business as Collegiate Village
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2023cv00664
Filed: July 7, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: John L Sinatra
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 635 Breach of Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2023 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Federal Insurance Company.(Paliotta, Andrew)
August 31, 2023 ADR Plan electronically forwarded to attorneys. The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution. (JLV)
August 2, 2023 Filing 11 First MOTION to appear pro hac vice for Paul Ferland ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-4939644.) by Federal Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Admission Petition of P. Ferland, #2 Affidavit Paliotta Sponsoring Affidavit, #3 Attorney's Oath, #4 Civility Principles and Guidelines Oath, #5 Attorney Database and ECF Registration Form)(Paliotta, Andrew)
July 26, 2023 Filing 10 TEXT ORDER re #6 MOTION to Seal Document Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement filed by Chason Management, LLC, CVMAR II LLC, Ken-Vil Associates Limited Partnership, CVMAR I LLC. Defendant's response, if any, is due 8/9/2023. Any reply is due 8/16/2023. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. on 7/26/2023. (CJG)
July 26, 2023 Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Federal Insurance Company's time to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is extended to 8/31/2023. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. on 7/26/2023. (CJG)
July 25, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew S. Paliotta on behalf of Federal Insurance Company (Paliotta, Andrew)
July 25, 2023 Filing 7 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Federal Insurance Company.(Paliotta, Andrew)
July 19, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION to Seal Document Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by CVMAR I LLC, CVMAR II LLC, Chason Management, LLC, Ken-Vil Associates Limited Partnership. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Redacted Disclosure, #3 Exhibit B - To be filed under seal, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Berloth, Christopher)
July 17, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by CVMAR II LLC, Chason Management, LLC, CVMAR I LLC, Ken-Vil Associates Limited Partnership. Federal Insurance Company served on 7/11/2023, answer due 8/1/2023. (Berloth, Christopher)
July 12, 2023 ATTENTION ALL PLAINTIFFS OR INTERVENORS: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P.7.1 and/or General Order No. 157. In the Matter of Disclosure of Members, Shareholders, Partners, and Leaders of Business Organization Parties, all Disclosure Statements are to be filed within seven (7) days of this notice. (KM)
July 10, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Federal Insurance Company. (TMK)
July 10, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Derick R. White on behalf of CVMAR I LLC, CVMAR II LLC, Chason Management, LLC, Ken-Vil Associates Limited Partnership (White, Derick)
July 10, 2023 Case Assigned to Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (TMK)
July 10, 2023 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TMK)
July 10, 2023 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(TMK)
July 7, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristine N. Celeste on behalf of CVMAR I LLC, CVMAR II LLC, Chason Management, LLC, Ken-Vil Associates Limited Partnership (Celeste, Kristine)
July 7, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Federal Insurance Company $ 402 receipt number ANYWDC-4918346, filed by CVMAR II LLC, Chason Management, LLC, CVMAR I LLC, Ken-Vil Associates Limited Partnership. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Berloth, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chason Management, LLC et al v. Federal Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chason Management, LLC
Represented By: Kristine N. Celeste
Represented By: Christopher M. Berloth
Represented By: Derick R. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ken-Vil Associates Limited Partnership Ken-Vil Associates Limited Partnership doing business as Kensington Village Apartments
Represented By: Kristine N. Celeste
Represented By: Christopher M. Berloth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CVMAR I LLC CVMAR I LLC doing business as Collegiate Village
Represented By: Kristine N. Celeste
Represented By: Christopher M. Berloth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CVMAR II LLC CVMAR II LLC doing business as Collegiate Village
Represented By: Kristine N. Celeste
Represented By: Christopher M. Berloth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ken-Vil Associates Limited Partnership doing business as Kensington Village Apartments
Represented By: Christopher M. Berloth
Represented By: Derick R. White
Represented By: Kristine N. Celeste
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CVMAR I LLC doing business as Collegiate Village
Represented By: Christopher M. Berloth
Represented By: Derick R. White
Represented By: Kristine N. Celeste
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CVMAR II LLC doing business as Collegiate Village
Represented By: Derick R. White
Represented By: Kristine N. Celeste
Represented By: Christopher M. Berloth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Represented By: Paul Ferland
Represented By: Andrew S. Paliotta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?