Transit Employees Federal Credit Union v. Pentagon Federal Credit Union et al
Plaintiff: TRANSIT EMPLOYEES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION, 6404 Ivy Lane, Greenbelt, Maryland and Transit Employees Federal Credit Union
Defendant: PENTAGON FEDERAL CREDIT UNION, 7940 Jones Branch Drive, McLean, Virginia 22012, LOANSTREET, INC., c/o Corporation Service Company, 251 Little Falls Drive, Wilmington, Delaware 19808, Pentagon Federal Credit Union and Loanstreet, Inc
Case Number: 1:2023cv01118
Filed: October 25, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J Vilardo
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2023 Filing 16 MOTION to appear pro hac vice for Attorney Courtney M. Brown ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-5064182.) by Pentagon Federal Credit Union. (Attachments: #1 Admission Petition Form of Courtney M. Brown, #2 Sponsoring Affidavit, #3 Affidavit of Courtney M. Brown with Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Attorney's Oath, #5 Civility Principles Oath of Office, #6 Electronic Case Filing Registration, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Trouba, Rachel)
December 21, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION to appear pro hac vice for Attorney Daniel C. Green ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-5064181.) by Pentagon Federal Credit Union. (Attachments: #1 Admission Petition Form of Daniel C. Green, #2 Sponsoring Affidavit, #3 Affidavit of Daniel C. Green with Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Attorney's Oath, #5 Civility Principles Oath of Office, #6 Electronic Case Filing Registration, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Trouba, Rachel)
December 19, 2023 Filing 14 TEXT ORDER granting the defendants' motion, Docket Item #10 , for an extension of time to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint. Answer or response due by 2/1/2024. No further extensions will be granted absent plaintiff's consent or a personal appearance before this Court during which the defendants must demonstrate good cause for a further extension. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 12/19/2023. (DJ)
December 15, 2023 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Transit Employees Federal Credit Union. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Email, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Hirsch v. Campaniello Soho Inc. Et Al 02.17.15, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Motion for Sanctions, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Hirsch Docket, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - Hollander Docket, #6 Certificate of Service 12.15.2023 - Certificate of Service)(Luis, Anthony)
December 15, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney: Diane Beckman Carvell no longer appearing for Plaintiff Transit Employees Federal Credit Union. CLERK TO FOLLOW UP. (Luis, Anthony)
December 12, 2023 Filing 11 TEXT ORDER re: #10 Defendants' Motion for an Extension of Time. The defendants' deadline to answer or respond to the complaint is extended until 12/26/2023. The plaintiff may respond to the defendants' motion for an extension of time by 12/15/2023. The Court then will consider granting an extension of time to answer or respond to the complaint until 2/1/2024. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 12/12/2023. (DJ)
December 6, 2023 Filing 10 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer / Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Pentagon Federal Credit Union. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Certificate of Service)(Trouba, Rachel)
December 1, 2023 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pentagon Federal Credit Union. (Trouba, Rachel)
December 1, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel M. Trouba on behalf of Pentagon Federal Credit Union (Trouba, Rachel)
November 29, 2023 Filing 7 TEXT ORDER: The stipulation, Docket Item #6 , extending the defendants' time to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint to 12/18/2023 is SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 11/29/2023. (DJ)
November 28, 2023 Filing 6 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by Pentagon Federal Credit Union. (Trouba, Rachel)
November 8, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony D. Luis on behalf of Transit Employees Federal Credit Union (Luis, Anthony)
October 31, 2023 ATTENTION ALL PARTIES OR INTERVENORS: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 and/or General Order No. 157 In the Matter of Disclosure of Members, Shareholders, Partners, and Leaders of Business Organization Parties, all Disclosure Statements are to be filed with first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (KM)
October 26, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Loanstreet, Inc., Pentagon Federal Credit Union. (TMK)
October 26, 2023 Case Assigned to Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (TMK)
October 26, 2023 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation: the ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(TMK)
October 26, 2023 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TMK)
October 25, 2023 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TRANSIT EMPLOYEES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION, 6404 Ivy Lane, Greenbelt, Maryland identifying Corporate Parent TRANSIT EMPLOYEES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION, 6404 Ivy Lane, Greenbelt, Maryland for TRANSIT EMPLOYEES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION, 6404 Ivy Lane, Greenbelt, Maryland.. (Carvell, Diane)
October 25, 2023 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TRANSIT EMPLOYEES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION, 6404 Ivy Lane, Greenbelt, Maryland identifying Corporate Parent TRANSIT EMPLOYEES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION, 6404 Ivy Lane, Greenbelt, Maryland for TRANSIT EMPLOYEES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION, 6404 Ivy Lane, Greenbelt, Maryland.. (Carvell, Diane)
October 25, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LOANSTREET, INC., c/o Corporation Service Company, 251 Little Falls Drive, Wilmington, Delaware 19808, PENTAGON FEDERAL CREDIT UNION, 7940 Jones Branch Drive, McLean, Virginia 22012 $ 402 receipt number CNYWDC-5010583, filed by TRANSIT EMPLOYEES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION, 6404 Ivy Lane, Greenbelt, Maryland. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Summons)(Carvell, Diane)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Transit Employees Federal Credit Union v. Pentagon Federal Credit Union et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRANSIT EMPLOYEES FEDERAL CREDIT UNION, 6404 Ivy Lane, Greenbelt, Maryland
Represented By: Diane Beckman Carvell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Transit Employees Federal Credit Union
Represented By: Anthony D. Luis
Represented By: Diane Beckman Carvell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PENTAGON FEDERAL CREDIT UNION, 7940 Jones Branch Drive, McLean, Virginia 22012
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOANSTREET, INC., c/o Corporation Service Company, 251 Little Falls Drive, Wilmington, Delaware 19808
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pentagon Federal Credit Union
Represented By: Rachel M. Trouba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loanstreet, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?