Tonawanda Seneca Nation v. United States Fish and Wildlife Service et al
Plaintiff: Tonawanda Seneca Nation
Defendant: Fish and Wildlife Service, Martha Williams, Thomas Roster, Scott Kahan, Holly Gaboriault, Deb Haaland and United States Fish and Wildlife Service
Case Number: 1:2023cv01236
Filed: November 29, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J Vilardo
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 4321 Review of Agency Action-Environment
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2024 Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting the defendants' motion, Docket Item #11 , for an extension of time to respond to the complaint. Response due by 2/26/2024. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 1/23/2024. (DJ)
January 22, 2024 Filing 11 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Holly Gaboriault, Deb Haaland, Scott Kahan, Thomas Roster, United States Fish and Wildlife Service, Martha Williams. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in support of motion for extension of time to answer)(Brocker, Peter)
December 27, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter W. Brocker on behalf of All Defendants (Brocker, Peter)
December 8, 2023 Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Hillary W. Aidun and #6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Gussie A. Lord. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 12/8/2023. (CMD)This was mailed to: Hillary W. Aidun and Gussie A. Lord.Clerk to Follow up
December 5, 2023 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, summons, civil cover sheet, exhibit list, exhibits served on Fish and Wildlife Service, Martha Williams, Thomas Roster, Scott Kahan, Holly Gaboriault, Deb Haaland, Merrick Garland, Trini E. Ross on 12/01/2023, filed by Tonawanda Seneca Nation. (Heaps, Jill)
November 30, 2023 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Holly Gaboriault, Deb Haaland, Scott Kahan, Thomas Roster, United States Fish and Wildlife Service, Martha Williams, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (TMK)
November 30, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION to appear pro hac vice ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-5042572.) by Tonawanda Seneca Nation. (Attachments: #1 Sponsoring Affidavit, #2 Attorney's Oath, #3 Petition for Admission, #4 ECF Registration Form, #5 Civility Principles Oath)(Heaps, Jill)
November 30, 2023 Filing 5 MOTION to appear pro hac vice ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-5042546.) by Tonawanda Seneca Nation. (Attachments: #1 ECF Registration Form, #2 Petition, #3 Appendix to Civility Principles Oath, #4 Affidavit Sponsoring Affidavit, #5 Attorney's Oath)(Heaps, Jill)
November 30, 2023 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation: the ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(TMK)
November 30, 2023 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TMK)
November 30, 2023 Case Assigned to Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (TMK)
November 29, 2023 Filing 4 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS to #1 Complaint,, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit AF, #2 Exhibit AG, #3 Exhibit AH, #4 Exhibit AI, #5 Exhibit AJ, #6 Exhibit AK, #7 Errata AL, #8 Exhibit AM, #9 Exhibit AN, #10 Exhibit AO, #11 Exhibit AP, #12 Exhibit AQ)(Heaps, Jill)
November 29, 2023 Filing 3 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS to #1 Complaint,, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit AA, #2 Exhibit AB, #3 Exhibit AC, #4 Exhibit AD, #5 Exhibit AE)(Heaps, Jill)
November 29, 2023 Filing 2 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS to #1 Complaint,, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit K, #2 Exhibit L, #3 Exhibit M, #4 Exhibit N, #5 Exhibit O, #6 Exhibit P, #7 Exhibit Q, #8 Exhibit R, #9 Exhibit S, #10 Exhibit T, #11 Exhibit U, #12 Exhibit V, #13 Exhibit W, #14 Exhibit X, #15 Exhibit Y, #16 Exhibit Z)(Heaps, Jill)
November 29, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Fish and Wildlife Service, Holly Gaboriault, Deb Haaland, Scott Kahan, Thomas Roster, Martha Williams $ 402 receipt number ANYWDC-5042111, filed by Tonawanda Seneca Nation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Exhibit List, #11 Exhibit Exhibit A, #12 Exhibit Exhibit B, #13 Exhibit Exhibit C, #14 Exhibit Exhibit D, #15 Exhibit Exhibit E, #16 Exhibit Exhibit F, #17 Exhibit Exhibit G, #18 Exhibit Exhibit H, #19 Exhibit Exhibit I, #20 Exhibit Exhibit J)(Heaps, Jill)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tonawanda Seneca Nation v. United States Fish and Wildlife Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonawanda Seneca Nation
Represented By: Jill Witkowski Heaps
Represented By: Gussie A. Lord
Represented By: Hillary W. Aidun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fish and Wildlife Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martha Williams
Represented By: Peter W. Brocker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Roster
Represented By: Peter W. Brocker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Kahan
Represented By: Peter W. Brocker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holly Gaboriault
Represented By: Peter W. Brocker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deb Haaland
Represented By: Peter W. Brocker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Fish and Wildlife Service
Represented By: Peter W. Brocker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?