Dowd et al v. County of Niagara et al
Plaintiff: Nicholas Dowd, Noble Sky Core LLC, Nicholas R. Dowd and Cheryl Bolton
Defendant: County of Niagara, Treasurer Kyle R. Andrews and Kyle R. Andrews
Case Number: 1:2024cv00037
Filed: January 9, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: John L Sinatra
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 20, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2024 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Summons, Civil Cover Sheet served on Kyle R. Andrews, Treasurer on 1/23/24, filed by Cheryl Bolton, Nicholas R. Dowd, Noble Sky Core LLC. (Giglio, David)
February 20, 2024 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Summons, Civil Cover Sheet served on Ashlee Pappas for County of Niagara on 1/23/24, filed by Cheryl Bolton, Nicholas R. Dowd, Noble Sky Core LLC. (Giglio, David)
February 20, 2024 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Summons, Civil Cover Sheet served on Kyle R. Andrews, Treasurer on 1/23/24, filed by Cheryl Bolton, Nicholas R. Dowd, Noble Sky Core LLC. (Giglio, David)
February 20, 2024 E-Filing Notification re #10 AFFIDAVIT of Service. Incorrect .pdf file attached to entry (duplicate of #11 ) Action required: re-file entry with correct attachment. (CGJ)
February 19, 2024 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Nicholas Dowd, Noble Sky Core LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Giglio, David)
February 10, 2024 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting the parties' joint #7 Motion to Amend or Correct and Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Court endorses the relief requested in the parties' joint motion. In sum, Plaintiffs shall amend their complaint by 3/11/2024. Defendants shall respond to the amended complaint within 60 days of Plaintiffs filing that pleading, and need not respond to the original complaint in the meantime. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. on 2/10/2024. (KEF)
February 9, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint, , MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Kyle R. Andrews, County of Niagara. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Joint Stipulated Order)(Crosby, Brian)
February 8, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Elisha D. Teibel on behalf of Kyle R. Andrews, County of Niagara (Teibel, Elisha)
February 8, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa M. Morton on behalf of Kyle R. Andrews, County of Niagara (Morton, Melissa)
February 8, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian P. Crosby on behalf of Kyle R. Andrews, County of Niagara (Crosby, Brian)
January 23, 2024 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nicholas Dowd, Noble Sky Core LLC. (Giglio, David)
January 22, 2024 ATTENTION ALL PLAINTIFFS OR INTERVENORS: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P.7.1 and/or General Order No. 157. In the Matter of Disclosure of Members, Shareholders, Partners, and Leaders of Business Organization Parties, all Disclosure Statements are to be filed within seven (7) days of this notice. (KM)
January 10, 2024 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Kyle R. Andrews and County of Niagara. (TMK)
January 10, 2024 Case Assigned to Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (TMK)
January 10, 2024 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation: the ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(TMK)
January 10, 2024 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TMK)
January 9, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Dowd et al against Kyle R. Andrews, County of Niagara $ 405 receipt number ANYWDC-5075520, filed by Nicholas Dowd, Noble Sky Core LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Proposed Summons, #3 Exhibit Proposed Summons)(Giglio, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dowd et al v. County of Niagara et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Dowd
Represented By: David M. Giglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noble Sky Core LLC
Represented By: David M. Giglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas R. Dowd
Represented By: David M. Giglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Bolton
Represented By: David M. Giglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Niagara
Represented By: Brian P. Crosby
Represented By: Elisha D. Teibel
Represented By: Melissa M. Morton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Treasurer Kyle R. Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle R. Andrews
Represented By: Brian P. Crosby
Represented By: Elisha D. Teibel
Represented By: Melissa M. Morton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?