Consumer Financial Protection Bureau et al v. Stratfs, LLC (f/k/a Strategic Financial Solutions, LLC), et al
Plaintiff: Consumer Financial Protection Bureau, The People of the State of New York, State of Colorado, State of Delaware, The People of the State of Illinois, The State of Minnesota, The State of North Carolina and The State of Wisconsin
Defendant: Stratfs, LLC, Strategic Client Support, LLC, Strategic Financial Solutions, LLC, Pioneer Client Services, LLC, Strategic CS, LLC, Strategic FS Buffalo, LLC, Strategic NYC, LLC, BCF Capital, LLC, T Fin, LLC, Strategic Consulting, LLC, Versara Lending, LLC, Strategic Family, Inc.,, Anchor Client Services, LLC, Bedrock Client Services, LLC, Boulder Client Services, LLC, Canyon Client Services, LLC, Carolina Client Services, LLC, Great Lakes Client Services, LLC, Guidestone Client Services, LLC, Harbor Client Services, LLC, Heartland Client Services, LLC, Monarch Client Services, LLC, Newport Client Services, LLC, Northstar Client Services, LLC, Option 1 Client Services, LLC, Pioneer Client Servicing, LLC, Rockwell Client Services, LLC, Royal Client Services, LLC, Stonepoint Client Services, LLC, Summit Client Services, LLC, Whitestone Client Services, LLC, Ryan Sasson, Jason Blust, John Does 1-50, Daniel Blumkin, Albert Ian Behar, Strategic ESOP, Strategic ESOT, Twist Financial, LLC, Duke Enterprises, LLC, Blaise Investments, LLC, The Blust Family Irrevocable Trust through Donald J. Holmgren, Trustee, Jaclyn Blust, Lit Def Strategies, LLC, Relialit, LLC, Clear Creek Legal, LLC, Credit Advocates Law Firm, LLC, Greenstone Legal Group, Bradon Ellis Law Firm LLC, Hailstone Legal Group, Hallock and Associates, Harbor Legal Group, Anchor Law Firm, PLLC, Bedrock Legal Group, Boulder Legal Group, Canyon Legal Group, LLC, Great Lakes Law Firm, Heartland Legal Group, Level One Law, Meadowbrook Legal Group, Monarch Legal Group, Newport Legal Group, LLC, Northstar Legal Group, Option 1 Legal, Pioneer Law Firm P.C., Rockwell Legal Group, Spring Legal Group, Royal Legal Group, Slate Legal Group, Stonepoint Legal Group, The Law Firm of Derek Williams, LLC, Whitstone Legal Group, Wyolaw, LLC, Chinn Legal Group, LLC, Leigh Legal Group, PLLC, Hallock & Associates LLC, Gustafson Consumer Law Group, LLC, Michel Law, LLC, The Law Office of Melissa Michel LLC and Moore Legal Group, LLC
Petitioner: Fidelis Legal Support Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2024cv00040
Filed: January 10, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Michael J Roemer
Referring Judge: John L Sinatra
2 Judge: Elizabeth A Wolford
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 6102 Telemarketing rules
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 22, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 198 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #184 Preliminary Injunction, #183 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Jason Blust. Filing fee $ 605, receipt number ANYWDC-5125389. (Personius, Rodney)
March 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 197 Letter filed by Option 1 Client Services, LLC, Northstar Client Services, LLC, Anchor Client Services, LLC, Great Lakes Client Services, LLC, Strategic Consulting, LLC, BCF Capital, LLC, Guidestone Client Services, LLC, Strategic Family, Inc.,, Newport Client Services, LLC, Rockwell Client Services, LLC, Strategic Client Support, LLC, Heartland Client Services, LLC, Strategic NYC, LLC, Versara Lending, LLC, T Fin, LLC, Monarch Client Services, LLC, Carolina Client Services, LLC, Harbor Client Services, LLC, Whitestone Client Services, LLC, Strategic FS Buffalo, LLC, Canyon Client Services, LLC, Bedrock Client Services, LLC, Boulder Client Services, LLC, Strategic CS, LLC, Royal Client Services, LLC, Stratfs, LLC, Summit Client Services, LLC, Pioneer Client Servicing, LLC, Stonepoint Client Services, LLC . (Vacco, Dennis)
March 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 196 TEXT ORDER. On or before 3/14/2024, defendants Lit Def Strategies and Jason Blust shall file a response to the receiver's motion for an order to show cause as why they should not be held in civil contempt #179 . The receiver and plaintiffs shall file a reply to defendants' response on or before 3/21/2024. On or before 3/14/2024, plaintiffs and the receiver shall file a response to Fidelis Legal Support Services' motion for issuance of an order that Fidelis should not be a receivership defendant #190 . Fidelis shall file a reply on or before 3/21/2024.Oral Argument as to #179 and #190 set for 3/25/2024 11:00 AM in Buffalo Courtroom, 9th Floor East, 2 Niagara Square, Buffalo, NY before Hon. Michael J. Roemer. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Michael J. Roemer on 3/6/2024. (RAZ)
March 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 195 TEXT ORDER. Any defendant who has not answered or otherwise responded to the #1 Complaint shall file an answer or response no later than 4/5/2024. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Michael J. Roemer on 3/6/2024. (RAZ)
March 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 194 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Anchor Law Firm, PLLC, Bedrock Legal Group, Boulder Legal Group, Bradon Ellis Law Firm LLC, Canyon Legal Group, LLC, Chinn Legal Group, LLC, Clear Creek Legal, LLC, Credit Advocates Law Firm, LLC, Great Lakes Law Firm, Greenstone Legal Group, Gustafson Consumer Law Group, LLC, Hailstone Legal Group, Hallock & Associates LLC, Hallock and Associates, Harbor Legal Group, Heartland Legal Group, Leigh Legal Group, PLLC, Level One Law, Meadowbrook Legal Group, Michel Law, LLC, Monarch Legal Group, Moore Legal Group, LLC, Newport Legal Group, LLC, Northstar Legal Group, Option 1 Legal, Pioneer Law Firm P.C., Rockwell Legal Group, Royal Legal Group, Slate Legal Group, Spring Legal Group, Stonepoint Legal Group, The Law Firm of Derek Williams, LLC, The Law Office of Melissa Michel LLC, Whitstone Legal Group, Wyolaw, LLC. Filing fee $ 605, receipt number ANYWDC-5122985. (Connors, Terrence)
March 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 193 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #184 Preliminary Injunction, #183 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Ryan Sasson. (Safer, Ronald) Modified on 3/6/2024 to edit the text (TMK).
March 6, 2024 Opinion or Order E-Filing Notification: re #193 NOTICE OF APPEAL - modified the description of the text. (TMK)
March 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Pursuant to Local Rule 12.1 of the US Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, Forms C and D must be completed within 14 days after the filing of a notice of appeal. Forms C and D can be obtained at www.ca2.uscourts.gov. (TMK)
March 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Within 14 days of filing the Notice of Appeal, the appellant is required to electronically file with the District Court an index of filed documents it wishes the Court of Appeals to consider, called Designation of Record on Appeal. After receipt, the Clerks Office will certify and transmit the index to the Circuit. (TMK)
March 6, 2024 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING NOTICE as to #188 MOTION to Dismiss and #189 MOTION to Dismiss (Joinder). Responses due by 3/27/2024. Replies due by 4/10/2024. Motion Hearing set for 4/22/2024 11:00 AM in Erie Courtroom, 9th Floor West, 2 Niagara Square, Buffalo, NY before Hon. Michael J. Roemer. (RAZ)
March 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 192 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #183 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Ryan Sasson. Filing fee $ 605, receipt number ANYWDC-5122362. (Safer, Ronald)
March 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 191 NOTICE of Appearance by Spencer Leeds Durland on behalf of Fidelis Legal Support Services, LLC (Durland, Spencer)
March 5, 2024 Opinion or Order AUTOMATIC REFERRAL TO MEDIATION Pursuant to Section 2.1(A) of the Plan for Alternative Dispute Resolution in the United States District Court for the Western District of New York (the ADR Plan), this case is automatically referred to ADR. To access the ADR Plan and for inquiries regarding the Court's ADR Program please review the Court's #ADR webpage and/or contact the Court's ADR Administrator at #adrprogram@nywd.uscourts.gov.' Prior to the Local Rule 16 scheduling conference, counsel and unrepresented parties shall review the #ADR Plan and confer with each other regarding ADR for this case. Unless the parties agree to a different intervention, it is presumed they will participate in mediation. The parties shall be prepared to report on the outcome of their ADR discussion at the scheduling conference, as the initial Scheduling Order for this case will establish ADR deadlines in accordance with the ADR Plan. (TMK)
March 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 190 MOTION for issuance of an order declaring that the Receiver has no authority over Fidelis Legal Support Services, LLC, either because the Receiver lacks jurisdiction or because Fidelis is not a Receivership Defendant by Fidelis Legal Support Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Timothy W. Hoover, #3 Exhibit A to Hoover Declaration, #4 Declaration of Cameron Christo, #5 Exhibit A to Christo Declaration, #6 Exhibit B to Christo Declaration, #7 Exhibit C to Christo Declaration, #8 Exhibit D to Christo Declaration, #9 Exhibit E to Christo Declaration, #10 Exhibit F to Christo Declaration)(Hoover, Timothy)
March 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 189 MOTION to Dismiss (Joinder) by Daniel Blumkin, Twist Financial, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Daniel Blumkin, #3 Exhibit A to Blumkin Declaration, #4 Exhibit B to Blumkin Declaration, #5 Exhibit C to Blumkin Declaration, #6 Exhibit D to Blumkin Declaration, #7 Exhibit E to Blumkin Declaration, #8 Exhibit F to Blumkin Declaration)(Safer, Ronald)
March 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 188 MOTION to Dismiss by Albert Ian Behar, Blaise Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Albert Ian Behar, #3 Exhibit A to Behar Declaration, #4 Exhibit B to Behar Declaration, #5 Exhibit C to Behar Declaration, #6 Exhibit D to Behar Declaration, #7 Exhibit E to Behar Declaration, #8 Exhibit F to Behar Declaration)(Safer, Ronald)
March 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by Duke Enterprises, LLC.(Safer, Ronald)
March 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by Ryan Sasson.(Safer, Ronald)
March 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 185 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Blaise Investments, LLC, Duke Enterprises, LLC, Twist Financial, LLC. (Safer, Ronald)
March 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 184 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. Signed by Hon. Michael J. Roemer on 3/4/2024. (RAZ)
March 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 183 DECISION AND ORDER granting #5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Hon. Michael J. Roemer on 3/4/2024. (RAZ)
March 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 182 TEXT ORDER. The Court has been informed by the parties that they have consented to extend the Temporary Restraining Order #12 currently in place in this matter until 5:00 PM on Monday, 3/4/2024. Thus, the as-modified Temporary Restraining Order is hereby extended to Monday, 3/4/2024 at 5:00 PM. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Michael J. Roemer on 3/1/2024. (RAZ)
February 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 181 TEXT ORDER. The Court has been informed by the parties that they have consented to extend the Temporary Restraining Order #12 currently in place in this matter until 5:00 PM on Friday, 3/1/2024. Thus, the as-modified Temporary Restraining Order is hereby extended to Friday, 3/1/2024 at 5:00 PM. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Michael J. Roemer on 2/29/2024. (RAZ)
February 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 180 TEXT ORDER. The Court has been informed by the parties that they have consented to extend the Temporary Restraining Order #12 currently in place in this matter until 5:00 PM on Thursday, 2/29/2024. Thus, the as-modified Temporary Restraining Order is hereby extended to Thursday, 2/29/2024 at 5:00 PM. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Michael J. Roemer on 2/27/2024. (RAZ)
February 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 179 Emergency MOTION for Order to Show Cause Why Receivership Defendant Lit Def Strategies, LLC and Individual Defendant Jason Blust Should Not be Held in Civil Contempt by Thomas McNamara. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Receivers Emergency Motion for an Order to Show Cause Why Receivership Defendant Lit Def Strategies, LLC and Individual Defendant Jason Blust Should Not be Held in Civil Contempt, #2 Declaration of Alexander D. Wall, #3 Exhibit 1 to Wall Declaration, #4 Exhibit 2 to Wall Declaration, #5 Exhibit 3 to Wall Declaration, #6 Exhibit 4 to Wall Declaration, #7 Exhibit 5 to Wall Declaration, #8 Exhibit 6 to Wall Declaration, #9 Exhibit 7 to Wall Declaration, #10 Exhibit 8 to Wall Declaration, #11 Exhibit 9 to Wall Declaration, #12 Exhibit 10 to Wall Declaration, #13 Exhibit 11 to Wall Declaration, #14 Exhibit 12 to Wall Declaration, #15 Exhibit 13 to Wall Declaration, #16 Text of Proposed Order)(Wall, Alexander)
February 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 178 TEXT ORDER. The Court has been informed by the parties that they have consented to extend the Temporary Restraining Order #12 currently in place in this matter until 5:00 PM on Tuesday, 2/27/2024. Thus, the as-modified Temporary Restraining Order is hereby extended to Tuesday, 2/27/2024 at 5:00 PM. SO ORDERED. Issuedby Hon. Michael J. Roemer on 2/26/2024. (RAZ)
February 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 177 TEXT ORDER granting #176 Motion for Evan K. Farber, Esq. to appear Pro Hac Vice for The Blust Family Irrevocable Trust through Donald J. Holmgren, Trustee. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Michael J. Roemer on 2/26/2024. (RAZ)
February 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 176 MOTION to appear pro hac vice - Evan K. Farber, Esq. ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-5114483.) by The Blust Family Irrevocable Trust through Donald J. Holmgren, Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Admission Petition Form, #2 Admission Sponsor Affidavit, #3 Attorney's Oath, #4 Civility Principles and Guidelines Oath (signature page only), #5 Attorney Database and Electronic Case Filing Registration Form)(Weingarten, Noah)
February 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 175 TEXT ORDER. The Court has been informed by the parties that they have consented to extend the Temporary Restraining Order #12 currently in place in this matter until 5:00 PM on Monday, 2/26/2024. Thus, the as-modified Temporary Restraining Order is hereby extended to Monday, 2/26/2024 at 5:00 PM. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Michael J. Roemer on 2/23/2024. (RAZ)
February 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 174 NOTICE by The Blust Family Irrevocable Trust through Donald J. Holmgren, Trustee re #172 Notice of Substitution of Counsel / Certification Pursuant to Local Rule 83.2(C) (Weingarten, Noah)
February 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 173 NOTICE of Appearance by Noah Weingarten on behalf of The Blust Family Irrevocable Trust through Donald J. Holmgren, Trustee (Weingarten, Noah)
February 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 172 Notice of Substitution of Counsel: Noah Weingarten is substituted for Rodney O. Personius. CLERK TO FOLLOW UP. (Weingarten, Noah)
February 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 171 TEXT ORDER. The Court has been informed by the parties that they have consented to extend the Temporary Restraining Order #12 currently in place in this matter until 5:00 PM on Friday, 2/23/2024. Thus, the as-modified Temporary Restraining Order is hereby extended to Friday, 2/23/2024 at 5:00 PM. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Michael J. Roemer on 2/21/2024. (RAZ)
February 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 170 REPLY/RESPONSE to re #168 Letter Receiver's Reply to Defendants' Letter Submission Dated February 16, 2024 filed by Thomas McNamara. (Thoman, James)
February 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 169 TEXT ORDER. The Court has been informed by the parties that they have consented to extend the Temporary Restraining Order #12 currently in place in this matter until 5:00 PM on Wednesday, 2/21/2024. Thus, the as-modified Temporary Restraining Order is hereby extended to Wednesday, 2/21/2024 at 5:00 PM. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Michael J. Roemer on 2/20/2024. (RAZ)
February 20, 2024 Opinion or Order E-filing Notification regarding: #166 Notice of Substitution of Counsel, Clerk did not substitute attorneys because the document does not comply with Local Rule 83.2(c)(1). A stipulation will effectuate a substitution only where counsel certify that a successor attorney has already or will simultaneously file a notice of appearance, no evidentiary hearing or trial date has been scheduled, and the withdrawal/substitution will not require amendment of case management order deadlines. ACTION REQUIRED: Refile this document with the appropriate certification or file a motion in accordance with L.R.Civ.P. 83.2(c)(3). (TMK)
February 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 168 Letter filed by Jaclyn Blust, Relialit, LLC, Lit Def Strategies, LLC, Jason Blust requesting conference re transfers by Receiver. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-D)(Personius, Rodney)
February 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 167 TEXT ORDER. The Court has been informed by the parties that they have consented to extend the Temporary Restraining Order #12 currently in place in this matter until 5:00 PM on Tuesday, 2/20/2024. Thus, the as-modified Temporary Restraining Order is hereby extended to Tuesday, 2/20/2024 at 5:00 PM. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Michael J. Roemer on 2/16/2024. (RAZ)
February 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 166 Notice of Substitution of Counsel: P. Gregory Schwed is substituted for Rodney O. Personius. CLERK TO FOLLOW UP (Personius, Rodney)
February 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 165 Letter filed by Consumer Financial Protection Bureau in response to Intervenors' Letter Regarding Plaintiffs' Proposed Preliminary Injunction. (Chiu, Shirley)
February 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 164 TEXT ORDER. The Court been informed by the parties that they have consented to extend the Temporary Restraining Order #12 currently in place in this matter until 5:00 PM on Friday, 2/16/2024. Thus, the as-modified Temporary Restraining Order is hereby extended to Friday, 2/16/2024 at 5:00 PM. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Michael J. Roemer on 2/15/2024. (RAZ)
February 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 163 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on February 13, 2024, before District Judge, the Honorable Elizabeth A. Wolford. Court Reporter/Transcriber Bonnie S. Weber, Bonnie_Weber@nywd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date, it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/7/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/18/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/15/2024. (BSW)
February 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 162 TEXT ORDER. The Court has received, via email, informal notification by the parties that they have consented to extend the Temporary Restraining Order #12 currently in place in this matter until 5:00 PM on Thursday, 2/15/2024. Thus, the as-modified Temporary Restraining Order is hereby extended to Thursday, 2/15/2024 at 5:00 PM. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Michael J. Roemer on 2/14/2024. (RAZ)
February 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 161 TEXT ORDER granting #156 Motion for Nikolai N. Frant, Esq. to appear Pro Hac Vice for The People of the State of New York. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Michael J. Roemer on 2/14/2024. (RAZ)Clerk to Follow up
February 14, 2024 Opinion or Order E-Filing Notification re 160 Minute Entry: entry modified to properly reflect appearances. (DPS)
February 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 160 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford: Appearances: Joseph M. Sanders, Esq., Vanessa A. Buchko, Esq. and Shirley T. Chiu, Esq. (by audio only) on behalf of the Consumer Financial Protection Bureau; NYSAAG Christopher L. Boyd and NYSAAG Genevieve S. Rados on behalf of The People of the State of New York; Lewis W. Beilin, Esq. (by audio only) on behalf of The State of Wisconsin; Dennis C. Vacco, Esq. on behalf of Anchor Client Services, LLC, BCF Capital, LLC, Bedrock Client Services, LLC, Boulder Client Services, LLC, Canyon Client Services, LLC, Carolina Client Services, LLC, Great Lakes Client Services, LLC, Guidestone Client Services, LLC, Harbor Client Services, LLC, Heartland Client Services, LLC, Monarch Client Services, LLC, Newport Client Services, LLC, Northstar Client Services, LLC, Option 1 Client Services, LLC, Pioneer Client Servicing, LLC, Rockwell Client Services, LLC, Royal Client Services, LLC, Stonepoint Client Services, LLC, Strategic CS, LLC, Strategic Client Support, LLC, Strategic Consulting, LLC, Strategic FS Buffalo, LLC, Strategic Family, Inc., Strategic NYC, LLC, Stratfs, LLC, Summit Client Services, LLC, T Fin, LLC, Versara Lending, LLC, Whitestone Client Services, LLC; Ronald S. Safer, Esq., Maegan B. McAdam, Esq. and Rodney Perry, Esq. (by audio only) on behalf of Ryan Sasson, Daniel Blumkin, Albert Ian Behar; Rodney O. Personius, Esq. behalf of Jaclyn Blust, Jason Blust, Lit Def Strategies, LLC, Relialit, LLC, The Blust Family Irrevocable Trust through Donald J. Holmgren, Trustee; Terrence M. Connors, Esq. on behalf of Clear Creek Legal, LLC, Credit Advocates Law Firm, LLC, Greenstone Legal Group, Bradon Ellis Law Firm LLC, Hailstone Legal Group, Hallock and Associates, Harbor Legal Group, Anchor Law Firm, PLLC, Bedrock Legal Group, Boulder Legal Group, Canyon Legal Group, LLC, Great Lakes Law Firm, Heartland Legal Group, Level One Law, Meadowbrook Legal Group, Monarch Legal Group, Newport Legal Group, LLC, Northstar Legal Group, Option 1 Legal, Pioneer Law Firm P.C., Rockwell Legal Group, Spring Legal Group, Royal Legal Group, Slate Legal Group, Stonepoint Legal Group, The Law Firm of Derek Williams, LLC, Whitstone Legal Group, Wyolaw, LLC, Chinn Legal Group, LLC, Leigh Legal Group, PLLC, Hallock & Associates LLC, Gustafson Consumer Law Group, LLC, Michel Law, LLC, The Law Office of Melissa Michel LLC, Moore Legal Group, LLC; Richard J. Bernard, Esq. (by audio only) on behalf of Strategic ESOP; Thomas W. McNamara, Receiver; (by audio only) James C. Thoman, Esq. representing Receiver Thomas W. McNamara. Status Conference held on 2/13/2024. Court addresses pending Motion for a Preliminary Injunction, the expiring TRO, and status of Consent to a Magistrate Judge. In-person appearance scheduled for Wednesday, February 14, 2024, at 10:00 AM, at the United States Courthouse, 100 State Street, Rochester, New York, 14614, before the Honorable Elizabeth A. Wolford, unless if by 5:00 p.m. (EST) all interested parties (except for the Receiver and Relief Defendants Strategic ESOT and Strategic ESOP), have signed and submitted a form Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Dispositive Motion to a Magistrate Judge, with respect to resolution of the motions pending at Docket #5 , as discussed on the record. Further proceedings to be addressed accordingly. (Court Reporter Bonnie S. Weber.) (DPS) Modified on 2/14/2024 (DPS).
February 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 159 TEXT ORDER re #158 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Dispositive Motion to a Magistrate Judge. The Motion for a Preliminary Injunction filed at Docket 5 is hereby referred to the Honorable Michael J. Roemer, United States Magistrate Judge, to conduct all proceedings and enter a final order on the motion, in accordance with 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c). The in-person status conference scheduled for Wednesday, February 14, 2024 at 10:00 a.m. in Rochester is hereby cancelled. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 02/13/2024. (CAL)
February 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 158 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Dispositive Motion to a Magistrate Judge for #5 Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. (CAL)
February 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 157 TEXT ORDER. As ordered by the Court at the February 13, 2024 status conference, an in-person appearance is scheduled for Wednesday, February 14, 2024, at 10:00 AM, at the United States Courthouse, 100 State Street, Rochester, New York, 14614, before the Honorable Elizabeth A. Wolford, unless if by 5:00 p.m. today, all interested parties (in other words, all parties except for the Receiver and Relief Defendants Strategic ESOT and Strategic ESOP), have signed and submitted a form Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Dispositive Motion to a Magistrate Judge, with respect to resolution of the motions pending at Docket 5. These signed consents to limited magistrate judge jurisdiction shall be sent to the undersigned's courtroom deputy at dawn_samuel@nywd.uscourts.gov. Any party that has already submitted a signed consent to limited magistrate jurisdiction is not required to re-submit the form.As further noted at the February 13, 2024 appearance, Relief Defendants Strategic ESOT and Strategic ESOP shall be excused from attending the February 14, 2024 in-person appearance in Rochester. All other parties must appear in person through counsel. The failure to comply may result in the imposition of sanctions, including but not limited to dismissal of the claims by a plaintiff who fails to appear for failure to prosecute. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 02/13/2024. (CAL)
February 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 156 MOTION to appear pro hac vice for Nikolai Frant ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-5106146.) by The People of the State of New York. (Attachments: #1 Petition, #2 Sponsor Affidavit, #3 Civility Principles Oath, #4 Attorney Oath, #5 CM/ECF Registration Form)(Rados, Genevieve)
February 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 155 TEXT ORDER. The Court hereby grants the parties' requests (see Dkt. 148; Dkt. 151; Dkt. 152; Dkt. 153; Dkt. 154) to appear by telephone at the February 13, 2024 status conference. Based on the letters received by the Court, the following individuals are granted permission to appear by telephone: Thomas W. McNamara, the court-appointed receiver; on behalf of Plaintiff the Consumer Financial Protection Bureau, Vanessa Buchko, Joseph Sanders, Monika Moore, and Shirley Chiu; on behalf of Plaintiff the State of Wisconsin, Lewis W. Beilin; on behalf of Relief Defendants Strategic ESOT and Strategic ESOP, Richard J. Bernard; and on behalf of Defendant Ryan Sasson and Relief Defendants Daniel Blumkin and Albert Ian Behar, Maegan McAdam, Ronald Safer, Matthew Kennison, and Rodney Perry.Only the parties and attorneys referenced herein may appear by telephone, and they shall contact the undersigned's courtroom deputy at dawn_samuel@nywd.uscourts.gov for the call-in information sufficiently in advance of the scheduled appearance. This call-in information is for use by the parties and attorneys referenced herein only, and it may not be distributed to any other individuals. Any other individuals wishing to attend the conference may attend in person at the public proceeding. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 02/12/2024. (CAL)
February 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 154 Letter filed by Daniel Blumkin, Ryan Sasson, Albert Ian Behar Requesting to Appear by Telephone at February 13, 2024 Status Conference. (McAdam, Maegan)
February 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 153 Letter filed by Strategic ESOP, Strategic ESOT Requesting to Appear by Telephone at February 13, 2024 Status Conference. (Bernard, Richard)
February 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 152 Letter filed by The State of Wisconsin Letter to Judge Wolford requesting appearance by telephone at status conference. (Beilin, Lewis)
February 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 151 Letter filed by Consumer Financial Protection Bureau Requesting To Appear By Telephone at 2/13 Hearing. (Moore, Monika)
February 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 150 REPLY/RESPONSE to re #149 Letter,,, Receiver's Reply to Defendants' Letter Submission Dated February 9, 2024 filed by Thomas McNamara. (Thoman, James)
February 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 149 Letter filed by Option 1 Client Services, LLC, Northstar Client Services, LLC, Anchor Client Services, LLC, Great Lakes Client Services, LLC, Strategic Consulting, LLC, BCF Capital, LLC, Guidestone Client Services, LLC, Strategic Family, Inc.,, Newport Client Services, LLC, Rockwell Client Services, LLC, Strategic Client Support, LLC, Heartland Client Services, LLC, Strategic NYC, LLC, Versara Lending, LLC, T Fin, LLC, Monarch Client Services, LLC, Carolina Client Services, LLC, Harbor Client Services, LLC, Whitestone Client Services, LLC, Strategic FS Buffalo, LLC, Canyon Client Services, LLC, Bedrock Client Services, LLC, Boulder Client Services, LLC, Strategic CS, LLC, Royal Client Services, LLC, Stratfs, LLC, Summit Client Services, LLC, Pioneer Client Servicing, LLC, Stonepoint Client Services, LLC . (Vacco, Dennis)
February 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 148 Letter filed by Thomas McNamara February 9, 2024 letter to Hon. E. Wolford Requesting Telephonic Appearance by Thomas McNamara. (Thoman, James)
February 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 147 NOTICE by Consumer Financial Protection Bureau (Chiu, Shirley) Modified on 2/9/2024 (TMK).
February 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 146 TEXT ORDER. Upon the consent of the parties and for the reasons discussed on the record on February 9, 2024, the as-modified Temporary Restraining Order currently in place in this matter is extended to Wednesday, February 14, 2024, at 3:00 p.m. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 02/09/2024. (CDH)
February 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 145 TEXT ORDER. Following a teleconference with the parties and Chief Judge Elizabeth A. Wolford on 2/9/2024, the parties confirmed that the TRO currently in affect is now extended to 2/14/2024 at 3:00 PM, on consent. Chief Judge Wolford scheduled a Status Conference for 2/13/2024 10:30 AM in Cattaraugus Courtroom, 7th West, 2 Niagara Square, Buffalo, NY. Anyone requesting to appear by telephone must do so by 12:00 PM on 2/12/2024. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Michael J. Roemer on 2/9/2024. (RAZ)
February 9, 2024 Opinion or Order E-Filing Notification: re 147 NOTICE - Clerk removed Document filed by attorney in error. (TMK)
February 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 144 TEXT ORDER. No party having filed objections to the Report and Recommendation filed on January 24, 2024 (Dkt. 77), recommending that the Temporary Restraining Order ("TRO") be extended until February 8, 2024, at 3:00 p.m., and the 14-day objection period having expired, the Court hereby adopts the Report and Recommendation in its entirety for the reasons set forth therein. Upon the consent of the parties (see Dkt. 133), the Court further extends the TRO, as modified on January 30, 2024 (see Dkt. 106), to Friday, February 9, 2024, at 3:00 p.m. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 02/08/2024. (CDH)
February 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 143 Letter filed by Stonepoint Legal Group, The Law Firm of Derek Williams, LLC, Slate Legal Group, Pioneer Law Firm P.C., Anchor Law Firm, PLLC, Level One Law, Harbor Legal Group, Spring Legal Group, Gustafson Consumer Law Group, LLC, Royal Legal Group, Hallock & Associates LLC, The Law Office of Melissa Michel LLC, Northstar Legal Group, Chinn Legal Group, LLC, Clear Creek Legal, LLC, Option 1 Legal, Canyon Legal Group, LLC, Newport Legal Group, LLC, Hailstone Legal Group, Whitstone Legal Group, Greenstone Legal Group, Monarch Legal Group, Bedrock Legal Group, Moore Legal Group, LLC Responding to Proposed Preliminary Injunction. (Connors, Terrence)
February 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 142 Letter filed by Daniel Blumkin, Ryan Sasson, Albert Ian Behar on behalf of all Defendants and Intervenors Responding to Plaintiffs' Findings of Fact. (Kennison, Matthew)
February 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 141 Letter filed by Consumer Financial Protection Bureau Identifying Portions of Defendants' Findings of Fact With Which Plaintiffs Disagree. (Moore, Monika)
February 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 140 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Michael J. Roemer. Appearances: Joseph M. Sanders, Esq. and Vanessa A. Buchko, Esq. on behalf of the Consumer Financial Protection Bureau; NYSAAG Christopher L. Boyd and NYSAAG Genevieve S. Rados on behalf of The People of the State of New York; Dennis C. Vacco, Esq. on behalf of Anchor Client Services, LLC, BCF Capital, LLC, Bedrock Client Services, LLC, Boulder Client Services, LLC, Canyon Client Services, LLC, Carolina Client Services, LLC, Great Lakes Client Services, LLC, Guidestone Client Services, LLC, Harbor Client Services, LLC, Heartland Client Services, LLC, Monarch Client Services, LLC, Newport Client Services, LLC, Northstar Client Services, LLC, Option 1 Client Services, LLC, Pioneer Client Servicing, LLC, Rockwell Client Services, LLC, Royal Client Services, LLC, Stonepoint Client Services, LLC, Strategic CS, LLC, Strategic Client Support, LLC, Strategic Consulting, LLC, Strategic FS Buffalo, LLC, Strategic Family, Inc., Strategic NYC, LLC, Stratfs, LLC, Summit Client Services, LLC, T Fin, LLC, Versara Lending, LLC, Whitestone Client Services, LLC; Ronald S. Safer, Esq. and Maegan B. McAdam, Esq. on behalf of Ryan Sasson, Daniel Blumkin, Albert Ian Behar; Rodney O. Personius, Esq. behalf of Jaclyn Blust, Jason Blust, Lit Def Strategies, LLC, Relialit, LLC, The Blust Family Irrevocable Trust through Donald J. Holmgren, Trustee; Terrence M. Connors, Esq. on behalf of Clear Creek Legal, LLC, Credit Advocates Law Firm, LLC, Greenstone Legal Group, Bradon Ellis Law Firm LLC, Hailstone Legal Group, Hallock and Associates, Harbor Legal Group, Anchor Law Firm, PLLC, Bedrock Legal Group, Boulder Legal Group, Canyon Legal Group, LLC, Great Lakes Law Firm, Heartland Legal Group, Level One Law, Meadowbrook Legal Group, Monarch Legal Group, Newport Legal Group, LLC, Northstar Legal Group, Option 1 Legal, Pioneer Law Firm P.C., Rockwell Legal Group, Spring Legal Group, Royal Legal Group, Slate Legal Group, Stonepoint Legal Group, The Law Firm of Derek Williams, LLC, Whitstone Legal Group, Wyolaw, LLC, Chinn Legal Group, LLC, Leigh Legal Group, PLLC, Hallock & Associates LLC, Gustafson Consumer Law Group, LLC, Michel Law, LLC, The Law Office of Melissa Michel LLC, Moore Legal Group, LLC; Richard J. Bernard, Esq. on behalf of Strategic ESOP; Thomas W. McNamara, Receiver; James C. Thoman, Esq. representing Receiver Thomas W. McNamara. Oral Argument held on 2/7/2024 re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Consumer Financial Protection Bureau, State of Colorado, State of Delaware, The People of the State of Illinois, The People of the State of New York, The State of Minnesota, The State of North Carolina, The State of Wisconsin. The Court allowed additional briefing to be filed no later than 12:00 PM 2/8/2024 and not to exceed three (3) pages in length. The Court considered the matter submitted for Report and Recommendation. (Court Reporter Bonnie S. Weber.) (RAZ) Modified on 2/8/2024 (RAZ).
February 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 139 Proposed Findings of Fact by The People of the State of New York. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Preliminary Injunction)(Boyd, Christopher)
February 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 138 MEMORANDUM/BRIEF Post-Hearing Brief by The People of the State of New York. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Karen Davis, #2 Declaration Joshua Lewis, #3 Declaration Jennifer Terranova)(Boyd, Christopher)
February 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 137 Proposed Findings of Fact by Ryan Sasson. (Kennison, Matthew)
February 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 136 RESPONSE in Opposition re #57 MOTION to Extend TRO re #12 Order on Motion to Appoint Receiver,, Order on Motion for TRO,,,, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, Order on Motion for Hearing, Defendants Strategic Employee Stock Ownership Plan and Strategic Employee Stock Ownership Trust Statement in Opposition to a Continuing Injunction filed by Strategic ESOP, Strategic ESOT. (Joseph, Andrew)
February 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 135 REPLY/RESPONSE to re #124 Letter, #115 Notice (Other),,,,, #131 Emergency MOTION Emergency Motion to Pay February Employee Benefit Insurance Premiums for All Employees of the Corporate Defendants and Notice of Supplement to Preliminary Report of Temporary Receiver re #116 Continuation of Exhibits,, #115 Notic, #120 Continuation of Exhibits, #116 Continuation of Exhibits,, Receiver's Reply to Defendants' Response to the Preliminary Report filed by Thomas McNamara. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Thoman, James)
February 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER Authorizing the Temporary Receiver to Pay February 2024 Employee Benefit Insurance Premiums for All Employees of the Corporate Defendants #131 . Signed by Hon. Michael J. Roemer on 2/5/2024. (RAZ)
February 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 133 AMENDED TEXT ORDER. A revised briefing schedule has been put in place upon agreement of all parties. Post-hearing briefs shall be filed no later than 11:59 PM on 2/6/2024. Oral Argument is scheduled for 2/7/2024 02:00 PM in the Erie Courtroom, 9th Floor West, 2 Niagara Square, Buffalo, NY before Hon. Michael J. Roemer. Pursuant to discussions held by the parties and the Court at the conclusion of 2/2/2024 hearing, the TRO in place shall be extended to 2/9/2024 at 3:00 PM. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Michael J. Roemer on 2/5/2024. (RAZ)
February 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 132 TEXT ORDER. A revised briefing schedule has been put in place upon agreement of all parties. Post-hearing briefs shall be filed no later than 12:00 AM on 2/6/2024. Oral Argument is scheduled for 2/7/2024 02:00 PM in the Erie Courtroom, 9th Floor West, 2 Niagara Square, Buffalo, NY before Hon. Michael J. Roemer. Pursuant to discussions held by the parties and the Court at the conclusion of 2/2/2024 hearing, the TRO in place shall be extended to 2/9/2024 at 3:00 PM. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Michael J. Roemer on 2/5/2024. (RAZ)
February 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 131 Emergency MOTION Emergency Motion to Pay February Employee Benefit Insurance Premiums for All Employees of the Corporate Defendants and Notice of Supplement to Preliminary Report of Temporary Receiver re #116 Continuation of Exhibits,, #115 Notice (Other),,,,, #120 Continuation of Exhibits by Thomas McNamara. (Attachments: #1 Emergency Motion to Pay February Employee Benefit Insurance Premiums for All Employees of the Corporate Defendants and Notice of Supplement to Preliminary Report of Temporary Receiver, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Thoman, James)
February 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 128 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (CONTINUATION OF EVIDENTIARY HEARING) held on 02/02/2024, before MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J. ROEMER. Court Reporter Karen J. Clark, RPR, KarenClark1013@AOL.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/26/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/7/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/6/2024. (KJC)
February 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 127 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (SCHEDULING CONFERENCE) held on 01/18/2024, before MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J. ROEMER. Transcriber Karen J. Clark, RPR, KarenClark1013@AOL.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/26/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/7/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/6/2024. (KJC)
February 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 126 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Discovery Hearing held on January 29, 2024, before Judge Michael J. Roemer. Transcriber Diane S. Martens, dimartens55@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/26/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/7/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/6/2024. (DSM)
February 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 125 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Discovery Hearing held on January 24, 2024, before Judge Michael J. Roemer. Transcriber Diane S. Martens, dimartens55@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/26/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/7/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/6/2024. (DSM)
February 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 124 Letter filed by Daniel Blumkin, Ryan Sasson, Albert Ian Behar . (Kennison, Matthew)
February 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 130 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Michael J. Roemer. Appearances: Joseph M. Sanders, Esq., Vanessa A. Buchko, Esq. and Shirley T. Chiu, Esq. on behalf of the Consumer Financial Protection Bureau; NYSAAG Christopher L. Boyd and NYSAAG Genevieve S. Rados on behalf of The People of the State of New York; Lewis W. Beilin, Esq. on behalf of The State of Wisconsin; Dennis C. Vacco, Esq. and Scott S. Allen, Jr, Esq. on behalf of Anchor Client Services, LLC, BCF Capital, LLC, Bedrock Client Services, LLC, Boulder Client Services, LLC, Canyon Client Services, LLC, Carolina Client Services, LLC, Great Lakes Client Services, LLC, Guidestone Client Services, LLC, Harbor Client Services, LLC, Heartland Client Services, LLC, Monarch Client Services, LLC, Newport Client Services, LLC, Northstar Client Services, LLC, Option 1 Client Services, LLC, Pioneer Client Servicing, LLC, Rockwell Client Services, LLC, Royal Client Services, LLC, Stonepoint Client Services, LLC, Strategic CS, LLC, Strategic Client Support, LLC, Strategic Consulting, LLC, Strategic FS Buffalo, LLC, Strategic Family, Inc., Strategic NYC, LLC, Stratfs, LLC, Summit Client Services, LLC, T Fin, LLC, Versara Lending, LLC, Whitestone Client Services, LLC; Ronald S. Safer, Esq., Maegan B. McAdam, Esq., Matthew P. Kennison, Esq. and Rodney Perry, Esq. on behalf of Ryan Sasson, Daniel Blumkin, Albert Ian Behar; Rodney O. Personius, Esq. behalf of Jaclyn Blust, Jason Blust, Lit Def Strategies, LLC, Relialit, LLC, The Blust Family Irrevocable Trust through Donald J. Holmgren, Trustee; Terrence M. Connors, Esq. on behalf of Clear Creek Legal, LLC, Credit Advocates Law Firm, LLC, Greenstone Legal Group, Bradon Ellis Law Firm LLC, Hailstone Legal Group, Hallock and Associates, Harbor Legal Group, Anchor Law Firm, PLLC, Bedrock Legal Group, Boulder Legal Group, Canyon Legal Group, LLC, Great Lakes Law Firm, Heartland Legal Group, Level One Law, Meadowbrook Legal Group, Monarch Legal Group, Newport Legal Group, LLC, Northstar Legal Group, Option 1 Legal, Pioneer Law Firm P.C., Rockwell Legal Group, Spring Legal Group, Royal Legal Group, Slate Legal Group, Stonepoint Legal Group, The Law Firm of Derek Williams, LLC, Whitstone Legal Group, Wyolaw, LLC, Chinn Legal Group, LLC, Leigh Legal Group, PLLC, Hallock & Associates LLC, Gustafson Consumer Law Group, LLC, Michel Law, LLC, The Law Office of Melissa Michel LLC, Moore Legal Group, LLC; Richard J. Bernard, Esq. on behalf of Strategic ESOP; Thomas W. McNamara, Receiver.Continued Evidentiary Hearing held on 2/2/2024. Plaintiff witnesses: Ruth Brooks-Ward, John Accardo, Christopher Elkins, Anne Barsch, Carly Richardson, Stephen Loft and Patrick Callahan. Hearing concluded. The Court reminded parties of the briefing schedule put in place at the 2/1/2024 hearing. (Court Reporter Karen J. Clark.) (RAZ) Modified on 2/5/2024 (RAZ).
February 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 123 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Evidentiary Hearing held on 2/1/2024, before Judge Hon. Michael J. Roemer. Court Reporter/Transcriber Susan M. Ryckman, 585-343-8612. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 2/23/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/4/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/2/2024. (CGJ)
February 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 122 TEXT ORDER. The recusal-subject-to-remittal process having concluded without all parties consenting to have the matter heard by Judge Sinatra, this matter shall remain assigned to the undersigned. The parties are highly encouraged to consider the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 636(c) governing consent to either partial or complete disposition of the case by the assigned magistrate judge. In particular, the parties may consent to have just the pending motion for a preliminary injunction resolved by the assigned magistrate judge (who is presiding over the preliminary injunction hearing). Particularly with a motion seeking expedited relief where the parties have the right to immediately pursue an appeal, see 28 U.S.C. 1292(a)(1) (providing for immediate appeal of "[i]nterlocutory orders of the district courts of the United States... granting, continuing, modifying, refusing or dissolving injunctions, or refusing to dissolve or modify injunctions"), efficiency considerations strongly favor consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction for resolution of the preliminary injunction motion under the circumstances of this case, so as to avoid additional delays that will necessarily occur through the objection process applicable to any report and recommendation. Consent forms may be found on the Court's website at https://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/forms-3. No adverse substantive consequences will result should the parties choose not to consent. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 02/02/2024. (CDH)
February 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 121 Exhibit List , First Amended by Consumer Financial Protection Bureau.. (Sanders, Joseph)
February 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 129 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Michael J. Roemer. Appearances: Joseph M. Sanders, Esq., Vanessa A. Buchko, Esq. and Shirley T. Chiu, Esq. on behalf of the Consumer Financial Protection Bureau; NYSAAG Christopher L. Boyd and NYSAAG Genevieve S. Rados on behalf of The People of the State of New York; Lewis W. Beilin, Esq. on behalf of The State of Wisconsin; Dennis C. Vacco, Esq. and Scott S. Allen, Jr, Esq. on behalf of Anchor Client Services, LLC, BCF Capital, LLC, Bedrock Client Services, LLC, Boulder Client Services, LLC, Canyon Client Services, LLC, Carolina Client Services, LLC, Great Lakes Client Services, LLC, Guidestone Client Services, LLC, Harbor Client Services, LLC, Heartland Client Services, LLC, Monarch Client Services, LLC, Newport Client Services, LLC, Northstar Client Services, LLC, Option 1 Client Services, LLC, Pioneer Client Servicing, LLC, Rockwell Client Services, LLC, Royal Client Services, LLC, Stonepoint Client Services, LLC, Strategic CS, LLC, Strategic Client Support, LLC, Strategic Consulting, LLC, Strategic FS Buffalo, LLC, Strategic Family, Inc., Strategic NYC, LLC, Stratfs, LLC, Summit Client Services, LLC, T Fin, LLC, Versara Lending, LLC, Whitestone Client Services, LLC; Ronald S. Safer, Esq., Maegan B. McAdam, Esq., Matthew P. Kennison, Esq. and Rodney Perry, Esq. on behalf of Ryan Sasson, Daniel Blumkin, Albert Ian Behar; Rodney O. Personius, Esq. behalf of Jaclyn Blust, Jason Blust, Lit Def Strategies, LLC, Relialit, LLC, The Blust Family Irrevocable Trust through Donald J. Holmgren, Trustee; Terrence M. Connors, Esq. on behalf of Clear Creek Legal, LLC, Credit Advocates Law Firm, LLC, Greenstone Legal Group, Bradon Ellis Law Firm LLC, Hailstone Legal Group, Hallock and Associates, Harbor Legal Group, Anchor Law Firm, PLLC, Bedrock Legal Group, Boulder Legal Group, Canyon Legal Group, LLC, Great Lakes Law Firm, Heartland Legal Group, Level One Law, Meadowbrook Legal Group, Monarch Legal Group, Newport Legal Group, LLC, Northstar Legal Group, Option 1 Legal, Pioneer Law Firm P.C., Rockwell Legal Group, Spring Legal Group, Royal Legal Group, Slate Legal Group, Stonepoint Legal Group, The Law Firm of Derek Williams, LLC, Whitstone Legal Group, Wyolaw, LLC, Chinn Legal Group, LLC, Leigh Legal Group, PLLC, Hallock & Associates LLC, Gustafson Consumer Law Group, LLC, Michel Law, LLC, The Law Office of Melissa Michel LLC, Moore Legal Group, LLC; Richard J. Pearl, Esq. on behalf of Strategic ESOP; Thomas W. McNamara, Receiver; James C. Thoman, Esq. representing Receiver Thomas W. McNamara. Evidentiary Hearing held on 2/1/2024. Defense witnesses: Lisa Munyon, Michael Thurman, Heather Lyon, Richard Gustafson, II, Joanna Hughes, Mary Lynn Clark and Greg Regan. The parties stipulated that all plaintiff and defendant exhibits will be entered into evidence. Continued Evidentiary Hearing set for 2/2/2024 at 9:00 AM in Cattaraugus Courtroom, 7th West, 2 Niagara Square, Buffalo, NY before Hon. Michael J. Roemer.The Court addressed the upcoming briefing schedule upon the conclusion of the hearing. Daily transcripts will be ordered. Post-hearing briefs shall be filed no later than 12:00 AM on 2/5/2024. Oral Argument set for 2/6/2024 2:00 PM in Cattaraugus Courtroom, 7th West, 2 Niagara Square, Buffalo, NY before Hon. Michael J. Roemer. (Court Reporter Susan M. Ryckman.) (RAZ) Modified on 2/5/2024 (RAZ).
February 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 120 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS to #115 Notice (Other),,,,, #116 Continuation of Exhibits,, Addendum to Exhibit 29 [SEALED] to Receiver's Preliminary Report. (Thoman, James)
February 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 119 Sealed Document: Exhibit 4,6,7,9,10,16,17 and 29 to #115 Receiver's Report (CGJ)
January 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 118 MOTION for Leave to File Pre-Hearing Brief by Albert Ian Behar, Daniel Blumkin, Ryan Sasson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Defendants' Pre-Hearing Brief)(McAdam, Maegan)
January 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 117 Witness List by Albert Ian Behar, Daniel Blumkin, Ryan Sasson. (McAdam, Maegan)
January 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 116 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS to #115 Notice (Other),,,,, Notice of Preliminary Report of Temporary Receiver. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 20 to Receiver's Preliminary Report, #2 Exhibit 21 to Receiver's Preliminary Report, #3 Exhibit 22 to Receiver's Preliminary Report, #4 Exhibit 23 to Receiver's Preliminary Report, #5 Exhibit 24 to Receiver's Preliminary Report, #6 Exhibit 25 to Receiver's Preliminary Report, #7 Exhibit 26 to Receiver's Preliminary Report, #8 Exhibit 27 to Receiver's Preliminary Report, #9 Exhibit 28 to Receiver's Preliminary Report, #10 Exhibit 29 [SEALED] to Receiver's Preliminary Report)(Thoman, James)
January 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 115 NOTICE by Thomas McNamara Notice of Preliminary Report of Temporary Receiver (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Receiver's Preliminary Report, #2 Appendix to Receiver's Preliminary Report, #3 Exhibit 1 to Receiver's Preliminary Report, #4 Exhibit 2 to Receiver's Preliminary Report, #5 Exhibit 3 to Receiver's Preliminary Report, #6 Exhibit 4 [SEALED] to Receiver's Preliminary Report, #7 Exhibit 5 to Receiver's Preliminary Report, #8 Exhibit 6 [SEALED] to Receiver's Preliminary Report, #9 Exhibit 7 [SEALED] to Receiver's Preliminary Report, #10 Exhibit 8 to Receiver's Preliminary Report, #11 Exhibit 9 [SEALED] to Receiver's Preliminary Report, #12 Exhibit 10 [SEALED] to Receiver's Preliminary Report, #13 Exhibit 11 to Receiver's Preliminary Report, #14 Exhibit 12 to Receiver's Preliminary Report, #15 Exhibit 13 to Receiver's Preliminary Report, #16 Exhibit 14 to Receiver's Preliminary Report, #17 Exhibit 15 to Receiver's Preliminary Report, #18 Exhibit 16 [SEALED] to Receiver's Preliminary Report, #19 Exhibit 17 [SEALED] to Receiver's Preliminary Report, #20 Exhibit 18 to Receiver's Preliminary Report)(Thoman, James)
January 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 114 TEXT ORDER granting #112 Ex Parte Motion to Seal Certain Exhibits to Receiver's Report by Thomas McNamara. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Michael J. Roemer on 1/31/2024. (RAZ)
January 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 113 TEXT ORDER granting #107 Letter request to extend time to 3/4/2024 for defendants and relief defendants to respond to the Complaint. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Michael J. Roemer on 1/31/2024. (RAZ)
January 31, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 112 MOTION to Seal Ex Parte Motion to Seal Certain Exhibits to Receiver's Report Under Seal by Thomas McNamara. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum of Law in Support of Ex Parte Motion to Seal, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Ex Parte Motion to Seal)(Thoman, James)
January 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 111 Exhibit List by Albert Ian Behar, Daniel Blumkin, Ryan Sasson.. (McAdam, Maegan)
January 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 110 Witness List by Albert Ian Behar, Daniel Blumkin, Ryan Sasson. (McAdam, Maegan)
January 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 109 Exhibit List by Consumer Financial Protection Bureau.. (Sanders, Joseph)
January 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 108 Witness List by Consumer Financial Protection Bureau. (Sanders, Joseph)
January 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 107 Letter filed by Daniel Blumkin, Ryan Sasson, Albert Ian Behar as to Option 1 Client Services, LLC, Northstar Client Services, LLC, Anchor Client Services, LLC, Great Lakes Client Services, LLC, Strategic Consulting, LLC, Bradon Ellis Law Firm LLC, BCF Capital, LLC, Daniel Blumkin, Stonepoint Legal Group, Guidestone Client Services, LLC, Hallock and Associates, The Law Firm of Derek Williams, LLC, Michel Law, LLC, Meadowbrook Legal Group, Strategic Family, Inc.,, Newport Client Services, LLC, Rockwell Client Services, LLC, Strategic Client Support, LLC, Slate Legal Group, Pioneer Law Firm P.C., Anchor Law Firm, PLLC, Twist Financial, LLC, Level One Law, Heartland Client Services, LLC, Blaise Investments, LLC, Harbor Legal Group, Spring Legal Group, Ryan Sasson, Strategic NYC, LLC, Jaclyn Blust, Albert Ian Behar, Versara Lending, LLC, Gustafson Consumer Law Group, LLC, Royal Legal Group, Relialit, LLC, Rockwell Legal Group, Hallock & Associates LLC, T Fin, LLC, The Law Office of Melissa Michel LLC, Monarch Client Services, LLC, Carolina Client Services, LLC, Harbor Client Services, LLC, Northstar Legal Group, Whitestone Client Services, LLC, Heartland Legal Group, Wyolaw, LLC, Chinn Legal Group, LLC, Clear Creek Legal, LLC, Strategic FS Buffalo, LLC, Duke Enterprises, LLC, Canyon Client Services, LLC, Option 1 Legal, Great Lakes Law Firm, Lit Def Strategies, LLC, Boulder Legal Group, Leigh Legal Group, PLLC, Jason Blust, Canyon Legal Group, LLC, Bedrock Client Services, LLC, Newport Legal Group, LLC, Strategic ESOP, Boulder Client Services, LLC, Strategic CS, LLC, Hailstone Legal Group, Whitstone Legal Group, Credit Advocates Law Firm, LLC, Royal Client Services, LLC, Greenstone Legal Group, Stratfs, LLC, The Blust Family Irrevocable Trust through Donald J. Holmgren, Trustee, Monarch Legal Group, Strategic ESOT, Summit Client Services, LLC, Bedrock Legal Group, Moore Legal Group, LLC, Pioneer Client Servicing, LLC, Stonepoint Client Services, LLC, John Does 1-50 . (McAdam, Maegan)
January 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER Modifying TRO to Remove STRATEGIC ESOP AND STRATEGIC ESOT as Receivership Defendants and Relief Defendants #102 . Signed by Hon. Michael J. Roemer on 1/30/2024. (RAZ)
January 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 105 TEXT ORDER denying #104 Letter request to appear remotely at the February 1-2, 2024 hearing. All parties are to appear in person with the exception of specified witnesses. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Michael J. Roemer on 1/30/2024. (RAZ)
January 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 104 Letter filed by Strategic ESOP, Strategic ESOT as to Option 1 Client Services, LLC, Northstar Client Services, LLC, Anchor Client Services, LLC, Great Lakes Client Services, LLC, Strategic Consulting, LLC, Bradon Ellis Law Firm LLC, BCF Capital, LLC, Daniel Blumkin, Stonepoint Legal Group, Guidestone Client Services, LLC, Hallock and Associates, The Law Firm of Derek Williams, LLC, Michel Law, LLC, Meadowbrook Legal Group, Strategic Family, Inc.,, Newport Client Services, LLC, Rockwell Client Services, LLC, Strategic Client Support, LLC, Slate Legal Group, Pioneer Law Firm P.C., Anchor Law Firm, PLLC, Twist Financial, LLC, Level One Law, Heartland Client Services, LLC, Blaise Investments, LLC, Harbor Legal Group, Spring Legal Group, Ryan Sasson, Strategic NYC, LLC, Jaclyn Blust, Albert Ian Behar, Versara Lending, LLC, Gustafson Consumer Law Group, LLC, Royal Legal Group, Relialit, LLC, Rockwell Legal Group, Hallock & Associates LLC, T Fin, LLC, The Law Office of Melissa Michel LLC, Monarch Client Services, LLC, Carolina Client Services, LLC, Harbor Client Services, LLC, Northstar Legal Group, Whitestone Client Services, LLC, Heartland Legal Group, Wyolaw, LLC, Chinn Legal Group, LLC, Clear Creek Legal, LLC, Strategic FS Buffalo, LLC, Duke Enterprises, LLC, Canyon Client Services, LLC, Option 1 Legal, Great Lakes Law Firm, Lit Def Strategies, LLC, Boulder Legal Group, Leigh Legal Group, PLLC, Jason Blust, Canyon Legal Group, LLC, Bedrock Client Services, LLC, Newport Legal Group, LLC, Strategic ESOP, Boulder Client Services, LLC, Strategic CS, LLC, Hailstone Legal Group, Whitstone Legal Group, Credit Advocates Law Firm, LLC, Royal Client Services, LLC, Greenstone Legal Group, Stratfs, LLC, The Blust Family Irrevocable Trust through Donald J. Holmgren, Trustee, Monarch Legal Group, Strategic ESOT, Summit Client Services, LLC, Bedrock Legal Group, Moore Legal Group, LLC, Pioneer Client Servicing, LLC, Stonepoint Client Services, LLC, John Does 1-50 Requesting Remote Appearance at February 1-2, 2024 Hearing. (Joseph, Andrew)
January 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 103 Letter filed by The People of the State of New York as to Option 1 Client Services, LLC, Northstar Client Services, LLC, Anchor Client Services, LLC, Great Lakes Client Services, LLC, Strategic Consulting, LLC, Bradon Ellis Law Firm LLC, BCF Capital, LLC, Daniel Blumkin, Stonepoint Legal Group, Guidestone Client Services, LLC, Hallock and Associates, The Law Firm of Derek Williams, LLC, Michel Law, LLC, Meadowbrook Legal Group, Strategic Family, Inc.,, Newport Client Services, LLC, Rockwell Client Services, LLC, Strategic Client Support, LLC, Slate Legal Group, Pioneer Law Firm P.C., Anchor Law Firm, PLLC, Twist Financial, LLC, Level One Law, Heartland Client Services, LLC, Blaise Investments, LLC, Harbor Legal Group, Spring Legal Group, Ryan Sasson, Strategic NYC, LLC, Jaclyn Blust, Albert Ian Behar, Versara Lending, LLC, Gustafson Consumer Law Group, LLC, Royal Legal Group, Relialit, LLC, Rockwell Legal Group, Hallock & Associates LLC, T Fin, LLC, The Law Office of Melissa Michel LLC, Monarch Client Services, LLC, Carolina Client Services, LLC, Harbor Client Services, LLC, Northstar Legal Group, Whitestone Client Services, LLC, Heartland Legal Group, Wyolaw, LLC, Chinn Legal Group, LLC, Clear Creek Legal, LLC, Strategic FS Buffalo, LLC, Duke Enterprises, LLC, Canyon Client Services, LLC, Option 1 Legal, Great Lakes Law Firm, Lit Def Strategies, LLC, Boulder Legal Group, Leigh Legal Group, PLLC, Jason Blust, Canyon Legal Group, LLC, Bedrock Client Services, LLC, Newport Legal Group, LLC, Strategic ESOP, Boulder Client Services, LLC, Strategic CS, LLC, Hailstone Legal Group, Whitstone Legal Group, Credit Advocates Law Firm, LLC, Royal Client Services, LLC, Greenstone Legal Group, Stratfs, LLC, The Blust Family Irrevocable Trust through Donald J. Holmgren, Trustee, Monarch Legal Group, Strategic ESOT, Summit Client Services, LLC, Bedrock Legal Group, Moore Legal Group, LLC, Pioneer Client Servicing, LLC, Stonepoint Client Services, LLC, John Does 1-50 regarding Remote Witnesses. (Rados, Genevieve)
January 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 102 MOTION Motion to Modify Temporary Restraining Order to Remove Strategic ESOP and Strategic ESOT as Receivership Defendants and Relief Defendants by Thomas McNamara. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Thomas W. McNamara in Support of Motion, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Thomas W. McNamara in Support of Motion, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Thoman, James)
January 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 101 RESPONSE in Opposition re #36 MOTION Dissolve Ex Parte Temporary Restraining Order re #12 Order on Motion to Appoint Receiver,, Order on Motion for TRO,,,, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, Order on Motion for Hearing, Plaintiffs' Opposition to Strategic ESOP and ESOT's Statement in Support of Dissolving the TRO filed by The State of Wisconsin. (Beilin, Lewis)
January 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 100 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Hon. Michael J. Roemer on 1/29/2024. (RAZ)
January 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 99 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Anchor Client Services, LLC, BCF Capital, LLC, Bedrock Client Services, LLC, Boulder Client Services, LLC, Canyon Client Services, LLC, Carolina Client Services, LLC, Great Lakes Client Services, LLC, Guidestone Client Services, LLC, Harbor Client Services, LLC, Heartland Client Services, LLC, Monarch Client Services, LLC, Newport Client Services, LLC, Northstar Client Services, LLC, Option 1 Client Services, LLC, Pioneer Client Servicing, LLC, Rockwell Client Services, LLC, Royal Client Services, LLC, Stonepoint Client Services, LLC, Strategic CS, LLC, Strategic Client Support, LLC, Strategic Consulting, LLC, Strategic FS Buffalo, LLC, Strategic Family, Inc.,, Strategic NYC, LLC, Stratfs, LLC, Summit Client Services, LLC, T Fin, LLC, Versara Lending, LLC, Whitestone Client Services, LLC. (Vacco, Dennis)
January 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 98 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Michael J. Roemer. Appearances via ZoomGov: Joseph M. Sanders, Esq., Monika L. Moore, Esq. and Shirley T. Chiu, Esq. on behalf of the Consumer Financial Protection Bureau; NYSAAG Christopher L. Boyd and NYSAAG Genevieve S. Rados on behalf of The People of the State of New York; Dennis C. Vacco, Esq. on behalf of Anchor Client Services, LLC, BCF Capital, LLC, Bedrock Client Services, LLC, Boulder Client Services, LLC, Canyon Client Services, LLC, Carolina Client Services, LLC, Great Lakes Client Services, LLC, Guidestone Client Services, LLC, Harbor Client Services, LLC, Heartland Client Services, LLC, Monarch Client Services, LLC, Newport Client Services, LLC, Northstar Client Services, LLC, Option 1 Client Services, LLC, Pioneer Client Servicing, LLC, Rockwell Client Services, LLC, Royal Client Services, LLC, Stonepoint Client Services, LLC, Strategic CS, LLC, Strategic Client Support, LLC, Strategic Consulting, LLC, Strategic FS Buffalo, LLC, Strategic Family, Inc., Strategic NYC, LLC, Stratfs, LLC, Summit Client Services, LLC, T Fin, LLC, Versara Lending, LLC, Whitestone Client Services, LLC; Ronald S. Safer, Esq. on behalf of Ryan Sasson, Daniel Blumkin, Albert Ian Behar; Rodney O. Personius, Esq. behalf of Jaclyn Blust, Jason Blust, Lit Def Strategies, LLC, Relialit, LLC, The Blust Family Irrevocable Trust through Donald J. Holmgren, Trustee; Terrence M. Connors, Esq. on behalf of Clear Creek Legal, LLC, Credit Advocates Law Firm, LLC, Greenstone Legal Group, Bradon Ellis Law Firm LLC, Hailstone Legal Group, Hallock and Associates, Harbor Legal Group, Anchor Law Firm, PLLC, Bedrock Legal Group, Boulder Legal Group, Canyon Legal Group, LLC, Great Lakes Law Firm, Heartland Legal Group, Level One Law, Meadowbrook Legal Group, Monarch Legal Group, Newport Legal Group, LLC, Northstar Legal Group, Option 1 Legal, Pioneer Law Firm P.C., Rockwell Legal Group, Spring Legal Group, Royal Legal Group, Slate Legal Group, Stonepoint Legal Group, The Law Firm of Derek Williams, LLC, Whitstone Legal Group, Wyolaw, LLC, Chinn Legal Group, LLC, Leigh Legal Group, PLLC, Hallock & Associates LLC, Gustafson Consumer Law Group, LLC, Michel Law, LLC, The Law Office of Melissa Michel LLC, Moore Legal Group, LLC; James C. Thoman, Esq. representing Receiver Thomas W. McNamara.Discovery Hearing held on 1/29/2024 re #88 Letter. Discussions held. Protective Order as to consumer declarations shall be submitted to the Court for signature upon conclusion of this hearing. Other discovery requests were denied as they are not relevant to the issues in front of the Court at this time. The Court advised such requests can be addressed at a later proceeding if necessary. The Court addressed defendants' #93 Motion for an order to present remote testimony of Wendy Muchman. After consideration, the Court denied such motion. (Court Reporter ZoomGov.) (RAZ)NOTE: The Court advised parties and listeners that they are strictly prohibited from recording, reproducing or rebroadcasting any part of this hearing in whole or in part in any fashion. Violation of this Court's Order could be deemed a contempt of Court.
January 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 97 TEXT ORDER granting #89 Motion for Logan D. Smith, Esq. to appear Pro Hac Vice for Thomas McNamara. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Michael J. Roemer on 1/29/2024. (RAZ)Clerk to Follow up
January 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 96 REPLY/RESPONSE to re 94 Text Order,, Letter with case law in support of work product privilege filed by Consumer Financial Protection Bureau. (Sanders, Joseph)
January 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 95 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #93 MOTION An order to present remote testimony of Wendy Muchman filed by Consumer Financial Protection Bureau. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Moore, Monika)
January 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 94 TEXT ORDER. If the parties are unable to agree on a protective order for the exchange of unredacted consumer declarations prior to the 1/29/2024 discovery conference, the parties are to submit separate orders for the Court's consideration prior to the conference.On or before 9:00 a.m. on 1/29/2024, plaintiffs are instructed to provide case law in support of their position that their communications with notaries and/or other third parties regarding presentations to consumers or other conduct alleged in this lawsuit is subject to work-product protection or is otherwise privileged. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Michael J. Roemer on 1/26/2024. (RAZ)
January 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 93 MOTION An order to present remote testimony of Wendy Muchman by Anchor Law Firm, PLLC, Bedrock Legal Group, Boulder Legal Group, Bradon Ellis Law Firm LLC, Canyon Legal Group, LLC, Chinn Legal Group, LLC, Clear Creek Legal, LLC, Great Lakes Law Firm, Greenstone Legal Group, Gustafson Consumer Law Group, LLC, Hailstone Legal Group, Hallock & Associates LLC, Harbor Legal Group, Heartland Legal Group, Level One Law, Meadowbrook Legal Group, Michel Law, LLC, Monarch Legal Group, Moore Legal Group, LLC, Newport Legal Group, LLC, Northstar Legal Group, Option 1 Legal, Pioneer Law Firm P.C., Rockwell Legal Group, Royal Legal Group, Slate Legal Group, Spring Legal Group, Stonepoint Legal Group, The Law Firm of Derek Williams, LLC, The Law Office of Melissa Michel LLC, Whitstone Legal Group, Wyolaw, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration)(Connors, Terrence)
January 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 92 REPLY/RESPONSE to re #88 Letter,,,,,,,,,,, filed by Consumer Financial Protection Bureau. (Sanders, Joseph)
January 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 91 NOTICE of Appearance by Carmen Alexander Vacco on behalf of Anchor Client Services, LLC, BCF Capital, LLC, Bedrock Client Services, LLC, Boulder Client Services, LLC, Canyon Client Services, LLC, Carolina Client Services, LLC, Great Lakes Client Services, LLC, Guidestone Client Services, LLC, Harbor Client Services, LLC, Heartland Client Services, LLC, Monarch Client Services, LLC, Newport Client Services, LLC, Northstar Client Services, LLC, Option 1 Client Services, LLC, Pioneer Client Servicing, LLC, Rockwell Client Services, LLC, Royal Client Services, LLC, Stonepoint Client Services, LLC, Strategic CS, LLC, Strategic Client Support, LLC, Strategic Consulting, LLC, Strategic FS Buffalo, LLC, Strategic Family, Inc.,, Strategic NYC, LLC, Stratfs, LLC, Summit Client Services, LLC, T Fin, LLC, Versara Lending, LLC, Whitestone Client Services, LLC (Vacco, Carmen)
January 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 90 TEXT ORDER re #88 Letter filed by Boulder Client Services, LLC, Strategic NYC, LLC, Strategic Family, Inc., Strategic CS, LLC, Stonepoint Client Services, LLC, Rockwell Client Services, LLC, Heartland Client Services, LLC, Option 1 Client Services, LLC, Strategic Client Support, LLC, Royal Client Services, LLC, Anchor Client Services, LLC, Summit Client Services, LLC, Whitestone Client Services, LLC, Harbor Client Services, LLC, Stratfs, LLC, Great Lakes Client Services, LLC, T Fin, LLC, Versara Lending, LLC, Northstar Client Services, LLC, Monarch Client Services, LLC, Strategic Consulting, LLC, BCF Capital, LLC, Newport Client Services, LLC, Strategic FS Buffalo, LLC, Carolina Client Services, LLC, Pioneer Client Servicing, LLC, Guidestone Client Services, LLC, Bedrock Client Services, LLC, Canyon Client Services, LLC.Plaintiffs' Responses due by 3:00 p.m. (TODAY) 1/26/2024. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Michael J. Roemer on 1/26/2024. (RAZ)
January 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MOTION to appear pro hac vice for Logan D. Smith, Esq. of McNamara Smith LLP ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-5091437.) by Thomas McNamara. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of James C. Thoman in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Sponsoring Affidavit of James C. Thoman in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #3 Petition of Logan D. Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #4 Attorney Admission Oath of Logan D. Smith, #5 Civility Principles Oath of Logan D. Smith, #6 ECF Registration Form)(Thoman, James)
January 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 88 Letter filed by Option 1 Client Services, LLC, Northstar Client Services, LLC, Anchor Client Services, LLC, Great Lakes Client Services, LLC, Strategic Consulting, LLC, BCF Capital, LLC, Guidestone Client Services, LLC, Strategic Family, Inc.,, Newport Client Services, LLC, Rockwell Client Services, LLC, Strategic Client Support, LLC, Heartland Client Services, LLC, Strategic NYC, LLC, Versara Lending, LLC, T Fin, LLC, Monarch Client Services, LLC, Carolina Client Services, LLC, Harbor Client Services, LLC, Whitestone Client Services, LLC, Strategic FS Buffalo, LLC, Canyon Client Services, LLC, Bedrock Client Services, LLC, Boulder Client Services, LLC, Strategic CS, LLC, Royal Client Services, LLC, Stratfs, LLC, Summit Client Services, LLC, Pioneer Client Servicing, LLC, Stonepoint Client Services, LLC as to Option 1 Client Services, LLC, Northstar Client Services, LLC, Anchor Client Services, LLC, Great Lakes Client Services, LLC, Strategic Consulting, LLC, Bradon Ellis Law Firm LLC, BCF Capital, LLC, Daniel Blumkin, Stonepoint Legal Group, Guidestone Client Services, LLC, Hallock and Associates, The Law Firm of Derek Williams, LLC, Michel Law, LLC, Meadowbrook Legal Group, Strategic Family, Inc.,, Newport Client Services, LLC, Rockwell Client Services, LLC, Strategic Client Support, LLC, Slate Legal Group, Pioneer Law Firm P.C., Anchor Law Firm, PLLC, Twist Financial, LLC, Level One Law, Heartland Client Services, LLC, Blaise Investments, LLC, Harbor Legal Group, Spring Legal Group, Ryan Sasson, Strategic NYC, LLC, Jaclyn Blust, Albert Ian Behar, Versara Lending, LLC, Gustafson Consumer Law Group, LLC, Royal Legal Group, Relialit, LLC, Rockwell Legal Group, Hallock & Associates LLC, T Fin, LLC, The Law Office of Melissa Michel LLC, Monarch Client Services, LLC, Carolina Client Services, LLC, Harbor Client Services, LLC, Northstar Legal Group, Whitestone Client Services, LLC, Heartland Legal Group, Wyolaw, LLC, Chinn Legal Group, LLC, Clear Creek Legal, LLC, Strategic FS Buffalo, LLC, Duke Enterprises, LLC, Canyon Client Services, LLC, Option 1 Legal, Great Lakes Law Firm, Lit Def Strategies, LLC, Boulder Legal Group, Leigh Legal Group, PLLC, Jason Blust, Canyon Legal Group, LLC, Bedrock Client Services, LLC, Newport Legal Group, LLC, Strategic ESOP, Boulder Client Services, LLC, Strategic CS, LLC, Hailstone Legal Group, Whitstone Legal Group, Credit Advocates Law Firm, LLC, Royal Client Services, LLC, Greenstone Legal Group, Stratfs, LLC, The Blust Family Irrevocable Trust through Donald J. Holmgren, Trustee, Monarch Legal Group, Strategic ESOT, Summit Client Services, LLC, Bedrock Legal Group, Moore Legal Group, LLC, Pioneer Client Servicing, LLC, Stonepoint Client Services, LLC, John Does 1-50 . (Vacco, Dennis)
January 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting #85 Motion for the Release of Funds to Pay Pre-Receivership Payroll Expenses. Signed by Hon. Michael J. Roemer on 1/26/2024. (RAZ)
January 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 86 NOTICE of Appearance by Shirley T. Chiu on behalf of Consumer Financial Protection Bureau (Chiu, Shirley)
January 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 85 Emergency MOTION Emergency Motion for the Release of Funds to Pay Pre-Receivership Payroll Expenses by Thomas McNamara. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration in Support of Emergency Motion, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Thoman, James)
January 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 84 REPLY/RESPONSE to re #58 MOTION an order allowing certain non-party witnesses to testify remotely Statement of Defendants Strategic Employee Stock Ownership Plan and Strategic Employee Stock Ownership Trust Regarding Non-Party Remote Testimony filed by Strategic ESOP, Strategic ESOT. (Joseph, Andrew)
January 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 83 TEXT ORDER granting #79 Motion for Matthew Davies, Esq. to appear Pro Hac Vice for The People of the State of New York. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Michael J. Roemer on 1/25/2024. (RAZ)Clerk to Follow up
January 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 82 TEXT ORDER granting #61 Motion for Richard J. Pearl, Esq. to appear Pro Hac Vice for Strategic ESOP. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Michael J. Roemer on 1/25/2024. (RAZ)Clerk to Follow up
January 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 81 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS to #61 MOTION to appear pro hac vice Richard J. Pearl ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-5087103.) . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Admission Petition Form, #3 Sponsoring Affidavit, #4 Attorney's Oath, #5 Civility Principles Oath, #6 Attorney Database and Electronic Case Filing Registration Form)(Joseph, Andrew)
January 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 80 TEXT ORDER declining to adopt the recommendation in the Report and Recommendation ("R&R") entered on January 24, 2024 (Dkt. 77), that the objection period set forth in Fed. R. Civ. P. 72 be waived but otherwise adopting the remaining portions of the R&R, subject to modification upon consideration of any objections. The parties may file objections within 14 days after entry of the R&R. For the reasons set forth in the R&R and the initial Temporary Restraining Order ("TRO") entered on January 11, 2024 (Dkt. 12), and good cause having been shown, the Court extends the TRO until February 8, 2024, at 3:00 p.m., or until further order of the Court, whichever is earlier. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 01/25/2024. (CDH)
January 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MOTION to appear pro hac vice for Matthew Davies ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-5089670.) by The People of the State of New York. (Attachments: #1 Admission Petition, #2 Sponsor Affidavit, #3 Attorney's Oath, #4 Civility Principles Oath, #5 Attorney Database Form)(Rados, Genevieve)
January 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 78 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Michael J. Roemer. Appearances via ZoomGov: Joseph M. Sanders, Esq. and Vanessa A. Buchko, Esq. on behalf of the Consumer Financial Protection Bureau; NYSAAG Christopher L. Boyd and NYSAAG Genevieve S. Rados on behalf of The People of the State of New York; Dennis C. Vacco, Esq. on behalf of Anchor Client Services, LLC, BCF Capital, LLC, Bedrock Client Services, LLC, Boulder Client Services, LLC, Canyon Client Services, LLC, Carolina Client Services, LLC, Great Lakes Client Services, LLC, Guidestone Client Services, LLC, Harbor Client Services, LLC, Heartland Client Services, LLC, Monarch Client Services, LLC, Newport Client Services, LLC, Northstar Client Services, LLC, Option 1 Client Services, LLC, Pioneer Client Servicing, LLC, Rockwell Client Services, LLC, Royal Client Services, LLC, Stonepoint Client Services, LLC, Strategic CS, LLC, Strategic Client Support, LLC, Strategic Consulting, LLC, Strategic FS Buffalo, LLC, Strategic Family, Inc., Strategic NYC, LLC, Stratfs, LLC, Summit Client Services, LLC, T Fin, LLC, Versara Lending, LLC, Whitestone Client Services, LLC; Ronald S. Safer, Esq., Matthew P. Kennison, Esq., Maegan B. McAdam, Esq., and Rodney Perry, Esq. on behalf of Ryan Sasson, Daniel Blumkin, Albert Ian Behar; Rodney O. Personius, Esq. behalf of Jaclyn Blust, Jason Blust, Lit Def Strategies, LLC, Relialit, LLC, The Blust Family Irrevocable Trust through Donald J. Holmgren, Trustee; Terrence M. Connors, Esq. on behalf of Clear Creek Legal, LLC, Credit Advocates Law Firm, LLC, Greenstone Legal Group, Bradon Ellis Law Firm LLC, Hailstone Legal Group, Hallock and Associates, Harbor Legal Group, Anchor Law Firm, PLLC, Bedrock Legal Group, Boulder Legal Group, Canyon Legal Group, LLC, Great Lakes Law Firm, Heartland Legal Group, Level One Law, Meadowbrook Legal Group, Monarch Legal Group, Newport Legal Group, LLC, Northstar Legal Group, Option 1 Legal, Pioneer Law Firm P.C., Rockwell Legal Group, Spring Legal Group, Royal Legal Group, Slate Legal Group, Stonepoint Legal Group, The Law Firm of Derek Williams, LLC, Whitstone Legal Group, Wyolaw, LLC, Chinn Legal Group, LLC, Leigh Legal Group, PLLC, Hallock & Associates LLC, Gustafson Consumer Law Group, LLC, Michel Law, LLC, The Law Office of Melissa Michel LLC, Moore Legal Group, LLC; James C. Thoman, Esq. representing Receiver Thomas W. McNamara; Receiver Thomas W. McNamara. Discovery Hearing held re #68 Letter on 1/24/2024. Discussions held. Parties to submit to the Court no later than 1/29/2024 a joint protective order regarding confidential documents. If parties are unable to agree, they are to submit separate orders for the Court's consideration.The Court granted defendants' discovery requests regarding payment processors and the subpoenaing of notaries. The Court denied defendants' request to modify the existing TRO. All other discovery issues resolved. (Court Reporter ZoomGov.) (RAZ)NOTE: The Court advised parties and listeners that they are strictly prohibited from recording, reproducing or rebroadcasting any part of this hearing in whole or in part in any fashion. Violation of this Court's Order could be deemed a contempt of Court.
January 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 77 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #57 MOTION to Extend TRO. Signed by Hon. Michael J. Roemer on 1/24/2024. (RAZ)
January 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 76 TEXT ORDER granting #60 Motion for Richard J. Bernard, Esq. to appear Pro Hac Vice for Strategic ESOP. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Michael J. Roemer on 1/24/2024. (RAZ)Clerk to Follow up
January 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 75 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS to #60 MOTION to appear pro hac vice Richard J. Bernard ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-5087097.) . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Admission Petition Form, #3 Sponsoring Affidavit, #4 Attorney's Oath, #5 Civility Principles Oath, #6 Attorney Database and Electronic Case Filing Registration Form)(Joseph, Andrew)
January 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Letter filed by Consumer Financial Protection Bureau as to Option 1 Client Services, LLC, Northstar Client Services, LLC, Anchor Client Services, LLC, Great Lakes Client Services, LLC, Strategic Consulting, LLC, Bradon Ellis Law Firm LLC, BCF Capital, LLC, Daniel Blumkin, Stonepoint Legal Group, Guidestone Client Services, LLC, Hallock and Associates, The Law Firm of Derek Williams, LLC, Michel Law, LLC, Meadowbrook Legal Group, Strategic Family, Inc.,, Newport Client Services, LLC, Rockwell Client Services, LLC, Strategic Client Support, LLC, Slate Legal Group, Pioneer Law Firm P.C., Anchor Law Firm, PLLC, Twist Financial, LLC, Level One Law, Heartland Client Services, LLC, Blaise Investments, LLC, Harbor Legal Group, Spring Legal Group, Ryan Sasson, Strategic NYC, LLC, Jaclyn Blust, Albert Ian Behar, Versara Lending, LLC, Gustafson Consumer Law Group, LLC, Royal Legal Group, Relialit, LLC, Rockwell Legal Group, Hallock & Associates LLC, T Fin, LLC, The Law Office of Melissa Michel LLC, Monarch Client Services, LLC, Carolina Client Services, LLC, Harbor Client Services, LLC, Northstar Legal Group, Whitestone Client Services, LLC, Heartland Legal Group, Wyolaw, LLC, Chinn Legal Group, LLC, Clear Creek Legal, LLC, Strategic FS Buffalo, LLC, Duke Enterprises, LLC, Canyon Client Services, LLC, Option 1 Legal, Great Lakes Law Firm, Lit Def Strategies, LLC, Boulder Legal Group, Leigh Legal Group, PLLC, Jason Blust, Canyon Legal Group, LLC, Bedrock Client Services, LLC, Newport Legal Group, LLC, Strategic ESOP, Boulder Client Services, LLC, Strategic CS, LLC, Hailstone Legal Group, Whitstone Legal Group, Credit Advocates Law Firm, LLC, Royal Client Services, LLC, Greenstone Legal Group, Stratfs, LLC, The Blust Family Irrevocable Trust through Donald J. Holmgren, Trustee, Monarch Legal Group, Strategic ESOT, Summit Client Services, LLC, Bedrock Legal Group, Moore Legal Group, LLC, Pioneer Client Servicing, LLC, Stonepoint Client Services, LLC, John Does 1-50 in Opposition to Docket No. 68. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Moore, Monika)
January 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 73 TEXT ORDER re #69 Response in Support of Motion filed by Strategic ESOT, Strategic ESOP. Plaintiffs to file a reply no later than 5:00 p.m. on 1/29/2024. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Michael J. Roemer on 1/24/2024. (RAZ)
January 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 72 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Strategic ESOP, Strategic ESOT. to #70 Declaration, Declaration of James Urbach in Support of Defendants Strategic Employee Stock Ownership Plan's and Strategic Employee Stock Ownership Trust's Statement in Support of Dissolving the Temporary Restraining Order filed by Strategic ESOP, Strategic ESOT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Joseph, Andrew)
January 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 71 RESPONSE in Opposition re #57 MOTION to Extend TRO re #12 Order on Motion to Appoint Receiver,, Order on Motion for TRO,,,, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, Order on Motion for Hearing, filed by Albert Ian Behar, Daniel Blumkin, Ryan Sasson. (McAdam, Maegan)
January 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 70 DECLARATION signed by James Urbach re #69 Response in Support of Motion, filed by Strategic ESOP, Strategic ESOT Declaration of James Urbach in Support of Defendants Strategic Employee Stock Ownership Plan's and Strategic Employee Stock Ownership Trust's Statement in Support of Dissolving the Temporary Restraining Order filed by Strategic ESOP, Strategic ESOT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Joseph, Andrew)
January 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 69 RESPONSE in Support re #36 MOTION Dissolve Ex Parte Temporary Restraining Order re #12 Order on Motion to Appoint Receiver,, Order on Motion for TRO,,,, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, Order on Motion for Hearing, Defendants Strategic Employee Stock Ownership Plan's and Strategic Employee Stock Ownership Trust's Statement in Support of Dissolving the Temporary Restraining Order filed by Strategic ESOP, Strategic ESOT. (Joseph, Andrew)
January 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 68 Letter filed by Option 1 Client Services, LLC, Northstar Client Services, LLC, Anchor Client Services, LLC, Great Lakes Client Services, LLC, Strategic Consulting, LLC, BCF Capital, LLC, Guidestone Client Services, LLC, Strategic Family, Inc.,, Newport Client Services, LLC, Rockwell Client Services, LLC, Strategic Client Support, LLC, Heartland Client Services, LLC, Strategic NYC, LLC, Versara Lending, LLC, T Fin, LLC, Monarch Client Services, LLC, Carolina Client Services, LLC, Harbor Client Services, LLC, Whitestone Client Services, LLC, Strategic FS Buffalo, LLC, Canyon Client Services, LLC, Bedrock Client Services, LLC, Boulder Client Services, LLC, Strategic CS, LLC, Royal Client Services, LLC, Stratfs, LLC, Summit Client Services, LLC, Pioneer Client Servicing, LLC, Stonepoint Client Services, LLC as to Option 1 Client Services, LLC, Northstar Client Services, LLC, Anchor Client Services, LLC, Great Lakes Client Services, LLC, Strategic Consulting, LLC, Bradon Ellis Law Firm LLC, BCF Capital, LLC, Daniel Blumkin, Stonepoint Legal Group, Guidestone Client Services, LLC, Hallock and Associates, The Law Firm of Derek Williams, LLC, Michel Law, LLC, Meadowbrook Legal Group, Strategic Family, Inc.,, Newport Client Services, LLC, Rockwell Client Services, LLC, Strategic Client Support, LLC, Slate Legal Group, Pioneer Law Firm P.C., Anchor Law Firm, PLLC, Twist Financial, LLC, Level One Law, Heartland Client Services, LLC, Blaise Investments, LLC, Harbor Legal Group, Spring Legal Group, Ryan Sasson, Strategic NYC, LLC, Jaclyn Blust, Albert Ian Behar, Versara Lending, LLC, Gustafson Consumer Law Group, LLC, Royal Legal Group, Relialit, LLC, Rockwell Legal Group, Hallock & Associates LLC, T Fin, LLC, The Law Office of Melissa Michel LLC, Monarch Client Services, LLC, Carolina Client Services, LLC, Harbor Client Services, LLC, Northstar Legal Group, Whitestone Client Services, LLC, Heartland Legal Group, Wyolaw, LLC, Chinn Legal Group, LLC, Clear Creek Legal, LLC, Strategic FS Buffalo, LLC, Duke Enterprises, LLC, Canyon Client Services, LLC, Option 1 Legal, Great Lakes Law Firm, Lit Def Strategies, LLC, Boulder Legal Group, Leigh Legal Group, PLLC, Jason Blust, Canyon Legal Group, LLC, Bedrock Client Services, LLC, Newport Legal Group, LLC, Strategic ESOP, Boulder Client Services, LLC, Strategic CS, LLC, Hailstone Legal Group, Whitstone Legal Group, Credit Advocates Law Firm, LLC, Royal Client Services, LLC, Greenstone Legal Group, Stratfs, LLC, The Blust Family Irrevocable Trust through Donald J. Holmgren, Trustee, Monarch Legal Group, Strategic ESOT, Summit Client Services, LLC, Bedrock Legal Group, Moore Legal Group, LLC, Pioneer Client Servicing, LLC, Stonepoint Client Services, LLC, John Does 1-50 . (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Vacco, Dennis)
January 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew B. Joseph on behalf of Strategic ESOT (Joseph, Andrew)
January 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 66 TEXT ORDER. In light of the time-sensitive pending motion to extend the TRO (Dkt. 57), and given the pendency of the ongoing recusal-subject-to-remittal process (Dkt. 43), the case is temporarily assigned to Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford. The resolution of the ongoing recusal-subject-to-remittal process (Dkt. 43) will determine the district judge permanently assigned to this case. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. on 1/23/2024. (KEF)Clerk to Follow up
January 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 65 NOTICE by Thomas McNamara re #12 Order on Motion to Appoint Receiver,, Order on Motion for TRO,,,, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, Order on Motion for Hearing, Notice of Filing Bond of Receiver (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Thoman, James)
January 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford added. Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. no longer assigned to case. (LB)
January 23, 2024 Opinion or Order E-Filing Notification: #60 MOTION to appear pro hac vice Richard J. Bernard #61 MOTION to appear pro hac vice Richard J. Pearl ACTION REQUIRED: Attorneys, not admitted to this Court, are unable to /s/ documents in lieu of a wet signature. Once admitted, their CM/ECF username and password can be used as a signature as per the Administrative Procedures Guide for Electronic Filing 2(G)(iii). Refile all admission documents using Docketing Event: Continuation of Exhibits. (DDS)
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 64 CONSENT ORDER Regarding Asset Freeze. Signed by Hon. Michael J. Roemer on 1/22/2024. (RAZ)
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 63 TEXT ORDER. Any response by defendants to plaintiffs' motion to extend the TRO #57 shall be filed no later than 1/23/2024. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Michael J. Roemer on 1/22/2024. (RAZ)
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 62 TEXT ORDER. On or before 1/25/2024, defendants shall file a response to plaintiffs' motion for an order allowing certain non-party witnesses to testify remotely #58 . Defendants' response shall indicate whether they seek to offer any remote testimony by witnesses and the reasons why such defense witnesses cannot be present in-person. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Michael J. Roemer on 1/22/2024. (RAZ)
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MOTION to appear pro hac vice Richard J. Pearl ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-5087103.) by Strategic ESOP. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing - Illinois, #2 Certificate of Good Standing - EDNY, #3 Admission Petition Form, #4 Sponsoring Affidavit, #5 Attorney's Oath, #6 Civility Principles and Guidelines Oath, #7 Attorney Database and Electronic Case Filing Registration Form)(Joseph, Andrew)
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MOTION to appear pro hac vice Richard J. Bernard ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-5087097.) by Strategic ESOP. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Admission Petition Form, #3 Sponsoring Affidavit, #4 Attorney's Oath, #5 Civility Principles Oath, #6 Attorney Database and Electronic Case Filing Registration Form)(Joseph, Andrew)
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew B. Joseph on behalf of Strategic ESOP (Joseph, Andrew)
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MOTION an order allowing certain non-party witnesses to testify remotely by The People of the State of New York. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration Declaration of David Fox, #3 Declaration Declaration of Stephen Pavlow)(Rados, Genevieve)
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MOTION to Extend TRO re #12 Order on Motion to Appoint Receiver,, Order on Motion for TRO,,,, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, Order on Motion for Hearing, by Consumer Financial Protection Bureau. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Moore, Monika)
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 56 STATUS REPORT Report of Temporary Receiver on Status of Client Services by Thomas McNamara. (Thoman, James)
January 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 55 TEXT ORDER granting #41 Motion for Rodney Perry, Esq. to appear Pro Hac Vice for for Albert Ian Behar, Daniel Blumkin and Ryan Sasson. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Michael J. Roemer on 1/21/2024. (RAZ)Clerk to Follow up
January 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 54 TEXT ORDER granting #40 Motion for Ronald S. Safer, Esq. to appear Pro Hac Vice for for Albert Ian Behar, Daniel Blumkin and Ryan Sasson. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Michael J. Roemer on 1/21/2024. (RAZ)Clerk to Follow up
January 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 53 TEXT ORDER granting #49 Motion for Alexander D. Wall, Esq. to appear Pro Hac Vice for Thomas McNamara. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Michael J. Roemer on 1/21/2024. (RAZ)Clerk to Follow up
January 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 52 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS to #36 MOTION Dissolve Ex Parte Temporary Restraining Order re #12 Order on Motion to Appoint Receiver,, Order on Motion for TRO,,,, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, Order on Motion for Hearing, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit to Dkt. 36-4 Gustafson Declaration, #2 Exhibit to Dkt. 36-4 Gustafson Declaration, #3 Exhibit to Dkt. 36-4 Gustafson Declaration, #4 Exhibit to Dkt. 36-4 Gustafson Declaration, #5 Exhibit to Dkt. 36-4 Gustafson Declaration)(Allen, Scott)
January 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 51 TEXT ORDER. The Clerk is instructed that the following documents and all accompanying declarations, attachments and exhibits shall be UNSEALED: 1, 4, 5, 7, 8, 9, 18. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Michael J. Roemer on 1/18/2024. (RAZ)Clerk to Follow up
January 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Michael J. Roemer. Appearances via ZoomGov: Joseph M. Sanders, Esq. and Vanessa A. Buchko, Esq. on behalf of the Consumer Financial Protection Bureau; NYSAAG Christopher L. Boyd on behalf of The People of the State of New York; Dennis C. Vacco, Esq. on behalf of Anchor Client Services, LLC, BCF Capital, LLC, Bedrock Client Services, LLC, Boulder Client Services, LLC, Canyon Client Services, LLC, Carolina Client Services, LLC, Great Lakes Client Services, LLC, Guidestone Client Services, LLC, Harbor Client Services, LLC, Heartland Client Services, LLC, Monarch Client Services, LLC, Newport Client Services, LLC, Northstar Client Services, LLC, Option 1 Client Services, LLC, Pioneer Client Servicing, LLC, Rockwell Client Services, LLC, Royal Client Services, LLC, Stonepoint Client Services, LLC, Strategic CS, LLC, Strategic Client Support, LLC, Strategic Consulting, LLC, Strategic FS Buffalo, LLC, Strategic Family, Inc., Strategic NYC, LLC, Stratfs, LLC, Summit Client Services, LLC, T Fin, LLC, Versara Lending, LLC, Whitestone Client Services, LLC; Ronald S. Safer, Esq. on behalf of Ryan Sasson, Daniel Blumkin, Albert Ian Behar; Rodney O. Personius, Esq. behalf of Jaclyn Blust, Jason Blust, Lit Def Strategies, LLC, Relialit, LLC, The Blust Family Irrevocable Trust through Donald J. Holmgren, Trustee; Terrence M. Connors, Esq. on behalf of Clear Creek Legal, LLC, Credit Advocates Law Firm, LLC, Greenstone Legal Group, Bradon Ellis Law Firm LLC, Hailstone Legal Group, Hallock and Associates, Harbor Legal Group, Anchor Law Firm, PLLC, Bedrock Legal Group, Boulder Legal Group, Canyon Legal Group, LLC, Great Lakes Law Firm, Heartland Legal Group, Level One Law, Meadowbrook Legal Group, Monarch Legal Group, Newport Legal Group, LLC, Northstar Legal Group, Option 1 Legal, Pioneer Law Firm P.C., Rockwell Legal Group, Spring Legal Group, Royal Legal Group, Slate Legal Group, Stonepoint Legal Group, The Law Firm of Derek Williams, LLC, Whitstone Legal Group, Wyolaw, LLC, Chinn Legal Group, LLC, Leigh Legal Group, PLLC, Hallock & Associates LLC, Gustafson Consumer Law Group, LLC, Michel Law, LLC, The Law Office of Melissa Michel LLC, Moore Legal Group, LLC; James C. Thoman, Esq. on behalf of Receiver Thomas McNamara. Scheduling Conference held on 1/18/2024. Discussions held regarding the TRO now in place, #34 Motion to Intervene and #36 Motion to Dissolve TRO.The Court indicated that the third party law firms have shown basis for intervention and will be participating in the evidentiary hearing. An Evidentiary Hearing was set for 2/1/2024 and 2/2/2024 at 9:00 AM in Cattaraugus Courtroom, 7th West, 2 Niagara Square, Buffalo, NY before Hon. Michael J. Roemer. Parties are to submit their witness list and exhibit list to the Court no later than 1/30/2024. The Court will hold #36 Motion to Dissolve in abeyance. (Court Reporter ZoomGov.) (RAZ)NOTE: The Court advised parties and listeners that they are strictly prohibited from recording, reproducing or rebroadcasting any part of this hearing in whole or in part in any fashion. Violation of this Court's Order could be deemed a contempt of Court.
January 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MOTION to appear pro hac vice for Alexander D. Wall, Esq. of McNamara Smith LLP ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-5083844.) by Thomas McNamara. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James Thoman in Support of Motion, #2 Sponsoring Affidavit, #3 Petition for Attorney Admission, #4 Attorney Admission Oath, #5 Civility Principles Oath, #6 Attorney Database ECF Registration)(Thoman, James)
January 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 48 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Albert Ian Behar, Daniel Blumkin, Ryan Sasson. to #41 MOTION to appear pro hac vice of Rodney Perry ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-5082113.) Attorney Admission Petition filed by Albert Ian Behar, Daniel Blumkin, Ryan Sasson. (McAdam, Maegan)
January 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 47 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Albert Ian Behar, Daniel Blumkin, Ryan Sasson. to #40 MOTION to appear pro hac vice of Ronald S. Safer ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-5082055.) Attorney Admission Petition filed by Albert Ian Behar, Daniel Blumkin, Ryan Sasson. (McAdam, Maegan)
January 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 46 TEXT ORDER granting #44 Motion for Matthew Patrick Kennison, Esq. to appear Pro Hac Vice for Albert Ian Behar, Daniel Blumkin, and Ryan Sasson. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Michael J. Roemer on 1/18/2024. (RAZ)Clerk to Follow up
January 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Rodney O. Personius on behalf of Jaclyn Blust, Jason Blust, Lit Def Strategies, LLC, Relialit, LLC, The Blust Family Irrevocable Trust through Donald J. Holmgren, Trustee (Personius, Rodney)
January 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MOTION to appear pro hac vice of Matthew P. Kennison ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-5083127.) by Albert Ian Behar, Daniel Blumkin, Ryan Sasson. (Attachments: #1 Admission Petition Form, #2 Admission Sponsor Affidavit, #3 Civility Principles and Guidelines Oath, #4 Attorney's Oath, #5 Attorney Database and Electronic Case Filing Registration Form)(McAdam, Maegan)
January 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 43 NOTICE Concerning Waiver of Judicial Disqualification: Judge Sinatra is recused in this case because partners at his former law firm, Hodgson Russ, serve as trustees of a defined benefit plan that will pay Judge Sinatra a pension benefit upon retirement. That future pension benefit does not depend on Hodgson Russ for its viability, and investment decisions are made by an independent professional. This disqualification is subject to remittal by the parties: the judge may participate in this case if, in light of this disclosure, the parties and their lawyers have an opportunity to confer outside the presence of the judge, all agree in writing or on the record that the judge should not be disqualified, and the judge is then willing to participate. Any such remittal agreement should be incorporated in the record of the proceeding. ACTION REQUIRED: Parties waiving recusal shall mail a letter (sample attached) to the Clerk of Court, US District Court for the Western District of New York, 2 Niagara Square, Buffalo, NY 14202. Clerk to Follow-Up (TMK)
January 18, 2024 Opinion or Order E-Filing Notification: #41 MOTION to appear pro hac vice of Rodney Perry ACTION REQUIRED: Attorneys not admitted to this court are unable to s/ documents as per Administrative Procedure 2(G)(iii). Refile the Attorney Admission Petition under docketing event: Continuation of Exhibits. (DDS)
January 18, 2024 Opinion or Order E-Filing Notification: re #42 NOTICE of Appearance - Modified Docket text to reflect that the receiver is being represented. (TMK)
January 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by James C. Thoman on behalf of Thomas McNamara the receiver (Thoman, James) Modified on 1/18/2024 to edit the text (TMK).
January 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MOTION to appear pro hac vice of Rodney Perry ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-5082113.) by Albert Ian Behar, Daniel Blumkin, Ryan Sasson. (Attachments: #1 Admission Petition Form, #2 Admission Sponsor Affidavit, #3 Attorney's Oath, #4 Civility Principles and Guidelines Oath, #5 Attorney Database and Electronic Case Filing Registration Form)(McAdam, Maegan)
January 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MOTION to appear pro hac vice of Ronald S. Safer ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-5082055.) by Albert Ian Behar, Daniel Blumkin, Ryan Sasson. (Attachments: #1 Admission Petition Form, #2 Admission Sponsor Affidavit, #3 Attorneys Oath, #4 Civility Principles and Guidelines Oath, #5 Attorney Database and Electronic Case Filing Registration Form)(McAdam, Maegan)
January 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 39 NOTICE: All parties are expected to comply with Judge Sinatra's individual requirements set forth in the "Judges' Info" section of the Court's website. Corporate and LLC parties should pay particular attention to the tab relating to such parties. (KLH)
January 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by Maegan Brianne McAdam on behalf of Albert Ian Behar, Daniel Blumkin, Ryan Sasson (McAdam, Maegan)
January 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 37 NOTICE of Appearance by Genevieve Sumner Rados on behalf of The People of the State of New York (Rados, Genevieve)
January 17, 2024 Opinion or Order E-Filing Notification: re #34 MOTION Motion to Intervene #35 Corporate Disclosure Statement - Modified text on 1/17/2024 to remove a defendant that the attorney doesn't represent (TMK)
January 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Case Reassigned to Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo no longer assigned to the case. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (TMK)
January 17, 2024 Opinion or Order SCHEDULING NOTICE. Scheduling Conference set for 1/18/2024 01:00 PM in via video conference before Hon. Michael J. Roemer. (RAZ)
January 17, 2024 Opinion or Order *DUPLICATE ENTRY* SCHEDULING NOTICE. Scheduling Conference set for 1/18/2024 01:00 PM in via video conference before Hon. Michael J. Roemer. (RAZ)
January 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MOTION Dissolve Ex Parte Temporary Restraining Order re #12 Order on Motion to Appoint Receiver,, Order on Motion for TRO,,,, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,, Order on Motion for Hearing, by Anchor Client Services, LLC, BCF Capital, LLC, Bedrock Client Services, LLC, Boulder Client Services, LLC, Canyon Client Services, LLC, Carolina Client Services, LLC, Great Lakes Client Services, LLC, Guidestone Client Services, LLC, Harbor Client Services, LLC, Heartland Client Services, LLC, Monarch Client Services, LLC, Newport Client Services, LLC, Northstar Client Services, LLC, Option 1 Client Services, LLC, Pioneer Client Servicing, LLC, Rockwell Client Services, LLC, Royal Client Services, LLC, Stonepoint Client Services, LLC, Strategic CS, LLC, Strategic Client Support, LLC, Strategic Consulting, LLC, Strategic FS Buffalo, LLC, Strategic Family, Inc.,, Strategic NYC, LLC, Stratfs, LLC, Summit Client Services, LLC, T Fin, LLC, Versara Lending, LLC, Whitestone Client Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration, #3 Declaration, #4 Declaration)(Vacco, Dennis)
January 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Anchor Law Firm, PLLC, Bedrock Legal Group, Boulder Legal Group, Bradon Ellis Law Firm LLC, Canyon Legal Group, LLC, Chinn Legal Group, LLC, Clear Creek Legal, LLC, Great Lakes Law Firm, Greenstone Legal Group, Gustafson Consumer Law Group, LLC, Hailstone Legal Group, Hallock & Associates LLC, Harbor Legal Group, Heartland Legal Group, Leigh Legal Group, PLLC, Level One Law, Meadowbrook Legal Group, Michel Law, LLC, Monarch Legal Group, Newport Legal Group, LLC, Northstar Legal Group, Option 1 Legal, Pioneer Law Firm P.C., Rockwell Legal Group, Royal Legal Group, Slate Legal Group, Spring Legal Group, Stonepoint Legal Group, The Law Firm of Derek Williams, LLC, The Law Office of Melissa Michel LLC, Whitstone Legal Group, Wyolaw, LLC. (Connors, Terrence) Modified on 1/17/2024 to remove a defendant that the attorney doesn't represent (TMK).
January 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MOTION Motion to Intervene by Anchor Law Firm, PLLC, Bedrock Legal Group, Boulder Legal Group, Canyon Legal Group, LLC, Chinn Legal Group, LLC, Clear Creek Legal, LLC, Great Lakes Law Firm, Greenstone Legal Group, Gustafson Consumer Law Group, LLC, Hailstone Legal Group, Hallock & Associates LLC, Hallock and Associates, Harbor Legal Group, Heartland Legal Group, Leigh Legal Group, PLLC, Level One Law, Meadowbrook Legal Group, Michel Law, LLC, Monarch Legal Group, Moore Legal Group, LLC, Newport Legal Group, LLC, Northstar Legal Group, Option 1 Legal, Pioneer Law Firm P.C., Rockwell Legal Group, Royal Legal Group, Slate Legal Group, Spring Legal Group, Stonepoint Legal Group, The Law Firm of Derek Williams, LLC, The Law Office of Melissa Michel LLC, Whitstone Legal Group.(Connors, Terrence) Modified on 1/17/2024 to remove a defendant that the attorney doesn't represent (TMK).
January 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Terrence M. Connors on behalf of Clear Creek Legal, LLC, Credit Advocates Law Firm, LLC, Greenstone Legal Group, Bradon Ellis Law Firm LLC, Hailstone Legal Group, Hallock and Associates, Harbor Legal Group, Anchor Law Firm, PLLC, Bedrock Legal Group, Boulder Legal Group, Canyon Legal Group, LLC, Great Lakes Law Firm, Heartland Legal Group, Level One Law, Meadowbrook Legal Group, Monarch Legal Group, Newport Legal Group, LLC, Northstar Legal Group, Option 1 Legal, Pioneer Law Firm P.C., Rockwell Legal Group, Spring Legal Group, Royal Legal Group, Slate Legal Group, Stonepoint Legal Group, The Law Firm of Derek Williams, LLC, Whitstone Legal Group, Wyolaw, LLC, Chinn Legal Group, LLC, Leigh Legal Group, PLLC, Hallock & Associates LLC, Gustafson Consumer Law Group, LLC, Michel Law, LLC, The Law Office of Melissa Michel LLC, Moore Legal Group, LLC (Connors, Terrence)
January 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott S. Allen, Jr on behalf of Anchor Client Services, LLC, BCF Capital, LLC, Bedrock Client Services, LLC, Boulder Client Services, LLC, Canyon Client Services, LLC, Carolina Client Services, LLC, Great Lakes Client Services, LLC, Guidestone Client Services, LLC, Harbor Client Services, LLC, Heartland Client Services, LLC, Monarch Client Services, LLC, Newport Client Services, LLC, Northstar Client Services, LLC, Option 1 Client Services, LLC, Pioneer Client Servicing, LLC, Rockwell Client Services, LLC, Royal Client Services, LLC, Stonepoint Client Services, LLC, Strategic CS, LLC, Strategic Client Support, LLC, Strategic Consulting, LLC, Strategic FS Buffalo, LLC, Strategic Family, Inc.,, Strategic NYC, LLC, Stratfs, LLC, Summit Client Services, LLC, T Fin, LLC, Versara Lending, LLC, Whitestone Client Services, LLC (Allen, Scott)
January 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis C. Vacco on behalf of Anchor Client Services, LLC, BCF Capital, LLC, Bedrock Client Services, LLC, Boulder Client Services, LLC, Canyon Client Services, LLC, Carolina Client Services, LLC, Great Lakes Client Services, LLC, Guidestone Client Services, LLC, Harbor Client Services, LLC, Heartland Client Services, LLC, Monarch Client Services, LLC, Newport Client Services, LLC, Northstar Client Services, LLC, Option 1 Client Services, LLC, Pioneer Client Servicing, LLC, Rockwell Client Services, LLC, Royal Client Services, LLC, Stonepoint Client Services, LLC, Strategic CS, LLC, Strategic Client Support, LLC, Strategic Consulting, LLC, Strategic FS Buffalo, LLC, Strategic Family, Inc.,, Strategic NYC, LLC, Stratfs, LLC, Summit Client Services, LLC, T Fin, LLC, Versara Lending, LLC, Whitestone Client Services, LLC (Vacco, Dennis)
January 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 30 TEXT ORDER. The Clerk is instructed that the case shall be unsealed but the following documents and all accompanying declarations, attachments and exhibits shall remain under seal 1, 4, 5, 7, 8, 9, 18. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Michael J. Roemer on 1/16/2024. (RAZ)Clerk to Follow up
January 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 29 TEXT ORDER. The Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo hereby recuses himself in this matter. The Clerk of Court is hereby requested to assign this case to another United States District Judge. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 1/16/2024. (CMD)Clerk to Follow up
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 28 TEXT ORDER granting #15 Motion for Lewis W. Bellin, Esq. to appear Pro Hac Vice for The People of the State of New York. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Michael J. Roemer on 1/12/2024. (RAZ)Clerk to Follow up
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 27 TEXT ORDER granting #16 Motion for Kevin J. Burns, Esq. to appear Pro Hac Vice for The State of New York. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Michael J. Roemer on 1/12/2024. (RAZ)Clerk to Follow up
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Pursuant to the Temporary Restraining Order issued by Judge Vilardo on January 11, 2024 (ECF No. 12) the court-appointed Receiver is entitled to immediate access to Receivership Defendants' premises, and the Receiver is entitled to secure the premises by "changing the locks and alarm codes." (ECF No. 12 at 21.) Therefore, pursuant to Judge Vilardo's order, any landlord of the Receivership Defendants, including SL Green Realty, must permit the Receiver access to the Receivership Defendants' business premises. Issued by Hon. Michael J. Roemer on January 12, 2024. (MLM)
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 25 TEXT ORDER granting #17 Motion for Marion M. Quirk, Esq. to appear Pro Hac Vice for The People of the State of New York. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Michael J. Roemer on 1/12/2024. (RAZ)Clerk to Follow up
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 TEXT ORDER granting #19 Motion for Evan Romanoff, Esq. to appear Pro Hac Vice for The People of the State of New York. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Michael J. Roemer on 1/12/2024. (RAZ)Clerk to Follow up
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 TEXT ORDER granting #21 Motion for Amanda E. Bacoyanis to appear Pro Hac Vice for The People of New York State. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Michael J. Roemer on 1/12/2024. (RAZ)Clerk to Follow up
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TEXT ORDER granting #20 Motion for Margaret Lynne Weaver to appear Pro Hac Vice for The People of the State of New York. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Michael J. Roemer on 1/12/2024. (RAZ)Clerk to Follow up
January 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 E-File Notification: re #9 Continuation of Exhibits - Clerk Replaced Exhibits #2, 4, 12 per NYS AG. (TMK)
January 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT REFERRAL ORDER (DISPOSITIVE) - Hon. Michael J. Roemer, United States Magistrate Judge, is hereby designated to act in this case as follows: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), all pre-trial matters in this case are referred to the above-named United States Magistrate Judge, including but not limited to: (1) conduct of a scheduling conference and entry of a scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, (2) hearing and disposition of all non-dispositive motions or applications, (3) supervision of discovery, and (4) supervision of all procedural matters involving the aforementioned or involving the preparation of the case or any matter therein for consideration by the District Judge. The Magistrate Judge shall also hear and report upon dispositive motions for the consideration of the District Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B) and (C). All motions or applications shall be filed with the Clerk and made returnable before the Magistrate Judge. The parties are encouraged to consider the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 636(c) governing consent to either partial or complete disposition of the case, including trial if necessary, by the Magistrate Judge. Consent forms are available from the office of the Magistrate Judge or the office of the Clerk of Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 1/11/2024. Chambers has emailed a copy of this order to Plaintiffs' counsel. (CMD)
January 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER GRANTING #2 MOTION to Seal Case filed by The State of North Carolina, State of Delaware, The People of the State of Illinois, The State of Wisconsin, Consumer Financial Protection Bureau, State of Colorado, The People of the State of New York, The State of Minnesota. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 1/11/2024. (RFI)
January 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appoint Receiver; granting #5 Motion for TRO; granting #5 Motion to Appoint Receiver; granting #6 Motion for Hearing. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 1/11/2024. Chambers has emailed a copy of this order to Plaintiffs' counsel. (RFI)
January 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER GRANTING #3 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by The State of North Carolina, State of Delaware, The People of the State of Illinois, The State of Wisconsin, Consumer Financial Protection Bureau, State of Colorado, The People of the State of New York, The State of Minnesota. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 1/11/2024. (RFI)
January 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Remark: the short case title input to CM/ECF was incorrectly entered. The Clerk's Office has corrected the case title to Consumer Financial Protection Bureau et al v. Stratfs, LLC (f/k/a Strategic Financial Solutions, LLC), et al. (LB)
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION to appear pro hac vice for Amanda E. Bacoyanis by The People of the State of New York.(TMK)
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION to appear pro hac vice for Margaret Lynne Weaver by The People of the State of New York. (TMK)
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION to appear pro hac vice for Evan Romanoff by The People of the State of New York. (TMK)
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION to appear pro hac vice for Marion Quirk by The People of the State of New York.(TMK)
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION to appear pro hac vice for Kevin J. Burns by The People of the State of New York.(TMK)
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION to appear pro hac vice for Lewis W. Beilin by The People of the State of New York. (TMK)
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 200.00, receipt number 100003593. (TMK)
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 200.00, receipt number 100003591. (TMK)
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 200.00, receipt number 100003590. (TMK)
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 200.00, receipt number 100003588. (TMK)
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 200.00, receipt number 100003592. (TMK)
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Pro Hac Vice fee: $ 200.00, receipt number 100003589. (TMK)
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Anchor Client Services, LLC, BCF Capital, LLC, Bedrock Client Services, LLC, Albert Ian Behar, Blaise Investments, LLC, Daniel Blumkin, Jaclyn Blust, Jason Blust, Boulder Client Services, LLC, Canyon Client Services, LLC, Carolina Client Services, LLC, John Does 1-50, Duke Enterprises, LLC, Great Lakes Client Services, LLC, Guidestone Client Services, LLC, Harbor Client Services, LLC, Heartland Client Services, LLC, Lit Def Strategies, LLC, Monarch Client Services, LLC, Newport Client Services, LLC, Northstar Client Services, LLC, Option 1 Client Services, LLC, Pioneer Client Servicing, LLC, Relialit, LLC, Rockwell Client Services, LLC, Royal Client Services, LLC, Ryan Sasson, Stonepoint Client Services, LLC, Strategic CS, LLC, Strategic Client Support, LLC, Strategic Consulting, LLC, Strategic ESOP, Strategic ESOT, Strategic FS Buffalo, LLC, Strategic Family, Inc.,, Strategic NYC, LLC, Stratfs, LLC, Summit Client Services, LLC, T Fin, LLC, The Blust Family Irrevocable Trust through Donald J. Holmgren, Trustee, Twist Financial, LLC, Versara Lending, LLC, Whitestone Client Services, LLC. (TMK)
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Consumer Financial Protection Bureau, State of Colorado, State of Delaware, The People of the State of Illinois, The People of the State of New York, The State of Minnesota, The State of North Carolina, The State of Wisconsin. filed by Consumer Financial Protection Bureau, State of Colorado, State of Delaware, The People of the State of Illinois, The People of the State of New York, The State of Minnesota, The State of North Carolina, The State of Wisconsin. Main Document is Exhibit 1. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4 Part 1, #4 Exhibit 4 Part 2, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8 Part 1, #9 Exhibit 8 Part 2, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19 Part 1, #21 Exhibit 19 Part 2, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25 Part 1, #28 Exhibit 25 Part 2, #29 Exhibit 26, #30 Exhibit 27, #31 Exhibit 28, #32 Exhibit 29, #33 Exhibit 30, #34 Exhibit 31) (TMK) (Attachment 1 replaced on 1/12/2024) (TMK). (Attachment 13 replaced on 1/12/2024) (TMK). (Attachment 3 replaced on 1/12/2024) (TMK). (Attachment 4 replaced on 1/12/2024) (TMK).
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 OTHER DECLARATIONS filed by Consumer Financial Protection Bureau, State of Colorado, State of Delaware, The People of the State of Illinois, The People of the State of New York, The State of Minnesota, The State of North Carolina, The State of Wisconsin. Main Document is Declaration of Romanoff. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Cohen, #2 Declaration of Davis, #3 Declaration of Weaver, #4 Declaration of Callahan, #5 Declaration of Phifer re E.B., #6 Declaration of Ridder, #7 Declaration of Hanson, #8 Declaration of Phifer) (TMK)
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CONSUMER DECLARATIONS filed by Consumer Financial Protection Bureau, State of Colorado, State of Delaware, The People of the State of Illinois, The People of the State of New York, The State of Minnesota, The State of North Carolina, The State of Wisconsin. Main Document is Declaration of B.B. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of C.E., #2 Declaration of C.B., #3 Declaration of D.K., #4 Declaration of D.S., #5 Declaration of E.B., #6 Declaration of E.N., #7 Declaration of E.S., #8 Declaration of K.L., #9 Declaration of M.B., #10 Declaration of M.B., #11 Declaration of P.G., #12 Declaration of P.K., #13 Declaration of R.D., #14 Declaration of S.E. Part 1, #15 Declaration of S.E. Part 2, #16 Declaration of S.K., #17 Declaration of S.M., #18 Declaration of S.M., #19 Declaration re E.K., #20 Declaration re J.K., #21 Declaration re M.S., #22 Declaration re S.R.)(TMK)
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION for Expedited Hearing re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION to Appoint Receiver MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Consumer Financial Protection Bureau, State of Colorado, State of Delaware, The People of the State of Illinois, The People of the State of New York, The State of Minnesota, The State of North Carolina, The State of Wisconsin. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (TMK)
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION to Appoint Receiver, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Consumer Financial Protection Bureau, State of Colorado, State of Delaware, The People of the State of Illinois, The People of the State of New York, The State of Minnesota, The State of North Carolina, The State of Wisconsin. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Declaration) (TMK)
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Receiver by Consumer Financial Protection Bureau, State of Colorado, State of Delaware, The People of the State of Illinois, The People of the State of New York, The State of Minnesota, The State of North Carolina, The State of Wisconsin. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A) (TMK)
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Consumer Financial Protection Bureau, State of Colorado, State of Delaware, The People of the State of Illinois, The People of the State of New York, The State of Minnesota, The State of North Carolina, The State of Wisconsin. (TMK)
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 EX PARTE MOTION to Seal Case by Consumer Financial Protection Bureau, State of Colorado, State of Delaware, The People of the State of Illinois, The People of the State of New York, The State of Minnesota, The State of North Carolina, The State of Wisconsin. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (TMK)
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by The State of North Carolina, The People of the State of New York, Consumer Financial Protection Bureau, The State of Minnesota, State of Colorado, The State of Wisconsin, State of Delaware, The People of the State of Illinois. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(TMK)
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TMK)
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation: the ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(TMK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Consumer Financial Protection Bureau et al v. Stratfs, LLC (f/k/a Strategic Financial Solutions, LLC), et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stratfs, LLC
Represented By: Dennis C. Vacco
Represented By: Scott S. Allen, Jr.
Represented By: Carmen Alexander Vacco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strategic Client Support, LLC
Represented By: Dennis C. Vacco
Represented By: Scott S. Allen, Jr.
Represented By: Carmen Alexander Vacco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strategic Financial Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Dennis C. Vacco
Represented By: Scott S. Allen, Jr.
Represented By: Carmen Alexander Vacco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pioneer Client Services, LLC
Represented By: Dennis C. Vacco
Represented By: Scott S. Allen, Jr.
Represented By: Carmen Alexander Vacco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strategic CS, LLC
Represented By: Dennis C. Vacco
Represented By: Scott S. Allen, Jr.
Represented By: Carmen Alexander Vacco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strategic FS Buffalo, LLC
Represented By: Dennis C. Vacco
Represented By: Scott S. Allen, Jr.
Represented By: Carmen Alexander Vacco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strategic NYC, LLC
Represented By: Dennis C. Vacco
Represented By: Scott S. Allen, Jr.
Represented By: Carmen Alexander Vacco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BCF Capital, LLC
Represented By: Dennis C. Vacco
Represented By: Scott S. Allen, Jr.
Represented By: Carmen Alexander Vacco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T Fin, LLC
Represented By: Dennis C. Vacco
Represented By: Scott S. Allen, Jr.
Represented By: Carmen Alexander Vacco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strategic Consulting, LLC
Represented By: Dennis C. Vacco
Represented By: Scott S. Allen, Jr.
Represented By: Carmen Alexander Vacco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Versara Lending, LLC
Represented By: Dennis C. Vacco
Represented By: Scott S. Allen, Jr.
Represented By: Carmen Alexander Vacco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strategic Family, Inc.,
Represented By: Dennis C. Vacco
Represented By: Scott S. Allen, Jr.
Represented By: Carmen Alexander Vacco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anchor Client Services, LLC
Represented By: Dennis C. Vacco
Represented By: Scott S. Allen, Jr.
Represented By: Carmen Alexander Vacco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bedrock Client Services, LLC
Represented By: Dennis C. Vacco
Represented By: Scott S. Allen, Jr.
Represented By: Carmen Alexander Vacco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boulder Client Services, LLC
Represented By: Dennis C. Vacco
Represented By: Scott S. Allen, Jr.
Represented By: Carmen Alexander Vacco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canyon Client Services, LLC
Represented By: Dennis C. Vacco
Represented By: Scott S. Allen, Jr.
Represented By: Carmen Alexander Vacco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolina Client Services, LLC
Represented By: Dennis C. Vacco
Represented By: Scott S. Allen, Jr.
Represented By: Carmen Alexander Vacco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Lakes Client Services, LLC
Represented By: Dennis C. Vacco
Represented By: Scott S. Allen, Jr.
Represented By: Carmen Alexander Vacco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guidestone Client Services, LLC
Represented By: Dennis C. Vacco
Represented By: Scott S. Allen, Jr.
Represented By: Carmen Alexander Vacco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harbor Client Services, LLC
Represented By: Dennis C. Vacco
Represented By: Scott S. Allen, Jr.
Represented By: Carmen Alexander Vacco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heartland Client Services, LLC
Represented By: Dennis C. Vacco
Represented By: Scott S. Allen, Jr.
Represented By: Carmen Alexander Vacco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monarch Client Services, LLC
Represented By: Dennis C. Vacco
Represented By: Scott S. Allen, Jr.
Represented By: Carmen Alexander Vacco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newport Client Services, LLC
Represented By: Dennis C. Vacco
Represented By: Scott S. Allen, Jr.
Represented By: Carmen Alexander Vacco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northstar Client Services, LLC
Represented By: Dennis C. Vacco
Represented By: Scott S. Allen, Jr.
Represented By: Carmen Alexander Vacco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Option 1 Client Services, LLC
Represented By: Dennis C. Vacco
Represented By: Scott S. Allen, Jr.
Represented By: Carmen Alexander Vacco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pioneer Client Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Dennis C. Vacco
Represented By: Scott S. Allen, Jr.
Represented By: Carmen Alexander Vacco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockwell Client Services, LLC
Represented By: Dennis C. Vacco
Represented By: Scott S. Allen, Jr.
Represented By: Carmen Alexander Vacco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Client Services, LLC
Represented By: Dennis C. Vacco
Represented By: Scott S. Allen, Jr.
Represented By: Carmen Alexander Vacco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stonepoint Client Services, LLC
Represented By: Dennis C. Vacco
Represented By: Scott S. Allen, Jr.
Represented By: Carmen Alexander Vacco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Summit Client Services, LLC
Represented By: Dennis C. Vacco
Represented By: Scott S. Allen, Jr.
Represented By: Carmen Alexander Vacco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whitestone Client Services, LLC
Represented By: Dennis C. Vacco
Represented By: Scott S. Allen, Jr.
Represented By: Carmen Alexander Vacco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Sasson
Represented By: Maegan Brianne McAdam
Represented By: Matthew Patrick Kennison
Represented By: Rodney Perry
Represented By: Ronald S. Safer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Blust
Represented By: Rodney O. Personius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Blumkin
Represented By: Maegan Brianne McAdam
Represented By: Matthew Patrick Kennison
Represented By: Rodney Perry
Represented By: Ronald S. Safer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert Ian Behar
Represented By: Maegan Brianne McAdam
Represented By: Matthew Patrick Kennison
Represented By: Rodney Perry
Represented By: Ronald S. Safer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strategic ESOP
Represented By: Andrew B. Joseph
Represented By: Richard J. Bernard
Represented By: Richard J. Pearl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strategic ESOT
Represented By: Andrew B. Joseph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twist Financial, LLC
Represented By: Ronald S. Safer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duke Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Ronald S. Safer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blaise Investments, LLC
Represented By: Ronald S. Safer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Blust Family Irrevocable Trust through Donald J. Holmgren, Trustee
Represented By: Rodney O. Personius
Represented By: Evan K. Farber
Represented By: Noah Weingarten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jaclyn Blust
Represented By: Rodney O. Personius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lit Def Strategies, LLC
Represented By: Rodney O. Personius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Relialit, LLC
Represented By: Rodney O. Personius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clear Creek Legal, LLC
Represented By: Terrence M. Connors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Credit Advocates Law Firm, LLC
Represented By: Terrence M. Connors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenstone Legal Group
Represented By: Terrence M. Connors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradon Ellis Law Firm LLC
Represented By: Terrence M. Connors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hailstone Legal Group
Represented By: Terrence M. Connors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hallock and Associates
Represented By: Terrence M. Connors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harbor Legal Group
Represented By: Terrence M. Connors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anchor Law Firm, PLLC
Represented By: Terrence M. Connors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bedrock Legal Group
Represented By: Terrence M. Connors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boulder Legal Group
Represented By: Terrence M. Connors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canyon Legal Group, LLC
Represented By: Terrence M. Connors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Lakes Law Firm
Represented By: Terrence M. Connors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heartland Legal Group
Represented By: Terrence M. Connors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Level One Law
Represented By: Terrence M. Connors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meadowbrook Legal Group
Represented By: Terrence M. Connors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monarch Legal Group
Represented By: Terrence M. Connors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Newport Legal Group, LLC
Represented By: Terrence M. Connors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northstar Legal Group
Represented By: Terrence M. Connors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Option 1 Legal
Represented By: Terrence M. Connors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pioneer Law Firm P.C.
Represented By: Terrence M. Connors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockwell Legal Group
Represented By: Terrence M. Connors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spring Legal Group
Represented By: Terrence M. Connors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Legal Group
Represented By: Terrence M. Connors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Slate Legal Group
Represented By: Terrence M. Connors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stonepoint Legal Group
Represented By: Terrence M. Connors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Law Firm of Derek Williams, LLC
Represented By: Terrence M. Connors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whitstone Legal Group
Represented By: Terrence M. Connors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyolaw, LLC
Represented By: Terrence M. Connors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chinn Legal Group, LLC
Represented By: Terrence M. Connors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leigh Legal Group, PLLC
Represented By: Terrence M. Connors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hallock & Associates LLC
Represented By: Terrence M. Connors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gustafson Consumer Law Group, LLC
Represented By: Terrence M. Connors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michel Law, LLC
Represented By: Terrence M. Connors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Law Office of Melissa Michel LLC
Represented By: Terrence M. Connors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moore Legal Group, LLC
Represented By: Terrence M. Connors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Consumer Financial Protection Bureau
Represented By: Joseph Michael Sanders
Represented By: Monika L. Moore
Represented By: Vanessa Anne Buchko
Represented By: Shirley T. Chiu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The People of the State of New York
Represented By: Christopher L. Boyd
Represented By: Genevieve Sumner Rados
Represented By: Nikolai N. Frant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Colorado
Represented By: Kevin J. Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Delaware
Represented By: Kevin D. Levitsky
Represented By: Marion M. Quirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The People of the State of Illinois
Represented By: Amanda E. Bacoyanis
Represented By: Daniel Edelstein
Represented By: Greg Grzeskiewicz
Represented By: Matthew Davies
Represented By: Matthew Charles Davies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The State of Minnesota
Represented By: Evan Romanoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The State of North Carolina
Represented By: M. Lynne Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The State of Wisconsin
Represented By: Lewis W. Beilin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Fidelis Legal Support Services, LLC
Represented By: Spencer Leeds Durland
Represented By: Timothy W. Hoover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?