Dinero v. Orchard Park Central School District et al
Plaintiff: ROBERT F. DINERO and Robby Dinero
Defendant: ORCHARD PARK CENTRAL SCHOOL DISTRICT, BOARD OF EDUCATION OF ORCHARD PARK CENTRAL SCHOOL DISTRICT, DAVID LILLECK, BRANDON HAFNER, DIANA NIGRO, PATRICK M. FITZGERALD, JOSEPH WEHRFRITZ, DARRYL PURUCKER, DAVID BOWERSOX, BRIAN GEHRING, KRISTEN MAZUR, JOEL RAISOR, PATRICK RIZZO and Town of Orchard Park Police Department
Case Number: 1:2024cv00213
Filed: March 12, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: John L Sinatra
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2024 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, by Board of Education of Orchard Park Central School District, Brandon Hafner, David Lilleck, Diana Nigro, Orchard Park Central School District.(Smith, Ryan)
May 10, 2024 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Service for answer and ebt notice served on all on 5/10/24, filed by David Bowersox, Patrick M. Fitzgerald, Brian Gehring, Kristen Mazur, Darryl Purucker, Joel Raisor, Patrick Rizzo, Town of Orchard Park Police Department, Joseph Wehrfritz. (Dingeldey, Louis)
May 10, 2024 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, by David Bowersox, Patrick M. Fitzgerald, Brian Gehring, Kristen Mazur, Darryl Purucker, Joel Raisor, Patrick Rizzo, Town of Orchard Park Police Department, Joseph Wehrfritz.(Dingeldey, Louis)
May 10, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Louis B. Dingeldey, Jr on behalf of David Bowersox (Dingeldey, Louis)
May 10, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Louis B. Dingeldey, Jr on behalf of Kristen Mazur (Dingeldey, Louis)
May 10, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Louis B. Dingeldey, Jr on behalf of Patrick M. Fitzgerald, Brian Gehring (Dingeldey, Louis)
May 10, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Louis B. Dingeldey, Jr on behalf of Darryl Purucker, Joel Raisor, Patrick Rizzo, Town of Orchard Park Police Department, Joseph Wehrfritz (Dingeldey, Louis)
April 5, 2024 Filing 11 TEXT ORDER acknowledging the #10 Stipulation. Defendants Town of Orchard Park Police Department, Patrick M. Fitzgerald, Joseph Wehrfritz, Darryl Purucker, David Bowersox, Brian Gehring, Kristen Mazur, Joel Raisor, and Patrick Rizzo shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by May 10, 2024. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. (MEM)
April 4, 2024 Filing 10 STIPULATION of extension of time to answer by David Bowersox, Patrick M. Fitzgerald, Brian Gehring, Kristen Mazur, Darryl Purucker, Joel Raisor, Patrick Rizzo, Town of Orchard Park Police Department, Joseph Wehrfritz. (Dingeldey, Louis)
April 2, 2024 Filing 9 TEXT ORDER acknowledging the #8 Stipulation. Defendants Orchard Park Central School District, Board Of Education Of Orchard Park Central School District, David Lilleck, Brandon Hafner, and Diana Nigro shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by May 10, 2024. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. (MEM)
April 1, 2024 Filing 8 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME by Board of Education of Orchard Park Central School District, Brandon Hafner, David Lilleck, Diana Nigro, Orchard Park Central School District. (Smith, Ryan)
April 1, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Meghan M Hayes on behalf of Board of Education of Orchard Park Central School District, Brandon Hafner, David Lilleck, Diana Nigro, Orchard Park Central School District (Hayes, Meghan)
April 1, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan G. Smith on behalf of Board of Education of Orchard Park Central School District, Brandon Hafner, David Lilleck, Diana Nigro, Orchard Park Central School District (Smith, Ryan)
March 19, 2024 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Summons served on Orchard Park Central School District, Board of Education of Orchard Park Central School District, David Lilleck, Brandon Hafner, and Diana Nigro on March 19, 2024, filed by Robert F. Dinero. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit BOARD OF EDUCATION, #2 Affidavit LILLECK, #3 Affidavit HAFNER, #4 Affidavit NIGRO)(Paltzik, Edward)
March 18, 2024 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Summons served on Brian Gehring, Darryl Purucker, David Bowersox, Joel Raisor, Joseph Wehrfritz, Kristen Mazur, Town of Orchard Park Police Department, Patrick Fitzgerald on March 16, 2024, filed by Robert F. Dinero. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit PURUCKER, #2 Affidavit BOWERSOX, #3 Affidavit RAISOR, #4 Affidavit WEHRFRITZ, #5 Affidavit MAZUR, #6 Affidavit TOWN OF ORCHARD PARK POLICE DEPARTMENT, #7 Affidavit FITZGERALD)(Paltzik, Edward)
March 13, 2024 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Board of Education of Orchard Park Central School District, David Bowersox, Patrick M. Fitzgerald, Brian Gehring, Brandon Hafner, David Lilleck, Kristen Mazur, Diana Nigro, Orchard Park Central School District, Darryl Purucker, Joel Raisor, Patrick Rizzo, Town of Orchard Park Police Department, Joseph Wehrfritz. (TMK)
March 13, 2024 Case Assigned to Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (TMK)
March 13, 2024 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL TO MEDIATION Pursuant to Section 2.1(A) of the Plan for Alternative Dispute Resolution in the United States District Court for the Western District of New York (the ADR Plan), this case is automatically referred to ADR. To access the ADR Plan and for inquiries regarding the Court's ADR Program please review the Court's #ADR webpage and/or contact the Court's ADR Administrator at #adrprogram@nywd.uscourts.gov.' Prior to the Local Rule 16 scheduling conference, counsel and unrepresented parties shall review the #ADR Plan and confer with each other regarding ADR for this case. Unless the parties agree to a different intervention, it is presumed they will participate in mediation. The parties shall be prepared to report on the outcome of their ADR discussion at the scheduling conference, as the initial Scheduling Order for this case will establish ADR deadlines in accordance with the ADR Plan. (TMK)
March 13, 2024 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TMK)
March 12, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Serge Krimnus on behalf of ROBERT F. DINERO (Krimnus, Serge)
March 12, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against BOARD OF EDUCATION OF ORCHARD PARK CENTRAL SCHOOL DISTRICT, DAVID BOWERSOX, PATRICK M. FITZGERALD, BRIAN GEHRING, BRANDON HAFNER, DAVID LILLECK, KRISTEN MAZUR, DIANA NIGRO, ORCHARD PARK CENTRAL SCHOOL DISTRICT, DARRYL PURUCKER, JOEL RAISOR, PATRICK RIZZO, JOSEPH WEHRFRITZ $ 405 receipt number ANYWDC-5127142, filed by ROBERT F. DINERO. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - OPCSD, #3 Summons - Board of Education OPCSD, #4 Summons - Lilleck, #5 Summons - Hafner, #6 Summons - Nigro, #7 Summons - TOPPD, #8 Summons - Fitzgerald, #9 Summons - Wehrfritz, #10 Summons - Purucker, #11 Summons - Bowersox, #12 Summons - Gehring, #13 Summons - Mazur, #14 Summons - Raisor, #15 Summons - Rizzo)(Paltzik, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dinero v. Orchard Park Central School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT F. DINERO
Represented By: Serge Krimnus
Represented By: Edward Andrew Paltzik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robby Dinero
Represented By: Edward Andrew Paltzik
Represented By: Serge Krimnus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ORCHARD PARK CENTRAL SCHOOL DISTRICT
Represented By: Meghan M Hayes
Represented By: Ryan G. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BOARD OF EDUCATION OF ORCHARD PARK CENTRAL SCHOOL DISTRICT
Represented By: Meghan M Hayes
Represented By: Ryan G. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID LILLECK
Represented By: Meghan M Hayes
Represented By: Ryan G. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRANDON HAFNER
Represented By: Meghan M Hayes
Represented By: Ryan G. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DIANA NIGRO
Represented By: Meghan M Hayes
Represented By: Ryan G. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PATRICK M. FITZGERALD
Represented By: Louis B. Dingeldey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOSEPH WEHRFRITZ
Represented By: Louis B. Dingeldey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DARRYL PURUCKER
Represented By: Louis B. Dingeldey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAVID BOWERSOX
Represented By: Louis B. Dingeldey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRIAN GEHRING
Represented By: Louis B. Dingeldey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KRISTEN MAZUR
Represented By: Louis B. Dingeldey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOEL RAISOR
Represented By: Louis B. Dingeldey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PATRICK RIZZO
Represented By: Louis B. Dingeldey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Orchard Park Police Department
Represented By: Louis B. Dingeldey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?