Holland v. Goord et al
Case Number: 6:2005cv06295
Filed: June 7, 2005
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Office: Rochester Office
Presiding Judge: Charles J. Siragusa
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 92 -CLERK TO FOLLOW UP- CORRECTED DECISION AND ORDER granting 70 Defendants' motion for summary judgment; dismissing the second amended complaint; and denying plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment. (Clerk to close case.). Signed by Hon. Michael A. Telesca on 6/19/13. (JMC)
June 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 90 -CLERK TO FOLLOW UP- DECISION AND ORDER granting 70 Motion for Summary Judgment; dismissing the second amended complaint; and denying plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment. (Clerk to close case.). Signed by Hon. Michael A. Telesca on 6/17/13. (JMC)
December 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 89 DECISION AND ORDER granting 77 Motion to Strike. Signed by Hon. Michael A. Telesca on 12/20/12. (JMC)
October 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 87 DECISION AND ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 81 Report and Recommendations.. Accordingly, for the reasons set forth in Judge Payson's Report and Recommendation, Defendants' motion to amend (Docket No. 63) their answer is denied. Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 10/7/10. (KAP)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holland v. Goord et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?