Justice v. King et al
Plaintiff: John D. Justice
Defendant: Terry King, Saving Grace Ministries, Inc., Eugenio Russi, Ken Wilson, Charles Sears, Tom Tortora, Richard Miraglia, KC Sharma, Brenda Martin, Arvind Samant, Kim Karalus, Jeffrey Grace and Ronald H. Tills
Case Number: 6:2008cv06417
Filed: October 27, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Office: Rochester Office
Presiding Judge: Marian W. Payson
Presiding Judge: Charles J. Siragusa
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 454 DECISION AND ORDER granting 418 Motion to Dismiss; granting 426 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying 431 Motion for Sanctions; denying 440 Motion for TRO; and denying 41 Motion to Certify Class. The Court hereby Order s that the Second Amended Complaint 414 is dismissed, with prejudice. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate Defendants Ken Wilson, Charles Sears, KC Sharma, Brenda Martin, Dr. Arvind Samant, Kim Karalus, and Dr. Jeffrey Grace, as parties to this action. The Clerk of the Court is also directed to add Michael Hogan as a party to this action. Further, the Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 03/27/2015. Pro se Plaintiff is hereby being sent this NEF and docketed Decision and Order to Great Meadow C.F. via the US Mail. -CLERK TO FOLLOW UP- (ST)
September 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 393 DECISION AND ORDER assigning Michael F. Orman, Esq. as pro bono counsel for the plaintiff. The Clerk is directed to copy all documents from the case not available electronically through CM/ECF together with a copy of this order and the "Guidelin es Governing Reimbursement from the District Court Fund of Expenses Incurred by Court Appointed Counsel." The Chief Judge of the Court will also issue an Order directing PACER to waive its fees so pro bono counsel can access and print, at no cos t to his firm, any documents filed herein that they may need. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to contact the Court by 10/3/11 to request a date for a status conference to discuss further proceeding in the case. Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 9/5/11. Attorney Michael F. Orman for John D. Justice added. (RE)
April 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 326 DECISION AND ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 324 Report and Recommendations.. Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 4/11/11. (KAP)
November 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 105 DECISION AND ORDER denying 103 Motion. Plaintiffs motion (Docket No. 103) for relief from the Courts Decision and Order (Docket No. 100) is denied. An appeal from this Decision and Order would not be taken in good faith, and the Court therefore den ies Plaintiffs request for a certificate of appealability. Any motion for in forma pauperis relief for the appellate case must be made on motion to the U.S. Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit pursuant to Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 24.Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 11/19/09. (KAP)
October 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 100 DECISION AND ORDER denying 98 Motion seeking to overturn Judge Paysons decision is denied and the scheduling conference may go forward as previously ordered.. Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 10/27/09. (KAP)
June 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 80 DECISION AND ORDER denying the appeal of the May 1, 2009 Order re: 77 . Time for service upon defendant Dr. Arvind Samat is extended for 120 days from this Order. The New York State Attorney General is directed to provide information by 6/29/09 as to where Dr. Samat may be served, please refer to Order. Upon receipt of information, the Clerk is directed to cause the US Marshal to serve the Summons and Amended Complaint upon Dr. Samat. Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 5/29/09. (RE)
May 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 74 DECISION & ORDER denying without prejudice 66 Motion to Appoint Counsel; granting 66 Motion for an Extension of 30 days to Serve the Complaint on defendant Samant. It is plaintiff's responsibility to retain an attorney or press forward with this lawsuit pro se. Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 5/1/2009. (KAH)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Justice v. King et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John D. Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry King
Represented By: James D. Donathen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saving Grace Ministries, Inc.
Represented By: James D. Donathen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eugenio Russi
Represented By: George Michael Zimmermann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Wilson
Represented By: George Michael Zimmermann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Sears
Represented By: George Michael Zimmermann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Tortora
Represented By: George Michael Zimmermann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Miraglia
Represented By: George Michael Zimmermann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KC Sharma
Represented By: George Michael Zimmermann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Martin
Represented By: George Michael Zimmermann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arvind Samant
Represented By: George Michael Zimmermann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Karalus
Represented By: George Michael Zimmermann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Grace
Represented By: George Michael Zimmermann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald H. Tills
Represented By: George Michael Zimmermann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?