Frederick v. Shehan et al
Plaintiff: |
Michael Frederick |
Defendant: |
Michael Shehan, Patrick Murphy, Michael Robyck, Anthony Hicks, Jamie Robinson and Donald Holton |
Case Number: |
6:2010cv06527 |
Filed: |
September 15, 2010 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Western District of New York |
Office: |
Rochester Office |
County: |
Chemung |
Presiding Judge: |
Charles J. Siragusa |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 2, 2017 |
Filing
114
DECISION AND ORDER denying 107 Motion to Appoint Counsel. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 8/2/17. (JPL) (A copy of this Decision and Order has been mailed to Plaintiff)
|
April 27, 2017 |
Filing
103
DECISION AND ORDER denying 93 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 4/27/17. (JPL) (A copy of this Decision and Order has been mailed to Plaintiff)
|
July 13, 2015 |
Filing
74
DECISION AND ORDER denying 68 Sgt. Holton's Motion for Summary Judgment. Sgt. Holton will remain a defendant in this case. (Copy of Decision and Order sent by first class mail to Plaintiff.) Signed by Hon. Michael A. Telesca on 7/13/15. (JMC)
|
July 29, 2014 |
Filing
64
-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP- DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 52 Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendants request to dismiss the entire amended complaint because it alleges only official capacity claims against Defendants is denied a s moot in light of Plaintiffs recent, unopposed amendment of the amended claim to specifically indicate that he is suing all Defendants in their individual capacities. Defendants request to dismiss Plaintiffs claims against Defendants in their offic ial capacities is granted. Defendants request to dismiss Plaintiffs claims against Acting Supt. Sheahan (failure to investigate grievances and supervisory liability for alleged due process errors by CHO Esgrow during the disciplinary hearing) based on their lack of personal involvement is granted. Defendants request to dismiss Plaintiffs claim against Sgt. Holton (failure to supervise) is denied without prejudice with leave to renew. Accordingly, Acting Supt. Sheahan is terminated as a Defenda nt from this action. Defendants request to dismiss the due process claim against CO Murphy for filing a false misbehavior report is granted. The following claims and Defendant remain pending: excessive use of force in violation of the Eighth Amendme nt against CO Vandergrift, CO Murphy, CO Robinson, and CO Robyck; failure to supervise against Sgt. Holton. The Clerk of the Court is requested to terminate Acting Supt. Sheahan as a defendant and to amend the caption accordingly. Signed by Hon. Michael A. Telesca on 7/29/14. (JMC)
|
December 17, 2012 |
Filing
50
DECISION & ORDER denying without prejudice 48 Motion to Appoint Counsel. It is plaintiff's responsibility to retain an attorney or press forward with this lawsuit pro se. Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 12/17/2012. (KAH)
|
May 17, 2012 |
Filing
28
DECISION ORDER denying without prejudice 20 Motion to Appoint Counsel; denying without prejudice 17 Motion to Appoint Counsel. It is plaintiff's responsibility to retain an attorney or press forward with this lawsuit pro se. Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 5/17/2012. (KAH)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?