Gradient Enterprises, Inc. v. Skype Technologies S.A. et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Gradient Enterprises, Inc.
Defendant: Skype Technologies S.A. and Skype, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2010cv06712
Filed: December 23, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Office: Rochester Office
County: Monroe
Presiding Judge: David G. Larimer
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2011 Filing 30 TEXT ORDER re 25 Text Order scheduling argument. Oral argument scheduled for August 17, 2011 is hereby canceled. The Court will determine the motion for insufficient service of process on the papers without oral argument. The Court will advise the parties if argument will be scheduled later on the motion to dismiss on the merits. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. David G. Larimer on 7/5/11. (PR)
June 30, 2011 Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gradient Enterprises, Inc.. Skype Technologies S.A. served on 6/8/2011, answer due 6/29/2011. (O'Brien, Donald)
June 16, 2011 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Skype Technologies S.A., Skype, Inc. re 27 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), 26 Memorandum in Support of Motion, (Wilson, Robert)
June 16, 2011 Filing 27 NOTICE by Skype, Inc. re 14 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint, 8 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint Defendant Skype, Inc.'s Notice of Supplemental Authority in Support of its Motion to Dismiss the Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Wilson, Robert)
June 16, 2011 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM in Support re 14 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint, 8 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint Defendant Skype Technologies S.A.'s Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of its Motion to Dismiss the Complaint filed by Skype Technologies S.A.. (Wilson, Robert)
June 13, 2011 Filing 25 TEXT ORDER re 14 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint filed by Skype Technologies S.A., 8 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint filed by Skype, Inc. Motion Hearing set for 8/17/2011 10:30 AM before Hon. David G. Larimer. Signed by Hon. David G. Larimer on 6/13/11. (PR)
June 6, 2011 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Gradient Enterprises, Inc. re 22 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 23 Declaration (O'Brien, Donald)
June 6, 2011 Filing 23 DECLARATION signed by Donald W. O'Brien, Jr., Esq. re 14 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint filed by Gradient Enterprises, Inc. with Exhibits 1 - 4 filed by Gradient Enterprises, Inc.. (O'Brien, Donald)
June 6, 2011 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 14 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint filed by Gradient Enterprises, Inc.. (O'Brien, Donald)
May 12, 2011 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Skype, Inc. re 20 Memorandum in Support of Motion (Wilson, Robert)
May 12, 2011 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Support re 8 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint filed by Skype, Inc.. (Wilson, Robert)
May 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER re 14 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint filed by Skype Technologies S.A. Responses due by 6/6/2011. Signed by Hon. David G. Larimer on 5/9/11. (PR)
May 5, 2011 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Skype Technologies S.A. re 14 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint, 15 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 16 Declaration, 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Wilson, Robert)
May 5, 2011 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Skype Technologies S.A. identifying Corporate Parent eBay International AG, Corporate Parent Springboard Acquisitions S.A.R.L. for Skype Technologies S.A... (Wilson, Robert)
May 5, 2011 Filing 16 DECLARATION re 14 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint, 15 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Skype Technologies S.A. filed by Skype Technologies S.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Wilson, Robert)
May 5, 2011 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support re 14 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint filed by Skype Technologies S.A.. (Wilson, Robert)
May 5, 2011 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint by Skype Technologies S.A..(Wilson, Robert)
May 3, 2011 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gradient Enterprises, Inc.. Skype Technologies S.A. served on 4/14/2011, answer due 5/5/2011. (O'Brien, Donald)
May 2, 2011 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 8 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint with Exhibit "1" filed by Gradient Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(O'Brien, Donald)
April 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re 8 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint filed by Skype, Inc. Responses due by 5/2/2011. Signed by Hon. David G. Larimer on 4/1/11. (PR)
March 28, 2011 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Skype, Inc. re 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement, 9 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 8 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint (Wilson, Robert)
March 28, 2011 E-Filing Notification: For future reference, attorney signature must be in proper format (i.e s/attorney name typed here). No action required. RE: 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Skype, Inc., 9 MEMORANDUM in Support, 8 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint. E-Filing Notification: No proof of service. Action required: File proof of service RE: 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement, 9 MEMORANDUM in Support and 8 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint (TO)
March 25, 2011 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support re 8 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint filed by Skype, Inc.. (Wilson, Robert)
March 25, 2011 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint by Skype, Inc..(Wilson, Robert)
March 25, 2011 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Skype, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Springboard Acquisition Corp. for Skype, Inc... (Wilson, Robert)
March 24, 2011 Filing 6 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by Skype, Inc.. (Wilson, Robert)
March 15, 2011 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Gradient Enterprises, Inc.. (O'Brien, Donald)
December 29, 2010 Pro Hac Filing fee for Dennis B. Danella, received: $75.00, receipt number ROC004656. (BK)
December 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Dennis Brian Danella. Signed by Hon. David G. Larimer on 12/29/2010. (TO)
December 27, 2010 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice of Dennis Brian Danella by Gradient Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Affidavit of Dennis Brian Danella)(O'Brien, Donald)
December 23, 2010 Filing 2 Report on the Filing or Determination of PatentCase sent to USPTO. (TO)
December 21, 2010 Summons Issued as to Skype Technologies S.A., Skype, Inc.. (TO)
December 21, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Skype Technologies S.A., Skype, Inc., filed by Gradient Enterprises, Inc..(TO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gradient Enterprises, Inc. v. Skype Technologies S.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gradient Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Dennis B. Danella
Represented By: Donald W. O'Brien, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skype Technologies S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skype, Inc.
Represented By: Robert B. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?