Young v. Tryon et al
Plaintiff: Rogelio Young
Defendant: Todd L. Tryon, Michael Finnigan, Buck, Lasly, Pickens, Sean McMahan, Marc Smith and Metro Barbosa-Group
Case Number: 6:2012cv06251
Filed: May 7, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Office: Rochester Office
County: Genesee
Presiding Judge: Marian W. Payson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 DECISION AND ORDER granting 68 Motion for Sanctions; adopting Report and Recommendations re 73 Report and Recommendations.. Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 3/23/17. Copy of this order and the NEF mailed to pro se plaintiff at 1694 Madison Avenue, Apartment 12E, New York, NY 10029. (KAP)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 59 Motion to Compel. Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 6/30/2016. (CMC)
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 51 DECISION AND ORDER granting 21 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 41 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; adopting Report and Recommendations re 50 Report and Recommendations. Based upon the analysis in Judge P ayson's well-reasoned Report and Recommendation, the Court accepts in whole her recommendations. Accordingly, it is hereby,ORDERED, that the motion by Todd L. Tryon, et al., to dismiss, ECF No. 21, is granted in whole; and it is further ORDERED, that the motion by Valley Metro-Barbosa Group, ECF No. 41, is granted in whole; and it is furtherORDERED, that Plaintiff may file an amended complaint not later than March 11, 2015, with the exception of any of the following types of claims:Official capacity claims seeking monetary damages;Claims for injunctive relief;Claims asserted against Sean McMahan; andAny Bivens claims arising out of the conditions of confinement asserted against Valley Metro-Barbosa Group.Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 2/11/15. (KAP)
June 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 DECISION AND ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re [] Report and Recommendations.; denying 13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 6/6/13. (KAP)
March 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 30 DECISION & ORDER Young's motion to compel 16 is denied. Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 3/27/2013. (KAH)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Young v. Tryon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rogelio Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd L. Tryon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Finnigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lasly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pickens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean McMahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metro Barbosa-Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?