Ferrari Club of America, Inc. v. Bourdage
Plaintiff: Ferrari Club of America, Inc.
Defendant: Leon Bourdage
Case Number: 6:2012cv06530
Filed: October 2, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Office: Rochester Office
County: Monroe
Presiding Judge: Michael A. Telesca
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Conversion
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 120 DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 97 Motion in Limine. Mr. Gregory may provide non-expert, summary testimony at trial. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 04/25/2017. (LMD)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER granting 88 Motion to Seal. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 3/24/17. (JPL)
July 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER denying 47 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment without prejudice. However, Plaintiffs motion for summary judgment is denied with prejudice as to the cause of action for breach of fiduciary duty to the extent that the claim is based on transactions occurring prior to October 2, 2009, because those transactions are outside the three-year statute of limitations. The denial is without prejudice as to the remaining causes of action. Signed by Hon. Michael A. Telesca on 7/15/15. (JMC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ferrari Club of America, Inc. v. Bourdage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ferrari Club of America, Inc.
Represented By: Edward P. Hourihan, Jr.
Represented By: Daniel John Pautz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leon Bourdage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?