Pennington v. City of Rochester et al

Plaintiff: Cynthia G. Pennington
Defendant: City of Rochester and Eric Paul
Case Number: 6:2013cv06304
Filed: June 13, 2013
Court: New York Western District Court
Office: Rochester Office
County: Monroe
Presiding Judge: Charles J. Siragusa
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 8, 2015 56 Opinion or Order of the Court DECISION AND ORDER granting 33 Defendant Paul's Motion to Vacate the Entry of Default, 22 the Clerk's Entry of Default as against Paul is vacated, and 18 Paul's Answer is accepted as timely filed. In addition, the parties are given until 07/24/2015 to address whether the Clerk's Entry of Default as against the City should similarly be vacated. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 07/08/2015. (ST) -CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
August 8, 2014 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice to renew 12 Motion to Appoint Counsel; and granting in part and denying without prejudice to renew 25 Motion to Compel and 30 Motion to Compel. Signed by Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman on 8/7/2014. (LB)
January 13, 2014 11 Opinion or Order of the Court DECISION AND ORDER granting 7 Plaintiff's Motion to Consolidate Cases. The Court hereby orders the consolidation of Case No. 13-CV-6304 and Case No. 13-CV-6480, under Case No. 13-CV-6304. The Clerk of the Court is directed to consolidate the case files in accordance with this Decision and Order. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 01/13/2014. Pro se Plaintiff is hereby being sent a copy of this NEF and Decision and Order, via the USPS. (ST) -CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pennington v. City of Rochester et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia G. Pennington
Represented By: Christina A. Agola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Rochester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?