Mitchell v. Siersma et al
Plaintiff: |
Patrick Michael Mitchell |
Defendant: |
Robert Siersma and Samuel Soprano |
Case Number: |
6:2014cv06069 |
Filed: |
July 16, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Western District of New York |
Office: |
Rochester Office |
County: |
Yates |
Presiding Judge: |
Frank P. Geraci |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 24, 2018 |
Filing
74
DECISION AND ORDER: Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment 64 66 are GRANTED and Plaintiff's Amended Complaint is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. SO ORDERED. A copy of this NEF and Decision and Order have been mailed to the pro se Plaintiff. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 9/22/2018. (AFM)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
|
July 14, 2017 |
Filing
61
DECISION & ORDER Plaintiff's motion for a protective order precluding discovery of Mitchell's mental health history and treatment 52 is granted. Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 7/14/2017. Copy of this Decision & Order sent by First Class Mail to plaintiff Patrick Michael Mitchell on 7/14/2017 to his address of record. (KAH)
|
January 13, 2016 |
Filing
34
DECISION & ORDER denying 22 Motion to Compel. Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 1/13/2016. Copy of Decision & Order sent by First Class Mail to plaintiff Patrick Michael Mitchell on 1/13/2016. (KAH)
|
October 8, 2014 |
Filing
19
DECISION & ORDER denying without prejudice 9 Motion to Appoint Counsel. It is plaintiff's responsibility to retain an attorney or press forward with this lawsuit pro se. Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 10/8/2014. (KAH)
|
February 10, 2014 |
Filing
5
ORDER denying 2 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; granting 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying 4 Motion to Appoint Counsel; dismissing with prejudice the action as to defendants Monroe County, Monroe County District Attorney S andra Doorley and ADA Eric Hurd; the Clerk of Court shall cause the U.S. Marshal to serve copies of the Summons, Complaint and this Order upon Robert Siersma and Samuel Soprano, Monroe County District Attorney's Office Investigators, without plaintiff's payment; the Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this action to a District Judge in the Rochester Division. Signed by Hon. Michael A. Telesca on 2/7/14. (SG)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?