Fann v. Arnold et al
Petitioner: |
Jermaine Fann |
Respondent: |
Nurse Arnold, Nurse Stern and Dr. Lewis |
Case Number: |
6:2014cv06187 |
Filed: |
April 18, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Western District of New York |
Office: |
Rochester Office |
County: |
Orleans |
Presiding Judge: |
Frank P. Geraci |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 17, 2018 |
Filing
55
DECISION AND ORDER: Defendants' 53 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED and this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE for failure to prosecute. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. A copy of this NEF and Decision and Order have been mailed to the pro se Plaintiff. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 7/17/2018. (AFM)
|
August 9, 2017 |
Filing
52
DECISION AND ORDER: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 46) is DENIED, but Plaintiff shall pay the stenographer's fee that was incurred by Defendants for Plaintiff's non-appearance at his deposition. The parties shall submit proposed discovery deadlines to Magistrate Judge Payson within ten days. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 8/9/17. A copy of the Decision and Order and the NEF have been mailed to the pro se Plaintiff. (SCE)
|
May 16, 2016 |
Filing
33
DECISION AND ORDER. Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration (ECF No. 13) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART, his Motion for Default Judgment (ECF No. 18) is deemed WITHDRAWN, his Motion to Amend the Revised Second Amended Complaint (ECF No. 26 ) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART, and his Motion to Appoint Counsel (ECF No. 28) is DENIED without prejudice to renew. If Plaintiff wishes to file a Fourth Amended Complaint, he must do so within 30 days of this Order (June 15, 2016). A copy of this Order has been sent to Pro Se Plaintiff Jermaine Fann at AUBURN CORRECTIONAL FACILITY, Box 618, Auburn, NY 13021. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 05/16/2016. (AFM)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?