Rochester Laborers' Welfare-S.U.B. Fund, et al v. Structural Remediation Services, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Rochester Laborers' Welfare-S.U.B. Fund by Robert Brown as Chairman, and Daniel Hogan as Secretary, Rochester Laborers' Pension Fund, by Robert Brown, as Chairman and Daniel Hogan as Secretary, Rochester Laborers' Annuity Fund, by Robert Brown, as Chairman, and Daniel Hogan as Secretary, Rochester Laborers' Apprentice and Training Fund, by Robert Brown, as Chairman, and Daniel Hogan, as Secretary and Laborers' International Union of North America, Local Union No. 435, by Daniel Kuntz, as Business Manager
Defendant: Structural Remediation Services, Inc. and Mary Ellen Belding
Counter_claimant: Structural Remediation Services, Inc. and Mary Ellen Belding
Counter_defendant: Laborers' International Union of North America, Local Union No. 435, by Daniel Kuntz, as Business Manager, Rochester Laborers' Annuity Fund, by Robert Brown, as Chairman, and Daniel Hogan as Secretary, Rochester Laborers' Apprentice and Training Fund, by Robert Brown, as Chairman, and Daniel Hogan, as Secretary, Rochester Laborers' Pension Fund, by Robert Brown, as Chairman and Daniel Hogan as Secretary and Rochester Laborers' Welfare-S.U.B. Fund by Robert Brown as Chairman, and Daniel Hogan as Secretary
Case Number: 6:2015cv06171
Filed: March 26, 2015
Court: New York Western District Court
Office: Rochester Office
County: Monroe
Referring Judge: Marian W. Payson
Presiding Judge: Charles J. Siragusa
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 26, 2018 113 Opinion or Order of the Court DECISION & ORDER Appointing Jeffrey J. Harradine, Esq., of Ward Greenberg, LLP, 1800 Bausch & Lomb Place, Rochester, New York 14604, to faithfully and diligently represent defendants Mary Ellen Belding and Structural Remediation Services, LLC pro bono. The Court will also issue an Order directing PACER to waive its fees so that pro bono counsel can access any other documents filed in this case that he may need. If any portion of the file in this matter is not available through PACE R on the Court's Case Management/Electronic Case Management System, the Clerk of the Court shall provide a free copy of any such documents to pro bono counsel upon request. A status conference will be held on 2/15/2018 at 11:00 AM befo re the Hon. Marian W. Payson. At that time, a hearing shall be scheduled to determine whether the appointment of a guardian ad litem is appropriate to protect defendant Mary Ellen Beldings interests. (Attorney Jeffrey J. Harradine added for Mary Ellen Belding and Structural Remediation Services, Inc.) Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 1/26/2018. Copy of this Decision & Order sent by First Class Mail to defendants Mary Ellen Belding, 1467 Fallen Leaf Terrace, Webster, NY 14580 and Structural Remediation Services, Inc., 1115 East Main Street, Rochester, NY 14609 on 1/26/2018. (KAH) -CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
November 16, 2017 107 Opinion or Order of the Court DECISION & ORDER Appointing Bradley P. Kammholz, Esq., of Kammholz Messina, LLP, 1501 Pittsford-Victor Road, Suite 202, Victor, New York 14564, to faithfully and diligently represent defendants Mary Ellen Belding and Structural Remediation Services, LLC pro bono. The Court will also issue an Order directing PACER to waive its fees so that pro bono counsel can access any other documents filed in this case that he may need. If any portion of the file in this matter is not available through PACER on the Court's Case Management/Electronic Case Management System, the Clerk of the Court shall provide a free copy of any such documents to pro bono counsel upon request. A status conference to be held on 12/12/2017 at 10 :15 AM before the Hon. Marian W. Payson. At that time, a hearing shall be scheduled to determine whether the appointment of a guardian ad litem is appropriate to protect defendant Mary Ellen Beldings interests. (Attorney Bradley Kammholz added f or Mary Ellen Belding and Structural Remediation Services, Inc.) Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 11/16/2017. Copy of this Decision & Order sent by First Class Mail to defendants Mary Ellen Belding, 1467 Fallen Leaf Terrace, Webster, NY 14580 and Structural Remediation Services, Inc., 1115 East Main Street, Rochester, NY 14609 on 11/16/2017. (KAH)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
August 8, 2017 83 Opinion or Order of the Court DECISION & ORDER Plaintiffs' motion to the extent it seeks to supplement the original complaint to allege with more specificity the precise amounts owed by defendants 42 is granted. Because the claims asserted in the original complaint alrea dy seek these damages, plaintiffs do not need to add a separate cause of action, and permission to do so is denied. Rather, they should merely modify the existing causes of action to include the specified amounts. Plaintiffs are directed to file an amended complaint in accordance with these directions by no later than 9/6/2017. If plaintiffs fail to file an amended complaint by that date, the original complaint will remain the operative pleading. Plaintiffs' request for an award of attorn eys' fees and costs pursuant to the "Agreements and Declarations of Trust and Collections Policy" 42 is denied as premature. The parties' respective rights and obligations under these agreements are at issue in this case and ar e not properly determined in the context of this non-dispositive motion. Accordingly, plaintiffs' motion is denied without prejudice at this time. Plaintiffs' request for an extension of the scheduling order is denied as moot. Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 8/8/2017. (KAH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rochester Laborers' Welfare-S.U.B. Fund, et al v. Structural Remediation Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rochester Laborers' Welfare-S.U.B. Fund by Robert Brown as Chairman, and Daniel Hogan as Secretary
Represented By: Jennifer A. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rochester Laborers' Pension Fund, by Robert Brown, as Chairman and Daniel Hogan as Secretary
Represented By: Jennifer A. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rochester Laborers' Annuity Fund, by Robert Brown, as Chairman, and Daniel Hogan as Secretary
Represented By: Jennifer A. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rochester Laborers' Apprentice and Training Fund, by Robert Brown, as Chairman, and Daniel Hogan, as Secretary
Represented By: Jennifer A. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laborers' International Union of North America, Local Union No. 435, by Daniel Kuntz, as Business Manager
Represented By: Jennifer A. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Structural Remediation Services, Inc.
Represented By: Sharon P. Stiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Ellen Belding
Represented By: Sharon P. Stiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Structural Remediation Services, Inc.
Represented By: Sharon P. Stiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Mary Ellen Belding
Represented By: Sharon P. Stiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Laborers' International Union of North America, Local Union No. 435, by Daniel Kuntz, as Business Manager
Represented By: Jennifer A. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Rochester Laborers' Annuity Fund, by Robert Brown, as Chairman, and Daniel Hogan as Secretary
Represented By: Jennifer A. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Rochester Laborers' Apprentice and Training Fund, by Robert Brown, as Chairman, and Daniel Hogan, as Secretary
Represented By: Jennifer A. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Rochester Laborers' Pension Fund, by Robert Brown, as Chairman and Daniel Hogan as Secretary
Represented By: Jennifer A. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Rochester Laborers' Welfare-S.U.B. Fund by Robert Brown as Chairman, and Daniel Hogan as Secretary
Represented By: Jennifer A. Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?