Crenshaw v. McNamara et al
Plaintiff: |
William Crenshaw |
Defendant: |
James McNamara, John VanLoon, Richard Fontanza, Larry Bernstein, Sandra Doorley and Charles Siragusa |
Case Number: |
6:2015cv06229 |
Filed: |
April 20, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Western District of New York |
Office: |
Rochester Office |
County: |
Monroe |
Presiding Judge: |
David G. Larimer |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 4, 2016 |
Filing
39
DECISION AND ORDER granting # 19 Defendant Siragusa's motion to dismiss; denying # 27 Defendants McNamara, VonLoon and Fontanza's Motion to Dismiss; and granting # 29 Defendant Doorley and Bernsein's Motion for Judgment on the Plead ings. Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed with prejudice as to all defendants for the reasons stated within this Decision and Order. The Clerk of the Court shall issue a Judgment for Defendants and close this action. Signed by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 5/4/16. (lmw)
|
January 19, 2016 |
Filing
21
DECISION AND ORDER denying # 5 Plaintiff's motion to remand. Signed by Chief Judge Glenn T. Suddaby on 1/19/16. (lmw) (Copy served upon pro se plaintiff via regular mail at Clinton Correctional Facility)
|
November 6, 2015 |
Filing
16
ORDER that the decision dismissing Hon. Charles Siragusa from the action is not effective based on the Clinton County Supreme Court's lack of jurisdiction and, therefore, this case should be transferred to another Judge in another Federal District. Signed by Hon. David G. Larimer on 11/6/15. (EMA)
|
August 11, 2015 |
Filing
8
ORDER that plaintiff is hereby directed to submit to the Court additional evidence relating to the date on which he submitted his motion to remand 5 for mailing, and the steps that he took to effect such mailing. Such evidence may consist of plain tiff's own sworn statements, as well as documentary evidence in plaintiff's possession. Defendant Doorley is hereby directed to submit to the Court further evidence concerning the alleged consent of the other defendants in this action to t he removal of this case to federal court.Both plaintiff's and Doorley's submissions must be filed with the Court no later than 45 days after the date of issuance of this Order. A copy of this decision mailed to plaintiff at his address of record. Signed by Hon. David G. Larimer on 8/11/15. (EMA)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?