Argento et al v. Santiago et al
Plaintiff: |
Steven C. Argento |
Defendant: |
Marilyn Santiago, For the Love of Ramon LLC and John Does 1 to 10 |
Case Number: |
6:2016cv06172 |
Filed: |
March 17, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Western District of New York |
Office: |
Rochester Office |
County: |
Monroe |
Presiding Judge: |
Frank P. Geraci |
Nature of Suit: |
Copyrights |
Cause of Action: |
15 U.S.C. § 1051 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 19, 2019 |
Filing
81
DECISION & ORDER The claims asserted by plaintiff Argento against defendants Santiago and For the Love of Ramon, LLC, are dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). Further, the counterclaims asserted by defendant Santiago against plaintiff Argento are dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). The Clerk of the Court is directed to close the case. Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 9/19/2019. Copies of this Decision & Order sent by First Class Mail to plaintiff Steven C. Argento, 510 Park Avenue, Rochester, NY 14607 and to defendants Marilyn Santiago and For the Love of Ramon, LLP, 180 Wyatt Drive, Rochester, NY 14610 on 6/12/2019. (KAH) -CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
|
February 27, 2019 |
Filing
74
DECISION & ORDER Plaintiff's motion for default judgment against defendant For the Love of Ramon, LLC 63 is denied without prejudice. Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 2/27/2019. Copies of this Decision & Order have been sent by First Class Mail to plaintiff Steven C. Argento, 510 Park Avenue, Rochester, NY 14607 and to defendants Marilyn Santiago and For the Love of Ramon, LLP, 180 Wyatt Drive, Rochester, NY 14610 on 2/27/2019. (KAH)
|
February 15, 2018 |
Filing
48
ORDER granting in full 41 Motion for Summary Judgment. A copy of this Order and NEF will be mailed to pro se Plaintiff. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 2/15/18. (KAJ)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
|
December 18, 2017 |
Filing
44
ORDER granting in part and deferring in part 41 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court will mail a request to the Register of Copyrights pursuant to 17 U.S.C. § 411(b)(2). A copy of this order will be mailed to pro se Plaintiff. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 12/18/2017. (KAJ)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?