Cabarris v. Knight Transportation, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Darrell B. Cabarris
Defendant: Knight Transportation, Inc. and Ethan B. Dasher
Case Number: 6:2017cv06259
Filed: April 26, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Office: Rochester Office
County: Wayne
Presiding Judge: Frank P. Geraci
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 DECISION AND ORDER denying 58 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Hon. Mark W. Pedersen on 8/19/20. (KAP)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER denying 44 Motion to Compel. Signed by Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman on 2/8/19. (SR)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 32 Motion for Protective Order; granting as set forth herein 38 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 25 Motion to Compel; granting as set forth herein 26 Motion for Discovery. Signed by Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman on 10/30/18. (SR)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 DECISION AND ORDER regarding 7 Stipulation. The parties cannot stipulate around the statutory requirements and agree to vacate the order of reference to a magistrate judge. If either party believes they can demonstrate extraordinary circumstance s to vacate the reference order, they are free to submit a motion under Section 636(c)(4). However, the parties should keep in mind that the "extraordinary circumstances" standard is a demanding one that will rarely be satisfied. This case remains assigned to Judge Feldman for all purposes, in accordance with the reference order. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 8/31/17. (SCE)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cabarris v. Knight Transportation, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrell B. Cabarris
Represented By: Patrick Allan Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knight Transportation, Inc.
Represented By: Shannon Rae Becker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethan B. Dasher
Represented By: Shannon Rae Becker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?