Lusk et al v. Serve U Brands, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Skyler Lusk, Tia Council, Viktoria O'Brien, Justin Byroad, Christian Augustine, Darel Bailey, Brian Bonilla, Michael Bradett, Avery Buggs, Dylan Burgett, Gabrielle Bustillos, Maria Cagigal, Christopher Caldwell, Jordan Cavataio, John Clements III, Kelsey Colley, Kamara Craig, Michael Crespo, Alexa Decatur, Lauren Dudley, Papa Duncan, Eric Dunlap Jr., Darrian Eason, Noah Egan, Rudolph Elmore Jr., Nathaniel Encarnacion, Christopher Erdman, Luayy Ziad Fadel, Adam Friedman, David Given, Raeven Godette, Shane Golden, Mirna Gonzalez, Morgan Hall, Lorenzo Hammond, Neal Harris, Tristan Hendrix, Kyle Hodson, Hakeem Holmes, Joel Hopkins, Jake Hurley, William Johannesen, Lauren Jonelis, Kit Keegan, Rezan Kflu, Ashlee Kohler, Cory Lambrecht, Alesha Lee, Michael Lewis, Juwan Lockett, Tevin Lucas, Nicolas Meyer, Cheyenne Miller, Marlon Morisset, Luke Morse, Bradley Musabika, Shannon Obbagy, William Oliver, David Page, Destiny Peden, Jerry Pierce III, Bryann Polttila, Ryan Pomper, Conor Pounds, Imani Reed, Roberto Renfrew-Marquez, Bonnie Robinson, Perry Rodriguez, Lydia Ruffner, Sean Ruona, Channen Sarmiento, Mikai Sawyer, Ben Sehnert, Jory Shinpaugh, Donte Singleton, Michelle Smith-Nobles, Hannah Stanger, Lucas Stromer, Michael Stuckey Jr., Kendall Talbot, Andre Taylor, Ian Thrush, Lacey Trull, Jeffrey Vannoy, Steven Villegas, Kathryn Watkins, Dakota White, Ronada Wright, Brian Yarmak, Mary Zottoli, Matthew Zuleger and Tyler Spreeman
Defendant: Serve U Brands, Inc., Insomnia Cookies, LLC and Seth Berkowitz
Case Number: 6:2017cv06451
Filed: July 11, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Office: Rochester Office
County: Monroe
Presiding Judge: Michael A. Telesca
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 175 DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 67 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings - It is granted to the extent that the claims asserted by DRA Opt-In Plaintiffs Christopher Lee Caldwell, Dylan Burgett, Hannah Stanger, Michael Cresp o and Ben Sehnert are dismissed without prejudice; it is denied as to DRA Opt-In Plaintiff Avery Buggs whose claims shall remain pending in this action; and it is denied to the extent that Defendants request attorneys fees and costs pursuant to FRCP 41(d); and denying 79 Motion to Stay. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Christopher Lee Caldwell, Dylan Burgett, Hannah Stanger, Michael Crespo and Ben Sehnert as parties to this action. Signed by Hon. Michael A. Telesca on 9/16/19. (JMC)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 115 DECISION AND ORDER CONVERTING 67 FED. R. CIV. P. 12(c) MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON PLEADINGS Defs' Motion to Dismiss the Claims of Putative Opt-In Plaintiffs Subject to Individual Dispute Resolution Agreements filed by Seth Berkowitz, Serve U Brands, Inc., Insomnia Cookies, LLC, to FED. R. CIV. P. 56 MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Defendants are hereby ordered to submit a memorandum of law by Monday, February 11, 2019, addressing the choice-of-law issue and any other issues they b elieve are pertinent to establishing their entitlement to summary judgment under Fed. R. Civ. P. 56. Once Defendants submit their filing, the Court will set a briefing schedule for Plaintiffs' opposition papers and Defendants' reply. Signed by Hon. Michael A. Telesca on 1/14/19. (AFB)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 DECISION AND ORDER granting 48 Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend or Correct and Named Plaintiffs are instructed to file their amended complaint within 10 days of entry of this Decision and Order; and denying 49 Defendants' Motion to Strike. Signed by Hon. Michael A. Telesca on 6/14/18. (JMC)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 DECISION AND ORDER finding as moot 8 Motion to Certify Class; finding as moot 9 Motion to Expedite; granting 35 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Named Plaintiffs shall have 30 days from entry of this Decision and Order to move for leave to file an amended complaint. In the event they fail to file such a motion, the Clerk of the Court is instructed to close the case without further order of the Court.. Signed by Hon. Michael A. Telesca on 2/12/18. (JMC)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lusk et al v. Serve U Brands, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Skyler Lusk
Represented By: Sarah E. Cressman
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tia Council
Represented By: Sarah E. Cressman
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Viktoria O'Brien
Represented By: Sarah E. Cressman
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Byroad
Represented By: Sarah E. Cressman
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Augustine
Represented By: Sarah E. Cressman
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darel Bailey
Represented By: Sarah E. Cressman
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Bonilla
Represented By: Sarah E. Cressman
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Bradett
Represented By: Sarah E. Cressman
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Avery Buggs
Represented By: Sarah E. Cressman
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dylan Burgett
Represented By: Sarah E. Cressman
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabrielle Bustillos
Represented By: Sarah E. Cressman
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Cagigal
Represented By: Sarah E. Cressman
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Caldwell
Represented By: Sarah E. Cressman
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jordan Cavataio
Represented By: Sarah E. Cressman
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Clements III
Represented By: Sarah E. Cressman
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelsey Colley
Represented By: Sarah E. Cressman
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kamara Craig
Represented By: Sarah E. Cressman
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Crespo
Represented By: Sarah E. Cressman
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexa Decatur
Represented By: Sarah E. Cressman
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren Dudley
Represented By: Sarah E. Cressman
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Papa Duncan
Represented By: Sarah E. Cressman
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Dunlap Jr.
Represented By: Sarah E. Cressman
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrian Eason
Represented By: Sarah E. Cressman
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noah Egan
Represented By: Sarah E. Cressman
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rudolph Elmore Jr.
Represented By: Sarah E. Cressman
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathaniel Encarnacion
Represented By: Sarah E. Cressman
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Erdman
Represented By: Sarah E. Cressman
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luayy Ziad Fadel
Represented By: Sarah E. Cressman
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam Friedman
Represented By: Sarah E. Cressman
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Given
Represented By: Sarah E. Cressman
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raeven Godette
Represented By: Sarah E. Cressman
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shane Golden
Represented By: Sarah E. Cressman
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mirna Gonzalez
Represented By: Sarah E. Cressman
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morgan Hall
Represented By: Sarah E. Cressman
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorenzo Hammond
Represented By: Sarah E. Cressman
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neal Harris
Represented By: Sarah E. Cressman
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tristan Hendrix
Represented By: Sarah E. Cressman
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Hodson
Represented By: Sarah E. Cressman
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hakeem Holmes
Represented By: Sarah E. Cressman
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Hopkins
Represented By: Sarah E. Cressman
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jake Hurley
Represented By: Sarah E. Cressman
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Johannesen
Represented By: Sarah E. Cressman
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren Jonelis
Represented By: Sarah E. Cressman
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kit Keegan
Represented By: Sarah E. Cressman
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rezan Kflu
Represented By: Sarah E. Cressman
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashlee Kohler
Represented By: Sarah E. Cressman
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cory Lambrecht
Represented By: Sarah E. Cressman
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alesha Lee
Represented By: Sarah E. Cressman
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Lewis
Represented By: Sarah E. Cressman
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juwan Lockett
Represented By: Sarah E. Cressman
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tevin Lucas
Represented By: Sarah E. Cressman
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicolas Meyer
Represented By: Sarah E. Cressman
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheyenne Miller
Represented By: Sarah E. Cressman
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlon Morisset
Represented By: Sarah E. Cressman
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luke Morse
Represented By: Sarah E. Cressman
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley Musabika
Represented By: Sarah E. Cressman
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Obbagy
Represented By: Sarah E. Cressman
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Oliver
Represented By: Sarah E. Cressman
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Page
Represented By: Sarah E. Cressman
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Destiny Peden
Represented By: Sarah E. Cressman
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Pierce III
Represented By: Sarah E. Cressman
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryann Polttila
Represented By: Sarah E. Cressman
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Pomper
Represented By: Sarah E. Cressman
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Conor Pounds
Represented By: Sarah E. Cressman
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Imani Reed
Represented By: Sarah E. Cressman
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberto Renfrew-Marquez
Represented By: Sarah E. Cressman
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Robinson
Represented By: Sarah E. Cressman
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perry Rodriguez
Represented By: Sarah E. Cressman
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lydia Ruffner
Represented By: Sarah E. Cressman
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Ruona
Represented By: Sarah E. Cressman
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Channen Sarmiento
Represented By: Sarah E. Cressman
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mikai Sawyer
Represented By: Sarah E. Cressman
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ben Sehnert
Represented By: Sarah E. Cressman
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jory Shinpaugh
Represented By: Sarah E. Cressman
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donte Singleton
Represented By: Sarah E. Cressman
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Smith-Nobles
Represented By: Sarah E. Cressman
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hannah Stanger
Represented By: Sarah E. Cressman
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lucas Stromer
Represented By: Sarah E. Cressman
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Stuckey Jr.
Represented By: Sarah E. Cressman
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kendall Talbot
Represented By: Sarah E. Cressman
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre Taylor
Represented By: Sarah E. Cressman
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ian Thrush
Represented By: Sarah E. Cressman
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lacey Trull
Represented By: Sarah E. Cressman
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Vannoy
Represented By: Sarah E. Cressman
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Villegas
Represented By: Sarah E. Cressman
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Watkins
Represented By: Sarah E. Cressman
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dakota White
Represented By: Sarah E. Cressman
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronada Wright
Represented By: Sarah E. Cressman
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Yarmak
Represented By: Sarah E. Cressman
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Zottoli
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Zuleger
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Spreeman
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Serve U Brands, Inc.
Represented By: William J. Anthony
Represented By: Stephanie L. Goutos
Represented By: Douglas J Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insomnia Cookies, LLC
Represented By: William J. Anthony
Represented By: Stephanie L. Goutos
Represented By: Douglas J Klein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seth Berkowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?