Hill et al v. County of Niagara et al
Plaintiff: Michael Hill and Karen Pittman
Defendant: County of Niagara, City of Niagara Falls, Caroline A. Wojtaszek, Doreen M. Hoffman, Troy Earp, J. Payne, C. Wilson, Latona, James R. Vourtour and Kevin Payne
Case Number: 6:2018cv06022
Filed: January 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Office: Rochester Office
County: Niagara
Presiding Judge: Charles J. Siragusa
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 203 DECISION AND ORDER denying 191 Objections and granting 197 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment in favor of Defendant and close the case. The Court certifies that any appeal would not be taken in good faith and leave to appeal to the Court of Appeals as a poor person is denied. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 06/04/2024. (CDH) (A copy of this Decision and Order was mailed to Plaintiffs)Clerk to Follow up
November 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 199 DECISION & ORDER Hill's motion for permission to electronically file documents on the Court's electronic filing system 195 is denied without prejudice. Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 11/21/2023. (KAH)This was mailed to: Plaintiffs Michael Hill and Karen Pittman.
March 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 159 DECISION & ORDER (See contents of the Decision & Order for specific deadlines and directives.)Plaintiffs' motion for appointment of a special master 126 is denied. To the extent plaintiffs' remaining motions seek an order to com pel 141 143 152 , they are granted in part and denied in part as specified above; supplemental responses to plaintiffs' discovery demand are due on or before March 27, 2023. To the extent the motions seek other relief 141 143 [1 52], they are denied.County defendants' motion for appointment of a special master to supervise the remaining depositions 145 is denied. County defendants' motions for an extension of time to complete discovery 145 and to file dispos itive motions 150 are granted, and the March 8, 2022 Amended Scheduling Order 120 is amended as specified above. The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to amend the caption of the case to correct the spelling of defendant Thomas Loughren's name. Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 3/3/2023. (KAH)This was mailed to: Plaintiffs Michael Hill and Karen Pittman.Clerk to Follow up
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 121 DECISION AND ORDER adopting 119 Report and Recommendation and denying 100 motion for a filing injunction. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 03/24/2022. (MGB)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 110 DECISION AND ORDER denying 53 Motion for Transfer to a Closer Correctional Facility; denying 54 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 11/09/2021. (CDH) (A copy of this Decision and Order was mailed to plaintiffs Michael Hill and Karen Pittman)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 DECISION AND ORDER granting 35 Motion to Vacate and vacating 32 Clerk's Entry of Default. The defaulting defendants shall file their answers to the Second Amended Complaint within 21 days of entry of this Decision and Order. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 02/10/2021. (CDH)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill et al v. County of Niagara et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Pittman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Niagara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Niagara Falls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caroline A. Wojtaszek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doreen M. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Troy Earp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Latona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James R. Vourtour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Payne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?