Gomez v. Brewer et al

Plaintiff: Margarito Gomez
Defendant: Dr. Shahid Haque and Dr. Jeffery Brewer
Case Number: 6:2018cv06548
Filed: July 25, 2018
Court: New York Western District Court
Office: Rochester Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Charles J Siragusa
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
July 25, 2018 6 Case transferred in from District of New York Northern; Case Number 9:18-cv-00773.
July 23, 2018 5 DECISION AND ORDER: ORDERED that plaintiff's in forma pauperis application (Dkt. No. #2 ) is GRANTED ORDERED, that pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 21 and 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), Brewer and Haque and all claims against them, are severed and transferred to the Western District of New York. ORDERED, that no ruling is made as to the sufficiency of the Complaint with respect to the claims that have been severed and transferred to the Western District, leaving that determination to the Western District of New York. ORDERED that if Plaintiff wishes to proceed with this action, he must file an Amended Complaint as set forth above within thirty (30) days from the date of the filing of this Decision and Order. ORDERED that, if Plaintiff timely files an Amended Complaint, this matter be returned to the Court for further review. ORDERED that if Plaintiff fails to timely file an Amended Complaint as directed, the Clerk shall enter judgment indicating that the remainder of this action is DISMISSED without prejudice without further order of this Court pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B) and 28 U.S.C. 1915A(b)(1) for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted and for failure to comply with this Decision and Order. In that event, the Clerk is directed to close this case. ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion for the appointment of counsel (Dkt. No. #4 ) is DENIED. Signed by U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino on 7/23/18. {order and copy of complaint served via regular mail on plaintiff}(nas, ) [Transferred from nynd on 7/25/2018.]
June 29, 2018 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Margarito Gomez. (nas, ) [Transferred from nynd on 7/25/2018.]
June 29, 2018 3 INMATE AUTHORIZATION FORM by Margarito Gomez. (nas, ) [Transferred from nynd on 7/25/2018.]
June 29, 2018 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Margarito Gomez. (Attachments: #1 affidavit) (nas, ) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/2/2018) (nas, ). [Transferred from nynd on 7/25/2018.]
June 29, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Jeffery Brewer, Department of Corrections and Community Supervision, Mikhail Gusman, Shahid Haque, Carl J. Koenigsmann, N.Y.S. Department of Correctional Health Services, Brian Valerian(Coxsackie Correctional Facility ), Brian Valerian(Coxsackie Correctional Facility; Reginal Medical Unit ) filed by Margarito Gomez. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(nas, ) [Transferred from nynd on 7/25/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gomez v. Brewer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Shahid Haque
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Jeffery Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margarito Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?