Roy v. McCloud et al

Plaintiff: Lavar Roy
Defendant: Sean G. McCloud, D. R. Spicer, John Doe, William A. Jacobs, Jason M. Baker and Burkhart
Case Number: 6:2018cv06655
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: New York Western District Court
Presiding Judge: Charles J Siragusa
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 9, 2018 Copy of #7 Order, #8 Judgment and new authorization form mailed to pro se plaintiff. (JHF)
November 9, 2018 8 JUDGMENT administratively terminating the case. Signed by Clerk on 11/9/18. (JHF)
November 9, 2018 7 Featured Case ORDER denying as moot #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File; denying without prejudice #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Clerk directed to administratively terminate this action. Plaintiff has final opportunity to fix his errors until 12/14/18 to either (1) submit a signed authorization, or (2) pay the full filing fee of $400.00. Clerk directed to send to plaintiff a new authorization form. Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 11/9/18. (JHF)
October 11, 2018 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lavar Roy. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (JHF)
October 9, 2018 5 Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Lavar Roy. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (JHF)
September 20, 2018 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Lavar Roy. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (JHF)
September 20, 2018 Copy of #2 Order, #3 Judgment and a new form motion to proceed in forma pauperis and Prison Authorization Form mailed to pro se plaintiff. (JHF)
September 20, 2018 3 JUDGMENT administratively terminating the case. Signed by Clerk on 9/20/18. (JHF)
September 20, 2018 2 Featured Case ORDER directing Clerk to administratively terminate this action. If plaintiff wishes to reopen this action, he shall notify the Court in writing no later than 30 days from the date of this order. Plaintiff's writing shall include either (1) a properly supported motion to proceed in forma pauperis along with the required certification of the Plaintiff's inmate trust account and authorization form, or (2) the $400.00 filing fees; upon plaintiff's submission of either, Clerk shall re-open this case. Clerk directed to send to plaintiff a new form motion to proceed in forma pauperis with supporting affidavit and prisoner authorization form. Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 9/19/18. (JHF)
September 14, 2018 Prisoner Pro Se Packet consisting of Privacy Notice, Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge and Civil Case Timeline mailed to plaintiff. (JHF)
September 14, 2018 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (JHF)
September 14, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Jason M. Baker, Burkhart, John Doe, William A. Jacobs, Sean G. McCloud, D. R. Spicer, filed by Lavar Roy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (JHF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roy v. McCloud et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean G. McCloud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. R. Spicer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William A. Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason M. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burkhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lavar Roy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?