Kubitz v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America et al

Plaintiff: Catherine E Kubitz
Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America and Rochester Institute of Technology
Case Number: 6:2018cv06657
Filed: September 14, 2018
Court: New York Western District Court
Presiding Judge: Charles J Siragusa
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 29:1109
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 8, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
November 8, 2018 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rochester Institute of Technology. (Boyd, John)
November 1, 2018 ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: All Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.7.1(b) are to be filed within seven(7) days of this notice. (MD)
October 26, 2018 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Louis Orbach on behalf of Rochester Institute of Technology (Orbach, Louis)
October 26, 2018 4 NOTICE of Appearance by John Boyd, ll on behalf of Rochester Institute of Technology (Boyd, John)
October 26, 2018 3 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER, Answer due date updated as to Rochester Institute of Technology answer due 12/15/2018, Attorney Louis Orbach,John Boyd, ll for Rochester Institute of Technology added.. Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 10/25/18. (KAP)
October 25, 2018 E-Filing Notification: Document contains so ordered line and should be submitted via e-mail to the assigned judge. Refer to the Administrative Guide for e-mail addresses. No action required #2 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Boyd, John) (BK)
October 24, 2018 E-Filing Notification: re #2 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Rochester Institute of Technology. (Boyd, John) Modified to indicate correct defendant. (BK)
October 24, 2018 2 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Rochester Institute of Technology. (Boyd, John) Modified on 10/26/2018 (BK).
September 26, 2018 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (BK)
September 26, 2018 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (BK)
September 26, 2018 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution. (BK)
September 26, 2018 Case Assigned to Hon. Charles J. Siragusa. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (BK)
September 26, 2018 Filing fee: $400.00, receipt number ROC010833. (BK)
September 26, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Catherine E Kubitz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (BK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kubitz v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Prudential Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rochester Institute of Technology
Represented By: Louis Orbach
Represented By: John Boyd, ll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine E Kubitz
Represented By: Lawrence I. Heller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?