Winfield v. Wyoming Correctional Facility
Plaintiff: Ascir Winfield
Defendant: Wyoming Correctional Facility
Case Number: 6:2018cv06672
Filed: September 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A Wolford
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2018 Updated plaintiff's address to Orleans CF per #5 Letter (TF)
November 13, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ascir Winfield.(TF)
November 8, 2018 Filing 6 Letter from Ascir Winfield, dated 11/5/18 (TF)
November 5, 2018 Filing 5 Letter from Ascir Winfield, dated 10/31/18, to whom it may concern (TF)
October 22, 2018 Filing 4 JUDGMENT that this action is administratively terminated. Signed by Clerk of Court on 10/22/18. (mailed a copy of this judgment to plaintiff Winfield) (TF)
October 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and that the Clerk of Court shall administratively terminate this action. The Clerk of Court is directed to send to Plaintiff a form motion to proceed in forma pauperis with supporting affirmation and authorization form. If plaintiff wishes to reopen this action, he shall so notify this Court, in writing, no later than thirty days from the date of this order. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 10/19/18. (mailed a copy of this order and form motion for IFP to plaintiff Winfield) (TF)
September 24, 2018 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. Consent form, privacy notice and civil case timeline mailed to plaintiff. (TF)
September 21, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ascir Winfield.(TF)
September 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wyoming Correctional Facility, filed by Ascir Winfield. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(TF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winfield v. Wyoming Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyoming Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ascir Winfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?