Yates v. Speedway LLC
Plaintiff: Danielle Yates
Defendant: Speedway LLC
Case Number: 6:2018cv06716
Filed: October 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: David G Larimer
Referring Judge: Marian W Payson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER (Please Note: This docket text may not contain the entire contents of the attached Order. It is your responsibility to read the attached Order and download it for future reference. Direct any questions to the Chambers of the Judge who entered this Order.) Status Conference set for 4/30/2019 11:20 AM before Hon. Marian W. Payson. Stipulation of Selection of Mediator due by 12/27/2018. First Mediation Session due by 2/21/2019. Mediation To End by 4/22/2019. Mandatory Disclosures due by 12/3/2018. Motions to Join Parties/Amend Pleadings due by 1/16/2019. Fact Discovery to be completed by 5/16/2019. Plaintiff Expert Witness ID due by 7/17/2019. Defendant Expert Witness ID due by 8/16/2019. Expert Discovery to be completed by 10/16/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 12/16/2019. Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 11/29/2018. (KAH)
November 14, 2018 Filing 6 DISCOVERY PLAN by Speedway LLC.(Hannah, Brittany)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER (Scheduling Conference set for 11/29/2018 11:00 AM before Hon. Marian W. Payson.) Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 11/5/2018. (KAH)
November 1, 2018 Filing 4 TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Hon. Marian W. Payson for all pretrial matters excluding dispositive motions. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. David G. Larimer on 11/1/18. (PR)
October 5, 2018 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Supreme Court Notice of Removal, Civil Cover Sheet, Western District Notice of Removal with Exhibits A-F, Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 served on Scott J. Learned, Esq. on October 5, 2018, filed by Speedway LLC. (Hannah, Brittany)
October 5, 2018 Filing 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Speedway LLC. (Hannah, Brittany)
October 5, 2018 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (BK)
October 5, 2018 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution. (BK)
October 5, 2018 Case Assigned to Hon. David G. Larimer. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (BK)
October 4, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Speedway LLC from Chemung County Supreme Court, case number 2016-2078. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0209-3239117), filed by Speedway LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Index of Attached Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Summons with Complaint and Complaint filed on October 3, 2016, #3 Exhibit Ex. C - Summons with Amended Complaint and Amended Complaint filed on December 22, 2017, #4 Exhibit Ex. D - Verified Answer to Amended Complaint served 1-18-2018, #5 Exhibit Ex. E - Request for Supp Demand for Relief served 1-18-18, #6 Exhibit Ex. F - Reply to Request for Supp Demand for Relief dated 9-13-18, #7 Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FRCP 7.1, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hannah, Brittany)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yates v. Speedway LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Yates
Represented By: Scott J. Learned
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Speedway LLC
Represented By: Brittany L. Hannah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?