Thompson et al v. Jimmy John's Franchise, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Selena Thompson, Christine Ost, Jacob Manning, Jon M Stewart and Jon M. Stewart
Defendant: Jimmy John's Franchise, LLC, Spin the Planet, Inc., STP JJ Team 1, LLC, d/b/a Spin The Planet Enterprises, d/b/a Jimmy John's, Jimmy John's, LLC, Daniel Vansteenburg, WTE, Inc., Jimmy John's Enterprises, LLC and STP JJ Team 1, LLC,
Case Number: 6:2018cv06755
Filed: October 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Charles J Siragusa
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION SCHEDULING ORDER re #14 MOTION to Stay filed by Daniel Vansteenburg, WTE, Inc., Spin the Planet, Inc., STP JJ Team 1, LLC,, #12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Daniel Vansteenburg, WTE, Inc., Spin the Planet, Inc., STP JJ Team 1, LLC,, ( Responses due by 1/4/2019., Replies due by 1/18/2019.) Court will issue a written decision after 1/18/19.. Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 12/4/18. (KAP)
December 3, 2018 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support re #14 MOTION to Stay filed by STP JJ Team 1, LLC, Spin the Planet, Inc., Daniel Vansteenburg, WTE, Inc. (Fee, Mary)
December 3, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION to Stay by STP JJ Team 1, LLC, Spin the Planet, Inc., Daniel Vansteenburg, WTE, Inc. (Fee, Mary)
December 3, 2018 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support re #12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by STP JJ Team 1, LLC, Spin the Planet, Inc., Daniel Vansteenburg, WTE, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Fee, Mary)
December 3, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss by STP JJ Team 1, LLC, Spin the Planet, Inc., Daniel Vansteenburg, WTE, Inc. (Fee, Mary)
November 20, 2018 Filing 11 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond by STP JJ Team 1, LLC,, Spin the Planet, Inc., Daniel Vansteenburg, WTE, Inc.. (Fee, Mary)
November 20, 2018 Filing 10 STIPULATION of Dismissal without prejudice as to defendants Jimmy John's Franchise, LLC, Jimmy John's Enterprises, LLC, and Jimmy John's LLC by Jacob Manning, Christine Ost, Jon M. Stewart, Selena Thompson. (Gifford, Annette)
November 19, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Howard Mark Wexler on behalf of Jimmy John's Enterprises, LLC, Jimmy John's Franchise, LLC, Jimmy John's, LLC (Wexler, Howard)
November 19, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Annette M. Gifford on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Gifford, Annette)
November 16, 2018 Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice admission for Joseph M. Sokolowski, Esq.. Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 11/16/18. (KAP)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
November 2, 2018 Clerk confirmed MN state bar admission for Joseph M. Sokolowski, Esq. (JHF)
November 2, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $150 receipt number 0209-3267802) by STP JJ Team 1, LLC,, Spin the Planet, Inc., Daniel Vansteenburg, WTE, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Mary L. Fee, #2 Affidavit of Joseph M. Sokolowski, Esq., #3 Supplement, #4 Certificate of Service) (Fee, Mary)
October 25, 2018 Filing 5 STIPULATION Joint by STP JJ Team 1, LLC, Spin the Planet, Inc., Daniel Vansteenburg, WTE, Inc. (Fee, Mary)
October 25, 2018 Case Reassigned to Hon. Charles J. Siragusa. Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. no longer assigned to the case. (JHF)
October 25, 2018 Filing 4 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Hon. Charles J. Siragusa. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 10/25/2018. (SFR)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
October 19, 2018 E-Filing Notification: Modified docket to reflect #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL. No action required. (TF)
October 19, 2018 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution(TF)
October 19, 2018 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TF)
October 19, 2018 Case assigned to Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr.. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil opening. (TF)
October 18, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by STP JJ Team 1, LLC, d/b/a Spin The Planet Enterprises, d/b/a Jimmy John's, Spin the Planet, Inc., Daniel Vansteenburg, WTE, Inc.. (Fee, Mary)
October 18, 2018 Filing 2 AMENDED DOCUMENT by STP JJ Team 1, LLC, d/b/a Spin The Planet Enterprises, d/b/a Jimmy John's, Spin the Planet, Inc., Daniel Vansteenburg, WTE, Inc.. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal,, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B (Revised))(Fee, Mary)
October 18, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Daniel Vansteenburg, STP JJ Team 1, LLC, d/b/a Spin The Planet Enterprises, d/b/a Jimmy John's, Spin the Planet, Inc., WTE, Inc. from Monroe County Supreme Court, case number 18/04138. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0209-3252794), filed by Daniel Vansteenburg, STP JJ Team 1, LLC, d/b/a Spin The Planet Enterprises, d/b/a Jimmy John's, Spin the Planet, Inc., WTE, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fee, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson et al v. Jimmy John's Franchise, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Selena Thompson
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Annette M. Gifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Ost
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Annette M. Gifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Manning
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Annette M. Gifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon M Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon M. Stewart
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Lukasiewicz
Represented By: J. Nelson Thomas
Represented By: Michael J. Lingle
Represented By: Annette M. Gifford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy John's Franchise, LLC
Represented By: Howard Mark Wexler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spin the Planet, Inc.
Represented By: Mary L. Fee
Represented By: Joseph M. Sokolowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STP JJ Team 1, LLC, d/b/a Spin The Planet Enterprises, d/b/a Jimmy John's
Represented By: Mary L. Fee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy John's, LLC
Represented By: Howard Mark Wexler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Vansteenburg
Represented By: Mary L. Fee
Represented By: Joseph M. Sokolowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WTE, Inc.
Represented By: Mary L. Fee
Represented By: Joseph M. Sokolowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy John's Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Howard Mark Wexler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STP JJ Team 1, LLC,
Represented By: Joseph M. Sokolowski
Represented By: Mary L. Fee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?