Cicero v. Intellor Group, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Brian J Cicero and Brian J. Cicero
Defendant: Richard A Rist, Intellor Group, Inc. and Richard A. Rist
Case Number: 6:2018cv06934
Filed: December 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Charles J Siragusa
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 05:704
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Brian J. Cicero. (Schultz, Jill)
February 1, 2019 Filing 6 DECLARATION re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Brian J. Cicero filed by Brian J. Cicero. (Schultz, Jill)
January 7, 2019 E-Filing Notification: Clerk revised docket text of #3 , #4 and #5 to clarify the filing events. The Notice of Motion in #4 replaces the Notice of Motion in #3 ; the docket text in #3 was revised to Memorandum in Support; and, the docket text of #5 Motion Scheduling Order was revised accordingly. (JHF)
January 4, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION SCHEDULING ORDER re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Richard A. Rist, Intellor Group, Inc. Responses due by 2/1/2019. Replies due by 3/1/2019. Motion Hearing set for 6/20/2019 03:00 PM before Hon. Charles J. Siragusa. Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 1/4/19. (KAP) Modified on 1/7/2019 (JHF).
December 27, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM includes Local Rule 7(a)(1) Statement, with #3 Memorandum in Support, by Intellor Group, Inc., Richard A. Rist.(Steele, Joshua) Modified on 1/7/2019 (JHF).
December 26, 2018 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation. The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution. (JHF)
December 26, 2018 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (JHF)
December 26, 2018 Case assigned to Hon. Charles J. Siragusa. Notification to chambers of on-line civil case opening. (JHF)
December 21, 2018 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM in Support in re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Intellor Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Certificate of Service)(Steele, Joshua) Modified on 1/7/2019 (JHF).
December 21, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Intellor Group, Inc.. (Steele, Joshua)
December 21, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Monroe County Supreme Court, case number E2018009684 (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0209-3314321), filed by Richard A. Rist, Intellor Group, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil, #2 Certificate of Service) (Steele, Joshua) Modified on 12/26/2018 (JHF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cicero v. Intellor Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard A Rist
Represented By: Joshua D. Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intellor Group, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua D. Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard A. Rist
Represented By: Joshua D. Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian J Cicero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian J. Cicero
Represented By: Andrew M. Burns
Represented By: Jill K. Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?