Arbaugh v. Arnot Ogden Medical Center
Plaintiff: Cheryl Arbaugh
Defendant: Arnot Ogden Medical Center
Case Number: 6:2018cv06935
Filed: December 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jonathan W Feldman
Referring Judge: David G Larimer
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2019 Filing 17 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman. Signed by Hon. David G. Larimer on 2/11/19. (JHF)
February 6, 2019 Filing 16 SCHEDULING/CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (Please Note: This docket text may not contain the entire contents of the attached Order. It is your responsibility to read the attached Order and download it for future reference. Direct any questions to the Chambers of the Judge who entered this Order.) Mandatory Disclosures due by 1/28/2019 for plaintiff and 2/12/2019 for defendant. Stipulation of Selection of Mediator due by 3/6/2019. Motions to Compel Discovery due by 4/30/2019. First Mediation Session due by 5/1/2019. Discovery completed by 5/31/2019. Plaintiff Expert Witness ID due by 6/30/2019. Defendant Expert Witness ID due by 7/31/2019. Motions to Join Parties/Amend Pleadings due by 8/1/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 8/31/2019. Signed by Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman on 2/6/19. (SR)
February 6, 2019 Filing 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman: Appearances: Chris Fallon, Esq., for plaintiff; Tomas Callocchia, Esq., for defendant. Scheduling Conference held on 2/6/2019. A scheduling order will be issued. (SR)
February 1, 2019 Filing 14 DISCOVERY PLAN by Cheryl Arbaugh.(Fallon, Christopher)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 2/6/2019 at 11:30 AM before Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman. A joint proposed discovery plan is to be filed with the Court at least 4 business days prior to the scheduling conference. Signed by Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman on 1/18/19. (SR)
January 17, 2019 Filing 12 TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Hon. Jonathan W. Feldman for all pretrial matters excluding dispositive motions. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. David G. Larimer on 1/17/19. (PR)
January 16, 2019 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation. The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution. (JHF)
January 16, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Arnot Ogden Medical Center.(Ricotta, Kevin)
January 16, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin A. Ricotta on behalf of Arnot Ogden Medical Center (Ricotta, Kevin)
January 8, 2019 ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: All Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.7.1(b) are to be filed within seven (7) days of this notice. (MD)
December 27, 2018 Filing 9 Summons Reissued as to Arnot Ogden Medical Center. (JHF)
December 27, 2018 Filing 8 Original Summons Filed. (Fallon, Christopher)
December 26, 2018 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of New York Northern; Case Number 5:18-cv-01418.
December 19, 2018 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: granting #5 plaintiff's letter motion to transfer this case to the Western District of New York. So Ordered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 12/19/2018. (nmk) [Transferred from nynd on 12/26/2018.]
December 18, 2018 Filing 5 Letter requesting transfer of case to Western District of New York by Cheryl Arbaugh. (Fallon, Christopher) Clarified docket text on 12/19/2018. (nmk) [Transferred from nynd on 12/26/2018.]
December 11, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Reissued as to Arnot Ogden Medical Center, to reflect the correct spelling of plaintiff's last name. (see) [Transferred from nynd on 12/26/2018.]
December 6, 2018 Filing 3 G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Rule 16 Conference set for 3/6/2019 at 10:30 AM via telephone before US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 2/27/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (meb) [Transferred from nynd on 12/26/2018.]
December 6, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Arnot Ogden Medical Canter. (meb) [Transferred from nynd on 12/26/2018.]
December 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Arnot Ogden Medical Canter (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4584187) filed by Cheryl Arbaugh. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate of Merit)(meb) [Transferred from nynd on 12/26/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arbaugh v. Arnot Ogden Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Arbaugh
Represented By: Christopher C. Fallon, Jr.
Represented By: Robin C. Zimpel-Fontaine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arnot Ogden Medical Center
Represented By: Kevin A. Ricotta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?