Telesford v. Piccolo et al

Plaintiff: Marcus Telesford
Defendant: Donald Venettozzi and Superintendent Piccolo
Case Number: 6:2019cv06045
Filed: January 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Charles J Siragusa
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 Filing 7 Acknowledgment of Service PR Donald Venettozzi served on 3/4/2018, answer due 5/4/2018. (LB)
March 1, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss (3 Strikes) by Donald Venettozzi. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Deutsch with Exhibit A, #2 Memorandum in Support)(Deutsch, Hillel)
March 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Hillel David Deutsch on behalf of Donald Venettozzi (Deutsch, Hillel)
February 21, 2019 Filing 4 Acknowledgment of Service PR by Marcus Telesford. Piccolo served on 2/14/2019, answer due 4/16/2019. (JHF)
January 25, 2019 Summons Issued as to Piccolo, Donald Venettozzi. Mailed to Buffalo USM for service. (JHF)
January 25, 2019 Copy of #3 order sent by email to Ted O'Brien, Acting Assistant Attorney General in Charge, Rochester Regional Office < and same mailed to pro se plaintiff. (JHF)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff's First Amendment claim is dismissed with prejudice. Clerk directed to file plaintiff's papers and cause the U.S. Marshal to serve the summons, #1 complaint and this order upon defendants Piccolo and Venettozzi. Clerk directed to forward a copy of this order by email to Ted O'Brien, Acting Assistant Attorney General in Charge, Rochester Regional Office <. Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 1/24/19. (JHF)
January 14, 2019 Prisoner Pro Se Packet consisting of Privacy Notice, Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge and Civil Case Timeline mailed to plaintiff. (JHF)
January 14, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (JHF)
January 14, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Marcus Telesford. (JHF)
January 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Piccolo, Donald Venettozzi, filed by Marcus Telesford. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope) (JHF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Telesford v. Piccolo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Venettozzi
Represented By: Hillel David Deutsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Superintendent Piccolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Telesford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?