Lisi v. Walmart, Inc.
Plaintiff: Linda Lisi
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv06092
Filed: February 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Marian W Payson
Referring Judge: Charles J Siragusa
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Filing 6 Stipulation-Selection of Mediator by Walmart, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Cantone, Peter)
March 19, 2019 NOTICE:The Scheduling Conference set for 4/10/2019 is adjourned until 4/18/2019 at 11:00 AM before Hon. Marian W. Payson. (KAH)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER (Scheduling Conference set for 4/10/2019 10:40 AM before Hon. Marian W. Payson.) Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 3/8/2019. (KAH)
March 4, 2019 Filing 3 TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Hon. Marian W. Payson. The Magistrate Judge is hereby designated to act in this case as follows: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), all pre-trial matters in this case are referred to the above-named United States Magistrate Judge, including but not limited to: (1) conduct of a scheduling conference and entry of a scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, (2) hearing and disposition of all non-dispositive motions or applications, (3) supervision of discovery, and (4) supervision of all procedural matters involving the aforementioned or involving the preparation of the case or any matter therein for consideration by the District Judge. All non-dispositive motions or applications shall be filed with the Clerk and made returnable before the Magistrate Judge. The parties are encouraged to consider the provisions of 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) governing consent to either partial or complete disposition of the case, including trial if necessary, by the Magistrate Judge. Consent forms are available from the office of the Magistrate Judge or the office of the Clerk of Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Charles J. Siragusa on 3/4/19. (KJA)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Walmart, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Will, Pauline)
February 6, 2019 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution(TF)
February 6, 2019 Case assigned to Hon. Charles J. Siragusa. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil opening. (TF)
February 6, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TF)
February 6, 2019 E-Filing Notification: #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL - Removal missing index. Action required: file index under event CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS. LR 81(3)(A). Disregard e-filing notification, index was filed as exhibit D (TF).
February 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Walmart, Inc. from Ontario County Supreme Court, case number 119814-2018. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0209-3352787), filed by Walmart, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit Defenant's Answer, #3 Exhibit Plaintiff's Supplemental Demand for Relief, #4 Exhibit Case Index, #5 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #6 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service, #7 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Will, Pauline)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lisi v. Walmart, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Lisi
Represented By: Christian N. Valentino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Represented By: Pauline Costanzo Will
Represented By: Peter D. Cantone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?