Miraglia et al v. C.R. Bard, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Nicholas R Miraglia, Ann Miraglia and Nicholas R. Miraglia
Defendant: C.R. Bard, Inc., Doe Defendants 1-10 and Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Case Number: 6:2019cv06126
Filed: February 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Michael A. Telesca
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2019 Case transferred from New York Western has been opened in DISTRICT OF ARIZONA as case 2:19-cv-01886, filed 03/22/2019. (JHF)
March 12, 2019 Filing 2 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION TRANSFER ORDER. Signed by Jeffery N. Lthi, Clerk of the MDL Panel on 3/11/2019. (BK)
February 19, 2019 Multidistrict Litigation Panel notified of potential case. (JHF)
February 19, 2019 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation. The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution. (JHF)
February 19, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (JHF)
February 19, 2019 Hon. Michael A. Telesca added. Notification to chambers of online civil case opening. (JHF)
February 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., C.R. Bard, Inc., Doe Defendants 1-10 $ 400 receipt number 0209-3365046, filed by Nicholas R Miraglia, Ann Miraglia. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Goldstein, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miraglia et al v. C.R. Bard, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas R Miraglia
Represented By: Brian A. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ann Miraglia
Represented By: Brian A. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas R. Miraglia
Represented By: Brian A. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.R. Bard, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Defendants 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?