McCombs v. M&T Bank Corporation

Plaintiff: Christopher D. McCombs
Defendant: M&T Bank Corporation
Case Number: 6:2019cv06151
Filed: February 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: David G Larimer
Referring Judge: Marian W Payson
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER (Scheduling Conference set for 6/20/2019 10:40 AM before Hon. Marian W. Payson.) Signed by Hon. Marian W. Payson on 4/23/2019. (KAH)
April 19, 2019 Filing 7 TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Hon. Marian W. Payson for all pretrial matters excluding dispositive motions. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. David G. Larimer on 4/19/19. (PR)
April 18, 2019 ADR Plan electronically forwarded to attorneys. The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(TF)
April 17, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by M&T Bank Corporation.(Fluskey, Robert)
April 2, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christopher D. McCombs. (Goodwin, Brian)
March 25, 2019 ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: All Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.7.1(b) are to be filed within seven(7) days of this notice. (MD)
March 21, 2019 Filing 4 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint Extending Time to Respond to Complaint by M&T Bank Corporation. (Fluskey, Robert)
February 26, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to M&T Bank Corporation. (KM)
February 26, 2019 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(KM)
February 26, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (KM)
February 25, 2019 Filing 2 Original Summons Filed. (Goodwin, Brian)
February 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against M&T Bank Corporation $ 400 receipt number 0209-3370689, filed by Christopher D. McCombs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Goodwin, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCombs v. M&T Bank Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M&T Bank Corporation
Represented By: Robert J. Fluskey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher D. McCombs
Represented By: Brian R. Goodwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?