Baker v. DHL Supply Chain (USA) et al

Plaintiff: Andrew Baker
Defendant: Home Depot #5151, Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. and DHL Supply Chain (USA)
Case Number: 6:2019cv06157
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frank P Geraci
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Lawrence D. Lissauer on behalf of Andrew Baker (Lissauer, Lawrence)
March 19, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by DHL Supply Chain (USA) identifying Corporate Parent Deutsche Post DHL for DHL Supply Chain (USA).. (Bragaglia, Anthony)
March 15, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Home Depot #5151, Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent The Home Depot, Inc. for Home Depot #5151, Home Depot U.S.A., Inc... (Will, Pauline)
March 14, 2019 ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: All Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.7.1(b) are to be filed within seven(7) days of this notice. (MD)
March 4, 2019 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation. The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution. (JHF)
March 4, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (JHF)
March 4, 2019 Attorney Elizabeth A. Wolff does not appear to be admitted in the WDNY. To continue in this case, attorney directed to seek admittance to the WDNY through certificate of good standing or pro hac vice. (JHF)
March 4, 2019 Case assigned to Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. Notification to chambers of on-line civil case opening. (JHF)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Monroe Supreme Court, case number 17-12271 (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0209-3376610), filed by DHL Supply Chain (USA), Home Depot #5151, Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit Home Depot Verified Answer, #3 Exhibit DHL Verified Answer, #4 Exhibit Plaintiff's Supplemental Demand for Relief, #5 Exhibit Docket of State Court filings, #6 Exhibit Notice of Filing NOR, #7 Certificate of Service, #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (Will, Pauline) Modified on 3/4/2019 (JHF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker v. DHL Supply Chain (USA) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot #5151
Represented By: Pauline Costanzo Will
Represented By: Peter D. Cantone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Pauline Costanzo Will
Represented By: Peter D. Cantone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DHL Supply Chain (USA)
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Bragaglia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Baker
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Wolff
Represented By: Lawrence D. Lissauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?